Mireles et al v. Paragon Systems Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Walter Bullock, Gregorio Escobedo, Barry Feldman, Manny Garcia, Anthony Jenkins, Maritza Ladron, James Bennett, Robert Nowoseilski, Gustavo Rivera, Vernon Tennis, Alfonso Dominguez, Jeffrey Easley and Cruz Mireles
Defendant: Paragon Systems Inc. and Does 1 thru 50, inclusive
Case Number: 3:2013cv00122
Filed: January 16, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: M. James Lorenz
Presiding Judge: Bernard G. Skomal
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER denying 66 Motion to Certify Class. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 9/8/2014. (sjt)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER granting 63 Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Plaintiffs first and third causes of action are dismissed; and Plaintiffs claims under Labor Code § 2802, failure to indemnify, are dismissed against plaintiffs Bennett, Escobedo, Bullock, Garcia, Easley and Garcia only. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 9/4/2014. (sjt)
June 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER denying 92 Motion to File Second Amended Complaint. Plaintiff Robert Nowosielski is Dismissed with Prejudice from this action; and Barry Feldman and Vernon Tennis will no longer serve as named party plaintiffs but will remain members of the class. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 6/16/2014. (sjt)
February 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting 77 Ex Parte Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order. It is hereby Ordered that the April 16, 2013 scheduling order is modified to allow Plaintiffs to file their motion for leave to amend the First Amended Complaint no later than February 18, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 2/11/2014. (sjt)
July 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER denying 34 Plaintiffs motion to strike Defendants 28th, 29th, and35th affirmative defenses in the First Amended Answer. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 7/8/2013. (sjt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mireles et al v. Paragon Systems Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Bullock
Represented By: Andrew Cole Myers
Represented By: Matthew B Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregorio Escobedo
Represented By: Andrew Cole Myers
Represented By: Matthew B Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Feldman
Represented By: Andrew Cole Myers
Represented By: Matthew B Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manny Garcia
Represented By: Andrew Cole Myers
Represented By: Matthew B Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Jenkins
Represented By: Matthew B Butler
Represented By: Andrew Cole Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maritza Ladron
Represented By: Matthew B Butler
Represented By: Andrew Cole Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Bennett
Represented By: Matthew B Butler
Represented By: Andrew Cole Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Nowoseilski
Represented By: Matthew B Butler
Represented By: Andrew Cole Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gustavo Rivera
Represented By: Matthew B Butler
Represented By: Andrew Cole Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vernon Tennis
Represented By: Matthew B Butler
Represented By: Andrew Cole Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfonso Dominguez
Represented By: Andrew Cole Myers
Represented By: Matthew B Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Easley
Represented By: Andrew Cole Myers
Represented By: Matthew B Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cruz Mireles
Represented By: Andrew Cole Myers
Represented By: Matthew B Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paragon Systems Inc.
Represented By: Caryn M. Anderson
Represented By: John Kevin Lilly
Represented By: Sherry B Shavit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 thru 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?