Bracamontes v. Moya et al

Plaintiff: Christian Bracamontes
Defendant: John Doe, John and Jane Does, Moya, Lopez and Lizarraga
Case Number: 3:2010cv02512
Filed: December 3, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Marilyn L. Huff
Referring Judge: Nita L. Stormes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 3, 2011 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Doc. 28 Motion for Injuctive Relief. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 8/3/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
April 29, 2011 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 15 Motion for Reconsideration of 12 Motion for Discovery and Directing Service on Defendant Moya. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 4/29/11. (Sent forms as directed) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (cc: Marshal)(rlu) Modified text on 4/29/2011 (rlu).
January 14, 2011 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying As Moot (Doc. 3 ) Motion to Accept Complaint in Format Submitted; Denying (Doc. 4 ) Ex Parte Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief; Granting (Doc. 2 ) Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; and Directing United States Marshal To Effect Service. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 1/14/2011. (Order electronically transmitted to Matthew Cate, Secretary CDCR)(IFP Package prepared) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (srm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bracamontes v. Moya et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lizarraga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Bracamontes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?