Henry v. California Department of Corrections

Petitioner: Kenneth Redell Henry
Respondent: California Department of Corrections
Case Number: 3:2010cv02398
Filed: November 19, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: William V. Gallo
Presiding Judge: Janis L. Sammartino
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 6, 2012 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) ADOPTING 27 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and (2) Dismissing Case: the Petition is DISMISSED without prejudice to his refiling a federal petitioncontaining only exhausted claims. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 3/6/12.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lmt)
January 7, 2011 9 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Reopening Case and Setting Briefing Schedule - Motion to Dismiss due 2/28/11 and Opposition to Motion due 3/30/11 OR Answer by Respondent due 3/15/2011 and Traverse by Petitioner due 4/14/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 1/7/11.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service; Atty General served nef)(lmt)
December 20, 2010 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) granting Motion to Proceed IFP and (2) DISMISSING CASE without prejudice: The Court dismissed the Petition without prejudice due to Petitioner's failure to name a proper respondent. To have this case reopened, Petitioner must file a Fi rst Amended Petition no later than 1/24/11 in conformance with this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to send Petitioner a blank First Amended Petition along with a copy of this Order. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 12/20/10.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service; form sent)(lmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henry v. California Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kenneth Redell Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: California Department of Corrections
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?