Tucker v. Brown

Petitioner: William T Tucker
Respondent: G Brown
Case Number: 3:2010cv02272
Filed: November 3, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: William Q. Hayes
Referring Judge: Bernard G. Skomal
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 12, 2012 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) denying Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus; (2) denying Request for Evidentiary Hearing; and (3) denying certificate of appealability. The Clerk shall enter judgment in favor of Respondent and close the file. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 6/12/2012.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
March 24, 2011 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Sua Sponte Substituting Respondent: Added Matthew Cate, Secretary. Terminated G. Brown and T. Virga. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 3/24/11.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rlu)
February 18, 2011 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Motion For Appointment Of Counsel (Re Doc. 6 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 2/18/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc)
November 8, 2010 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE Without Prejudice: The Petition is dismissed without prejudice due to Petitioner's failure to satisfy the filng fee requirement and failure to name a proper Respondent. If Petitioner wishes to proceed with this case, he mus t submit, no later than 1/3/2011, a copy of this Order with the $5.00 fee or with adequate proof of his inability to pay the fee and a First Amended Petition which names a proper Respondent. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 11/8/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service; per Order, blank 2254 First Amended Petition and IFP forms also were mailed to Petitioner.) (mdc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tucker v. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: William T Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: G Brown
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?