Gregory v. Uribe et al
Plaintiff: VanTrae Gregory
Defendant: Domingo Uribe, Jr., J J Denault, L Valenzuela, J Sais and A Hernandez
Case Number: 3:2011cv01952
Filed: August 5, 2011
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: William Q. Hayes
Presiding Judge: Bernard G. Skomal
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Sua Sponte Dismissing First Amended Complaint For Failing To State A Claim Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. Sections 1915(e)(2) And 1915A(b): Plaintiff is granted 45 days leave from the date this Order is "Filed" in which to file a Second Amende d Complaint which cures all the deficiencies of pleading noted. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 2/3/2012. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service; per Order, a blank 1983 Second Amended Complaint form also was mailed to Plaintiff.) (mdc)
October 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER (1) Granting Motion To Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Imposing No Initial Partial Filing Fee, Garnishing $350 From Prisoner's Trust Account (Re Doc. 4 ); And (2) Sua Sponte DISMISSING Complaint For Failing To State A Claim Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. Sections 1915(e)(2) and 1915A(b): The Secretary CDCR, or his designee, is ordered to collect from prison trust account the $350 balance of the filing fee owed in this case by collecting monthly payments from the trust account in an amoun t equal to 20% of the preceding month income credited to the account and forward payments to the Clerk of the Court each time the amount in the account exceeds $10 in accordance with 28 USC 1915(b)(2). Plaintiff is granted 45 days leave fro m the date this Order is "Filed" in which to file a First Amended Complaint which cures all the deficiencies of pleading noted. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 10/12/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service; per Order, a blank 1983 First Amended Complaint form also was mailed to Plaintiff; Order electronically transmitted to Matthew Cate, Secretary CDCR.) (mdc)
September 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Denying Motion To Proceed In Forma Pauperis And Dismissing Case Without Prejudice Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(a) (Re Doc. 2 ): Plaintiff is granted an additional 45 days from the date of this Order to either: (1) pay the entire $35 0 filing fee, or (2) file a new Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis as indicated. If Plaintiff neither pays the $350 filing fee in full nor sufficiently completes and files the Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, this action shall remain closed without further Order of the Court. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 9/1/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service; per Order, a blank IFP Motion form also was sent to plaintiff.) (mdc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gregory v. Uribe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VanTrae Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Domingo Uribe, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J J Denault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L Valenzuela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Sais
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?