Rivera v. Uribe et al

Plaintiff: Ricardo Rivera
Defendant: D Uribe, James Napolitano and Able Zamora
Case Number: 3:2010cv02245
Filed: October 28, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Del Norte
Presiding Judge: Larry Alan Burns
Referring Judge: Bernard G. Skomal
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 6, 2012 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 13 , ORDER OF DISMISSAL. This action is dismissed without leave to amend. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 3/5/12.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kaj)
July 21, 2011 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Requiring Supplemental Briefing. Defendants shall file a Supplemental Memorandum of Points and Authorities and any supporting declarations or evidence on or before 8/8/2011. Plaintiff shall file a Supplemental Opposition to any matters raised in Defendant's Supplemental Memorandum of Points and Authorities on or before 8/26/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 7/21/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
December 6, 2010 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, and Imposing Initial Partial Filing Fee of $127.07 and Garnishing Balance from Prisoner's Trust Account, and Directing U.S. Marshal to Effect Service of Comp laint. Defendants are ordered to reply to Plaintiffs Complaint within the time provided by the applicable provisions of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(a). (Order electronically transmitted to Matthew Cate, Secretary CDCR). Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 12/6/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(IFP package prepared)(kaj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rivera v. Uribe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Uribe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Napolitano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Able Zamora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?