Ameranth, Inc. v. Domino's Pizza, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ameranth, Inc.
Defendant: Domino's Pizza, LLC and Domino's Pizza, Inc.
Counter_claimant: Domino's Pizza, Inc. and Domino's Pizza, LLC
Counter_defendant: Ameranth, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv00733
Filed: March 27, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Janis L. Sammartino
Presiding Judge: Nita L. Stormes
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 183 Order Granting Ameranths Motion for Issuance of a Final and Appealable Amended Judgment 177 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b). Signed by Chief District Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 11/18/2021. (zda)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER on Domino's Pizza, LLC and Domino's Pizza, Inc.'s Request for Fees and Costs. Signed by Chief District Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 6/21/2021.(mme)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER Denying 142 Ameranth's Motion for Reconsideration, Or in the Alternative, Request for Certification of Interlocutory Appeal. Signed by Chief District Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 5/10/2021. (mme)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER (1) Denying Ameranth's 84 Motion to Retax Costs and (2) Granting In Part and Denying In Part Domino's 90 Motion to Retax Costs. Signed by Chief District Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 3/4/2021. (mme)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 141 Notice and Order for Settlement Conference. Settlement Conference set for 4/7/2021 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 2/17/2021.(mme)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER Granting In Part 112 Defendant's Second Renewed Motion to Declare Case Exceptional and Award Attorney Fees and Non-Taxable Costs. As part of their motion, the Dominos Defendants requested fees for the CBMs and Appeals, but the Court decl ines to resolve that issue in the present order. Rather, the parties should address whether those fees are reasonable in their briefing on the amount of fees and costs to be awarded. Dominos shall file its opening brief on that issue on or before March 5, 2021. Ameranth shall file its opposition brief on or before March 19, 2021, and Dominos shall file its reply brief on or before March 26, 2021. Signed by Chief District Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 2/5/2021. (mme)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ameranth, Inc. v. Domino's Pizza, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ameranth, Inc.
Represented By: William J Caldarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Domino's Pizza, LLC
Represented By: Frank A. Angileri
Represented By: Thomas W. Cunningham
Represented By: Stephen S Korniczky
Represented By: Rebecca S Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Domino's Pizza, Inc.
Represented By: Frank A. Angileri
Represented By: Thomas W. Cunningham
Represented By: Stephen S Korniczky
Represented By: Rebecca S Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Domino's Pizza, Inc.
Represented By: Frank A. Angileri
Represented By: Thomas W. Cunningham
Represented By: Stephen S Korniczky
Represented By: Rebecca S Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Domino's Pizza, LLC
Represented By: Frank A. Angileri
Represented By: Thomas W. Cunningham
Represented By: Stephen S Korniczky
Represented By: Rebecca S Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Ameranth, Inc.
Represented By: William J Caldarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?