Stevenson v. Blake et al
Plaintiff: Genghis Khan Ali Stevenson
Defendant: Gregory Blake, John Doe and Jane Doe
Case Number: 3:2011cv00103
Filed: January 18, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Larry Alan Burns
Presiding Judge: William V. Gallo
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER denying plaintiff's 60 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 1/16/13. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kaj)
August 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 48 DISCOVERY ORDER. Plaintiff's objection is sustained and the matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge to reevaluate the issue under the correct legal standard. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 8/9/12. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kaj)
May 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying plaintiff's 8 motion for appointment of counsel and ordering defendants' attorney to provide the forwarding addresses of defendant Gregory Blake to the U.S. Marshal in a confidential memorandum indicating that the summonses and Complaint are to be delivered to that address. Defendants' attorney shall provide the U.S. Marshal with any such information on or before June 13, 2011. Within thirty (30) days of receipt of any available address from Defendants' attorn ey, the Court orders the U.S. Marshal to serve a copy of Plaintiff's Complaint and summons upon Defendant Gregory Blake. The Clerk of the Court to provide a copy of this Order, the Complaint, summons and blank U.S. Marshal Form 285 to Defendants' attorney for purposes of re-attempting service as to Defendant Gregory Blake. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 5/11/11 (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(IFP package mailed to State Attorney General)(kaj)
April 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; the Secretary of California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, or his designee, shall collect from Plaintiff's prison trust account the $350 balance of the filing fee owed in this case by collecting monthly payments from the account in an amount equal to twenty percent (20%) of the preceding month's income and forward payments to the Clerk of the Court each time the amount in the account exceeds  6;10 in accordance with 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(2); denying without prejudice 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel; US Marshal shall effect service of complaint; (Order electronically transmitted to Matthew Cate, Secretary CDCR); Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 4/3/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(IFP package prepared)(kaj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stevenson v. Blake et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Genghis Khan Ali Stevenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?