O'M and Associates, LLC et al v. Ozanne et al

Plaintiff: O'M and Associates, LLC, Preserve Capital, LLC and MBM Settlements, LLC
Defendant: Brendan K Ozanne, Brian C Dawson, Dawson & Ozanne, Mattew Stoen and Kodiak Family, LLC
Case Number: 3:2010cv02130
Filed: October 13, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Ruben B. Brooks
Presiding Judge: Marilyn L. Huff
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 21, 2011 212 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 122 Motion to Certify; granting 138 Motion to Quash; withdrawing 150 Motion to Dismiss; granting 190 Motion to Dismiss; denying 206 Motion to Continue; granting 209 Motion to Withdraw; granting 141 Motion to Dismiss as to Counts II, III, IV, V, VII, VII and X of the FAC and Counts III and VIII are dismissed with prejudice. Amended complaint due 11/06/11. Service on Kodiak Family Trust on or before 12/06/11. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 09/21/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cge)
June 1, 2011 177 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying defendant Matthew Stoen's 120 Amended Motion for Order to Show Cause why Plaintiffs and/or Peter Hilger should not be held in contempt of court for violation of the January 3, 2011 protective order. Plaintiffs' request that the Court strike the Amended Motion for Order to Show Cause is also denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 06/01/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cge) (mam).
March 15, 2011 123 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Defendant Matthew Stoen's 104 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 3/15/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rlu)
February 25, 2011 113 Opinion or Order of the Court TENTATIVE ORDER Regarding Defendant Matthew Stoen's Motion to Dismiss and Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint; (2) ORDER Denying as Moot Ex Parte Motion for Shortened Time. If Defendants wish to oppose this tentative order, rec ognizing that leave to amend is freely granted, Defendants are directed to do so on or before March 4, 2011. In light of this schedule, the Court also denies as moot Plaintiff's request for setting the motion for leave to amend for March 14, 2011. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 2/25/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jer)
November 2, 2010 37 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum Decision Granting Limited Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 11/2/2010.(ag) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'M and Associates, LLC et al v. Ozanne et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: O'M and Associates, LLC
Represented By: Patrick C. Keeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Preserve Capital, LLC
Represented By: Patrick C. Keeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MBM Settlements, LLC
Represented By: Patrick C. Keeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brendan K Ozanne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian C Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawson & Ozanne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mattew Stoen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kodiak Family, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?