Estate of Anastacio Hernandez-Rojas et al v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Estate of Anastacio Hernandez-Rojas, Daniel Hernandez, Daniela Hernandez, Fabian Hernandez, Yeimi Hernandez and Daisy Hernandez
Defendant: United States of America and DOES 1-50
Case Number: 3:2011cv00522
Filed: March 16, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: M. James Lorenz
Presiding Judge: Nita L. Stormes
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 402 ORDER Granting 401 Joint Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Louisa S Porter on 5/30/2017. (knb)
December 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 372 ORDER Denying 334 Motion to Find Appeal Frivolous; Denying as moot 362 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 12/30/2015. (rlu)
September 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 325 ORDER denying 145 , 146 , 147 , 151 , 152 , 153 , 184 , 185 , 197 , 201 Motions for Summary Judgment. It is further Ordered that the parties shall jointly contact the chambers of Magistrate Judge Bartick within three days of the filing of this Order to schedule a mandatory settlement conference. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 9/29/2014. (sjt)
July 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 324 ORDER denying 306 Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 7/24/2014. (sjt)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 312 ORDER denying 165 Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Answer and for Default Judgment; and for a Finding of Liability. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 12/12/2013. (sjt)
September 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendant's 148 Motion to Dismissand/or to Strike Portions of the Third Amended Complaint. Specifically, the Court dismisses without prejudice the seventh cause of action. Furthermore, the Court denies without prejudice Plaintiffs' request for leave to amend the seventh cause of action. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 9/24/2013. (knb)
September 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER Regarding PROTECTIVE ORDER. It is hereby Ordered that the requirement that the parties use the star numbering system for Defendant V325 shall nolonger apply. Signed by Magistrate Judge David H. Bartick on 9/9/2013.(sjt)
November 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER Denying without Prejudice Defendants' 91 Motion for Stay of Discovery Pending the Conclusion of Grand Jury Proceedings. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 11/7/2012. (sjt)
April 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting 10 Ex Parte Motion Appointing Daisy Hernandez as Successor in Interest to the Estate of Anastacio Hernadez-Rojas. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 4/18/2011. (mtb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estate of Anastacio Hernandez-Rojas et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Anastacio Hernandez-Rojas
Represented By: Eugene G Iredale
Represented By: Guadalupe Valencia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Hernandez
Represented By: Eugene G Iredale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniela Hernandez
Represented By: Eugene G Iredale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fabian Hernandez
Represented By: Eugene G Iredale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yeimi Hernandez
Represented By: Eugene G Iredale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daisy Hernandez
Represented By: Eugene G Iredale
Represented By: Guadalupe Valencia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?