Multimedia Patent Trust v. Apple Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Multimedia Patent Trust
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Counter_claimant: Apple Inc.
Counter_defendant: Multimedia Patent Trust
Case Number: 3:2012cv02135
Filed: August 29, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Karen S. Crawford
Presiding Judge: Marilyn L. Huff
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2012 Filing 15 ANSWER to 12 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Apple by Multimedia Patent Trust.(Hutnyan, Diane) (ag)
October 1, 2012 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Sidford L Brown on behalf of Multimedia Patent Trust (Brown, Sidford) (ag).
September 21, 2012 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Apple Inc.. (Garner, Lara) (ag).
September 21, 2012 Filing 12 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Multimedia Patent Trust by Apple Inc..(Garner, Lara) (ag).
September 10, 2012 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Curran M. Walker on behalf of Multimedia Patent Trust (Walker, Curran) (ag).
September 10, 2012 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Diane Cafferata Hutnyan on behalf of Multimedia Patent Trust (Hutnyan, Diane) (ag).
September 10, 2012 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick A. Lorig on behalf of Multimedia Patent Trust (Lorig, Frederick) (ag).
September 10, 2012 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Anthony Mathews on behalf of Multimedia Patent Trust (Mathews, Christopher) (ag).
September 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE. Case reassigned to Judge Marilyn L. Huff and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford for all further proceedings. Judge John A. Houston and Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler no longer assigned to case. Create association to 3:10-cv-02618-H-KSC. The new case number is 12-CV-2135-JAH (JMA). Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 09/04/2012. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 08/31/2012.(ag) (jrl).
September 6, 2012 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Multimedia Patent Trust. Apple Inc. served. (Zisser, Bruce) (ag).
August 30, 2012 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Multimedia Patent Trust of case(s) 3:10-cv-2618 re 1 Complaint, . (Zisser, Bruce) Modified on 8/30/2012 to reflect low number order prepared for 10CV2618-H(KSC). (jpp).
August 30, 2012 Filing 4 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Multimedia Patent Trust re 1 Complaint, (Zisser, Bruce) (jpp).
August 30, 2012 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) *5,500,678* cc:USPTO (dls) (av1).
August 30, 2012 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (dls) (av1).
August 29, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Apple Inc. (filing fee $350 receipt number 0974-5091804), filed by Multimedia Patent Trust. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Case Cover Sheet).The new case number is 3:12-cv-2135-JAH-JMA. Judge John A. Houston and Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler are assigned to the case. (Zisser, Bruce)(dls) (av1).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Multimedia Patent Trust v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Multimedia Patent Trust
Represented By: Diane Cafferata Hutnyan
Represented By: Frederick A. Lorig
Represented By: Christopher Anthony Mathews
Represented By: Curran M. Walker
Represented By: Bruce R Zisser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Lara Sue Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Lara Sue Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Multimedia Patent Trust
Represented By: Diane Cafferata Hutnyan
Represented By: Frederick A. Lorig
Represented By: Christopher Anthony Mathews
Represented By: Curran M. Walker
Represented By: Bruce R Zisser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?