Sajfr et al v. BBG Communications, Inc et al

Plaintiff: Vlastimil Sajfr and David Keeports
Defendant: BBG Communications, Inc and DOES
Case Number: 3:2010cv02341
Filed: November 12, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Santa Clara
Referring Judge: William V. Gallo
Presiding Judge: Janis L. Sammartino
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 18, 2011 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice Motions to Compel 76 - 89 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 11/18/11. (cge)
March 15, 2011 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 10 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 3/15/11. (rlu)
February 25, 2011 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Denying 16 Motion to Appoint Counsel ;and Denying 15 Motion to Consolidate Cases. After due consideration and exercising its sound discretion, the Court denies without prejudice Plaintiff's motion to consolidate this case with Case No. 10-CV-542 and motion to appoint class counsel. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 2/25/2011. (leh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sajfr et al v. BBG Communications, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vlastimil Sajfr
Represented By: Alan McQuarrie Mansfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Keeports
Represented By: Alan McQuarrie Mansfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BBG Communications, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?