Singson v. Kernan et al

Plaintiff: Ronald W Singson
Defendant: Scott Kernan, George Neotti, E Marrero, D R Morris, Brandt, W Norman, Ivy Choo, Arnold Schwarzenegger, W Suglich, L Romero, J Clark Kelso and Seeley
Case Number: 3:2010cv02362
Filed: November 15, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: William Q. Hayes
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 23, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Report and Recommendation is ADOPTED (Doc. 40 ), and the Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED (Doc. 34 ). The sole remaining claims in this action are claims for damages against Defendants Marrero and Suglich. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 4/23/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc)
January 26, 2012 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion For Order Directing U.S. Marshal To Effect Service Of Process Pursuant To Fed.R.Civ.P. 4(c)(2) (Re Doc. 20 ): Within 60 days of this order, Plaintiff must serve Defendants with a copy of the Complaint and Summon s. If Plaintiff fails to serve Defendants within sixty days, the Court will dismiss this action pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m). Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 1/26/2012. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc)
August 22, 2011 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The (Doc. 12 ) motion for confirmation of proof of service is denied. The Clerk of the Court shall strike the proofs of service (Docs. 9 , 10 ) from the record. The Court grants Plaintiff an extension of 60 days from the date of this Order to effect proper service upon Defendants. If Plaintiff fails to serve Defendants within sixty days, the Court will dismiss this action pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m). Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 8/22/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc)
April 11, 2011 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Dismissing Defendants Kernan, Neotti, Morris, Brandt, Norman, Choo, Schwarzenegger, Romero, Kelso and Seeley: The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate these Defendants from the docket. The Clerk of Court is further directed to issue a summons as to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint upon Defendants Marrero and Suglich and shall forward it to Plaintiff. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 4/11/11.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lmt) (jcj).
January 12, 2011 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) Denying Motion For Appointment Of Counsel; And (2) Dismissing Complaint For Failure To State A Claim Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. Section 1915A: Plaintiff is granted 45 days leave from the date this Order is "Filed" in which to file a First Amended Complaint which cures all the deficiencies of pleading noted. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 1/12/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singson v. Kernan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald W Singson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Kernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Neotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E Marrero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D R Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W Norman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ivy Choo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arnold Schwarzenegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W Suglich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Clark Kelso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?