Shaw v. BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP

Plaintiff: Dennis Shaw
Defendant: BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP
Case Number: 3:2010cv02041
Filed: September 30, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Barry Ted Moskowitz
Referring Judge: Nita L. Stormes
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 17, 2012 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 48 Plaintiff's objection to Magistrate's Scheduling Order. The 47 Scheduling Order shall remain in effect. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 4/17/12. (ecs)
December 29, 2011 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 40 Motion for class certification. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 12/29/11. (ecs)
July 22, 2011 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 37 MOTION to Seal. Defendant's opinion that the exhibits are "Confidential" is not enough in and of itself to justify filing the exhibit under seal. If Defendant wants the exhibits to be filed under seal, Defendant must file a supplemental brief explaining why the exhibits should be sealed. The supplemental brief must be filed on or before July 29, 2011. If Defendant wishes to file the supplemental brief under seal, Defendant may make such a request but must explain why such relief is necessary. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 7/22/11.(ecs)
February 28, 2011 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 16 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 2/28/2011. (jer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shaw v. BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Shaw
Represented By: Daniel Mulligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP
Represented By: Jed P White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?