Williams v. Paramo et al
Plaintiff: Lonnie Williams
Defendant: Daniel Paramo, R. Olson, E. Marrero and Los Angeles County
Case Number: 3:2012cv00113
Filed: January 12, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Ruben B. Brooks
Presiding Judge: Barry Ted Moskowitz
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER Dismissing Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Failing to State a Claim, as Frivolous (ECF No. 126 ). In addition, because the Court finds further amendment futile, leave to amend is denied. The Clerk shall enter judgment and close the file. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 2/7/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mxn)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 131 MINUTE ORDER Denying 130 Ex Parte Application to Vacate Trial Dates and All Trial Related Dates. The Court construes Defendants' Ex Parte Application as a Motion to Vacate the Trial and all Trial-Related Dates and sets the motion for a hearing on 2/13/2018 at 10:00 a.m. Williams may file an opposition to the motion by 2/9/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 1/30/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mxn)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 123 MINUTE ORDER Denying without Prejudice Plaintiff's 96 Motion for Compliance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 11/30/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mxn)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER Granting Defendants' 67 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; dismisses Plaintiff's California state law libel and slander claims with prejudice and without leave to amend; and grants Plaintiff thirty (30) days leave in which to file an Amended Complaint that addresses the Eighth Amendment, Fourteenth Amendment, and conspiracy claims only. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 11/27/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mxn)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motions for Preliminary Injunction (ECF Nos. 99 , 101 , 105 ). Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 11/6/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mxn)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER Denying 74 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 9/7/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mxn)
September 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER: (1) Denying Plaintiff's 31 Motion for Reconsideration; and (2) Denying Defendants' 32 Ex Parte Motion to Strike as Moot. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 9/3/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rlu)
March 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Providing Plaintiff Notice of Defendants' 24 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Pursuant to Wyatt v. Terhune and Setting Briefing Schedule. Plaintiff, if she chooses, may file an Opposition, and serve it upon Defendants' coun sel of record no later than 3/22/2013. Defendants may file a Reply no later than 3/29/2013. Motion Hearing set for 4/5/2013 at 11:00 AM before Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz. Unless otherwise ordered, no appearances are required on the date set for hearing, and no oral argument will be held. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 3/4/2013.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rlu)
April 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER (1) Granting 2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis, imposing no initial filing fee and garnishing $350.00 balance from inmates's trust account; and (2) Dismissing defendant without Prejudice for failing to state a claim pursuant t o 28 U.S.C. §§ 1915(e)(2)(b) & 1915A(b). Defendant County of Los Angeles is Dismissed from this action without prejudice for failing to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Plaintiff has thirty (30) days to either: (1) no tify the Court of his intention to proceed with the claims that the Court has determined survive the sua sponte screening process; or (2) file an amended complaint which addresses the deficiency of pleading noted. (Order electronically transmitted to Matthew Cate, Secretary CDCR). Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 4/23/12. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ecs)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Paramo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lonnie Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Paramo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Marrero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Los Angeles County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?