Lomax v. Canlas et al
Plaintiff: Peter Romero Lomax
Defendant: Tyler, Robert J Hernandez, Silva,, Farinas, John Lubisich, K L Hawthorne, Canlas, Matthew Kate, N Grannis, E Franklin, Choo, Jayasundara, Medical Authorization Review Committee, Whitehead, Lehv, E Romero and G Cassesi
Case Number: 3:2010cv02226
Filed: October 26, 2010
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: William Q. Hayes
Presiding Judge: William McCurine
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER: The Report and Recommendation is ADOPTED in its entirety. (Doc. 91 ). The Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. (Doc. 73 ). Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Lehv are dismissed without leave to amend. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 5/22/2013. (Pro se plaintiff was electronically served.) (mdc)
September 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER: The Report and Recommendation (Doc. 62 ) is ADOPTED in its entirety. The Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Lubisich (Doc. 54 ) is GRANTED without leave to amend. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 9/4/2012. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc)
February 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER: The Report and Recommendation (Doc. 43 ) is adopted in its entirety. The Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's claims against Defendants Jayasundra, Franklin, Romero, Grannis, Cate, and Hernandez is granted with leave to amend. The Motion to Dis miss Plaintiff's claim for monetary damages against all defendants in their official capacities is granted with prejudice. No later than 60 days from the date of this Order, Plaintiff may file an amended complaint. If Plaintiff does not file an amended complaint within 60 days from the date of this Order, this case shall proceed as to the claims in the Complaint which remain after this Order. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 2/9/2012. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc)
December 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Granting In Part And Denying In Part Plaintiff's Motion For Order To Compel (Re Doc. 31 ): The Court denies Plaintiff's request to find the Defendants in contempt. The Court grants Plaintiff's motion to compel and orders Defenda nts' counsel to provide the forwarding address for Defendants Cate, Lehv, Farinas, Grannis, Hawthorne, Lubisich, and Cassesi to the U.S. Marshal in a confidential memorandum indicating that the summons and complaint is to be delivered to that ad dress. The Defendants' counsel shall provide the U.S. Marshal with any such information on or before 12/30/2011. Within 45 days of receipt of any available address from the Defendants' counsel, the Court orders the U.S. Marshal to serve a c opy of Plaintiff's Complaint and summons upon defendants Cate, Lehv, Farinas, Grannis, Hawthorne, Lubisich, and Cassesi. The Clerk of the Court provide a copy of: (1) the Court's 12/07/2010 Service Order (Doc. 4 ); (2) this Order; (3) the Complaint, summons and a blank U.S. Marshal Form 285 to Defendants' counsel for purposes of reattempting service as to Cate, Lehv, Farinas, Grannis, Hawthorne, Lubisich, and Cassesi. Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 12/15/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service; package of documents, as directed by this Order, was mailed to defendants' attorneys.) (mdc)
December 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER (1) Granting Plaintiff's Motion To Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Imposing No Initial Partial Filing Fee And Garnishing Balance From Prisoner's Trust Account Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(a); And (2) Directing U.S. Marshal To Effect Service Of Complaint Pursuant To Fed.R.Civ.P. 4(c)(3 And 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(d). Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 12/7/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service; Order electronically transmitted to Matthew Cate, Secretary CDCR; IFP package prepared.) (mdc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lomax v. Canlas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Romero Lomax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silva,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farinas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Lubisich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K L Hawthorne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canlas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Kate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N Grannis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Choo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jayasundara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Authorization Review Committee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lehv
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G Cassesi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?