Khast v. Washington Mutual Bank et al

Plaintiff: Kaveh Khast
Defendant: Washington Mutual Bank, JP Morgan Chase Bank, California Reconveyance Company and DOES
Case Number: 3:2010cv02168
Filed: October 18, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Jan M. Adler
Presiding Judge: Irma E. Gonzalez
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 16, 2011 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendants' 18 Motion to Dismiss. Pla's claims under the Real Estate Settlement Procedures Act for an accounting, for breach of implied warranties under California's Consumer Legal Remedies Act and for declaratory judg ment are dismissed with prejudice. Pla's claims under the Truth in Lending Act and Federal Fair Debit Collection Procedures Act are dismissed without prejudice. Pla's remaining claims under California State law are dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff may file an Amended Complaint w/in 20 calendar days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 3/16/2011. (jah)
December 9, 2010 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's (1) Motion for Preliminary Injunction and 4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 12/9/2010. (jah)
October 26, 2010 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiff's 1 Motion for TRO. Defendants are ordered to refrain from foreclosing upon and selling Pla's home until Court holds a hearing on whether a preliminary injunction should issue. Pla shall serve this Order upon Dfts . Defendants shall file a responsive pleading by 11/3/2010. Motion Hearing re Pla's request for preliminary injunction set for 11/10/2010 03:00 PM in Courtroom 01 before Judge Irma E. Gonzalez. Clerk instructed to mail copies of this Order to J P Morgan Bank and Washington Mutual Bank. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 10/26/2010. (cc: Certified copy of this Order mailed to JP Morgan and Washington Mutual at address as listed in Order) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jah). Modified on 10/26/2010 - Corrected spelling (jah).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Khast v. Washington Mutual Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaveh Khast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Mutual Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Reconveyance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?