Jones v. State of California et al

Petitioner: Steven Jones
Respondent: State of California, California Department of Corrections and Atascadero State Hospital
Case Number: 3:2010cv02117
Filed: October 8, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Luis Obispo
Presiding Judge: William Q. Hayes
Referring Judge: William McCurine
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 12, 2011 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE Without Prejudice And Without Leave To Amend: Petitioner was advised in the preceding dismissal Order that if he filed a Third Amended Petition which failed to cure the deficiencies in his petition, he would be given no further opportunities to amend the present case, but would have to begin again by filing a new federal habeas petition which will be given a new civil case number. For all the foregoing reasons, the Court dismisses this case without prejudice and without leave to amend. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 1/12/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc)
December 14, 2010 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING Second Amended Petition Without Prejudice: To proceed with this case, Petitioner must, no later than 1/31/2010, file a Third Amended Petition which cures the pleading deficiencies outlined in this Order. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 12/14/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service; per Order, a blank 2254 Third Amended Petition form also was sent to Petitioner.) (mdc)
November 23, 2010 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING First Amended Petition Without Prejudice: Petitioner may file a Second Amended Petition no later than 12/15/2010 in conformance with this Order. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 11/23/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service; per Order, a blank 2254 Second Amended Petition also was sent to Petitioner.) (mdc)
October 27, 2010 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE Without Prejudice: The Court dismisses this case without prejudice due to Petitioner's failure to name a proper respondent, failure to state grounds for relief in the Petition and failure to use a court-approved form. Petit ioner may file a First Amended Petition no later than 12/15/2010 in conformance with this Order. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 10/27/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service; per Order, a blank 2254 Amended Petition form also was mailed to Petitioner.) (mdc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. State of California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Steven Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of California
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: California Department of Corrections
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Atascadero State Hospital
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?