Smith v. Small et al

Petitioner: Christopher Dale Smith
Respondent: Larry Small and Jerry Brown, -
Case Number: 3:2010cv02429
Filed: November 24, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Presiding Judge: Larry Alan Burns
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 18, 2014 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Petitioner's Motion for Reconsideration (ECF No. 42 ). Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 8/18/2014. (cxl)
June 26, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: (1) Overruling Petitioner's Objections; (2) Approving And Adopting 31 Report and Recommendation in its entirety; And (3) Denying Petition For Writ Of Habeas Corpus. Because reasonable jurists would not find the Court's assessment of the claims debatable or wrong, Court declines to issue a certificate of appealability. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 6/26/2014.(jah)(jrd)
March 28, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court TRANSFER ORDER. It is hereby ordered that this case be transferred from the calendar of the Honorable Nita L. Stormes, to the calendar of the Honorable Jill L. Burkhardt, for all further proceedings. All conference or hearing dates set before Magist rate Judge Stormes, if any, are VACATED and will be rescheduled before Magistrate Judge Burkhardt. Any dates set before any district judge remain unchanged. The new case number is 10cv2429 LAB (JLB). Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 03/28/14.(jcj)
December 31, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 30 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 12/31/13. (kaj)
December 13, 2011 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Certificate of Appealability. In light of the above standards, the Court finds that a certificate of appealability is warranted in this case. Small's 13 motion is therefore GRANTED. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 12/13/2011. (Order electronically transmitted to US Court of Appeals). (akr)
November 10, 2011 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 8 . Small's 7 Motion to Dismiss is granted. Smith's habeas petition is dismissed with prejudice for failure to comply with the one-year statute of limitations set by AEDPA. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 11/9/11.(kaj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Small et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Christopher Dale Smith
Represented By: Charles Roger Khoury, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Larry Small
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jerry Brown, -
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?