Sharp v. Arena Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: George Sharp
Defendant: Arena Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Jack Lief, Robert E. Hoffman, Dominic P. Behan, William R. Shanahan, Jr., Christy Anderson and DOES
Case Number: 3:2010cv02111
Filed: October 8, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Michael M. Anello
Referring Judge: Anthony J. Battaglia
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 8, 2011 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 23 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 8/8/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mtb) (jcj).
May 9, 2011 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 34 Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Order filed on February 17, 2011. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 5/9/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jer)
December 29, 2010 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying without Prejudice 16 Motion to Remand to State Court. Within 15 days of the entry of this Order, Plaintiff may file an amended complaint eliminating the federal claims. Within 10 days of the filing of the amended complaint, Defendants shall file a brief (not to exceed 10 pages) showing cause why the Court should not exercise its discretion to remand the case. Plaintiff may file a response brief (not to exceed 10 pages) on the issue of remand within 10 days of the filing of Defendants' brief. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 12/29/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sharp v. Arena Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arena Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Peter M Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Lief
Represented By: Peter M Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert E. Hoffman
Represented By: Peter M Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominic P. Behan
Represented By: Peter M Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William R. Shanahan, Jr.
Represented By: Peter M Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christy Anderson
Represented By: Peter M Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?