Veasley et al v. United States of America et al

Plaintiff: B. Veasley and Mildred Veasley
Defendant: United States of America and DOES 1 through 20
Case Number: 3:2012cv03053
Filed: December 21, 2012
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: William V. Gallo
Presiding Judge: William Q. Hayes
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1346 Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 12, 2016 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiffs are entitled to judgment in their favor against the United States. Status Conference set for 9/8/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom 14B before Judge William Q. Hayes. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 8/12/2016.(knb)
October 15, 2015 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine #1 (Dkt # 50 ) is denied without prejudice. Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine #2 (Dkt # 51 ) is granted. Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine #3 (Dkt # 52 ) is denied without prejudice. Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine #4 (Dkt # 53 ) is denied without prejudice. Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine #5 (Dkt # 54 ) is granted. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 10/15/2015. (mdc)
March 9, 2015 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER On Plaintiffs' Oral Request To Reopen Expert Discovery: This Court denies Plaintiffs' request to reopen expert discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 3/9/2015. (mdc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Veasley et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B. Veasley
Represented By: Randall R. Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mildred Veasley
Represented By: Randall R. Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?