Thermolife International, LLC v. Myogenix Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Thermolife International, LLC
Defendant: Myogenix Corp., GNC Corporation, General Nutrition Centers, Inc. and General Nutrition Corporation
Case Number: 3:2013cv00651
Filed: March 19, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Mitchell D. Dembin
Presiding Judge: Janis L. Sammartino
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 335 ORDER (1) Denying Thermolife's Request for a Stay of Judgment Without Bond; (2) Granting Plaintiffs a Temporary Stay. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 2/21/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 316 ORDER Granting Defendants' Applications for Attorneys' Fees. The Court awards Vital: $387,813.14. This does not include pre-judgment or post-judgment interest. The Court awards Hi-Tech $867,814.59. This does not include pre-judgment or post-judgment interest. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 1/8/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 315 ORDER: (1) Granting Defendant's 292 Motion to Strike; and (2) Denying Plaintiffs' 288 289 Motion for Reconsideration. The Court strikes the portions of the Declaration of Tyler Woods, (ECF No. 288-2), and the exhibits that were not pr esented to the Court prior to the present Motion (paragraph 2-4 (Exhibits A-C); and paragraph 6-16 (Exhibits E-O).) The Court also strikes all portions of Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration (ECF Nos. 288, 289) which rely on or reference these exhibits. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 10/23/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER (1) Striking Plaintiffs' Late-Filed Declaration And (2) Granting Defendants' 246 , 253 Motion for Attorney Fees. It is ordered that the Court concludes that under the totality of the circumstances defendants have shown that this case is exceptional such that an award of attorney fees is justified. In particular, plaintiffs' pre-filing investigation was severely lacking, thus resulting in frivolous claims and the objective unreasonableness of certain infringement con tentions; plaintiffs' motivation was seemingly to extract nuisance-value settlements from a large number of defendants; and awarding fees here will advance compensation- and deterrence- oriented goals. The Court therefore grants defendants' motions for attorney fees. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 4/4/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dxj)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 242 Memorandum Decision and ORDER Finding (1) Certain Claims Invalid as Anticipated; and (2) Certain Claims Invalid as Obvious. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 9/21/2016.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kcm)
July 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER (1) granting in part and denying in part 209 Plaintiff's Motion In Limine and (2) denying 210 Defendant's Motion In Limine/Daubert Motion. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 7/22/2016.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kcm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thermolife International, LLC v. Myogenix Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thermolife International, LLC
Represented By: Tyler J. Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Myogenix Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GNC Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Nutrition Centers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Nutrition Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?