Sea Prestigio, LLC v. M/Y Triton et al

Plaintiff: Sea Prestigio, LLC
Defendant: M/Y Triton, Spearfish Ventures, Ltd., FBP Investments , LP, James P Baldwin, Nancy L Baldwin, Cachal Investments, S. De R.L. De C.V. and DOES 1-10
Case Number: 3:2010cv02412
Filed: November 23, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Anthony J. Battaglia
Presiding Judge: Barry Ted Moskowitz
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 6, 2014 174 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 155 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 2-6-14. (cjb)
April 11, 2011 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re 44 Application to Stay. Defendants' application to stay the federal action is granted. The parties are ordered to file a status report regarding the state action every three months from the day this order is filed and to immediately inform the Court upon a judgment in that action. The parties are further ordered to appear before this Court on May 4, 2011 at 2:00 pm for a status conference regarding the condition of the vessel. The parties' motions for summary judgment [d ock. # 57, 58] are denied as premature.Motions for summary judgment, if appropriate, may be re-filed after the stay is lifted. The Court excepts from the stay settlement conferences before the magistrate judge, which shall proceed at such time as the magistrate judge sets or as requested by the parties. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 4/11/11. (jer) (jcj).
December 22, 2010 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 26 Motion to Vacate Order of Arrest. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 12/22/10. (lao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sea Prestigio, LLC v. M/Y Triton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sea Prestigio, LLC
Represented By: William Edward Dysart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/Y Triton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spearfish Ventures, Ltd.
Represented By: John Peter Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FBP Investments , LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James P Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy L Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cachal Investments, S. De R.L. De C.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?