Compass Bank v. Morris Cerullo World Evangelism

Plaintiff: Compass Bank
Defendant: Morris Cerullo World Evangelism
Case Number: 3:2013cv00654
Filed: March 19, 2013
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: William V. Gallo
Presiding Judge: John A. Houston
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Account Receivable
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 10, 2015 330 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 323 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 12/9/15. (dlg)
November 13, 2015 326 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Certifying Facts Related to Defendant's 271 Motion for Contempt Against Jack Wilksinson. Dft's request that Court recommends that the District Judge impose an additional $6,519.00 in monetary sanctions for Dft's continued efforts to collect from Court's prior Order, and recommend that Court levy a $2,000.00 fine against Mr. Wilkinson as part of a contempt finding and in order to deter further defiance of this Court's orders, is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 11/13/2015. (jah)
October 20, 2015 319 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's 301 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 10/20/2015. (jah)
August 28, 2015 299 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFAULT JUDGMENT granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's 298 Motion for Default Judgment Against Christopher Hammatt. Judgment entered in favor of Christopher Hammatt against Morris Cerullo World Evangelism (MCWE) on MCWE's promissory estoppel and fraud claims, and in favor of Morris Cerullo World Evangelism against Christopher Hammatt in the amount of $3,500,000.00 on the breach of contract and conversion claims. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 8/28/2015. (jah)
August 26, 2015 295 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW AND RESULTING JUDGMENT. Judgment entered in favor of Morris Cerullo World Evangelism (MCWE) in the amount of $998,000 against Larry Sorenson on MCWE's fourth count for conversion. Judgment entered in favor of Compass Bank (BBVA) against MCWE on MCWE's first count for breach of contract. Judgment entered in favor of BBVA and Sorenson and against MCWE on MCWE's third count for promissory estoppel. Judgment entered in favor of Larry Sorens on against MCWE on MCWE's fifth count for fraud. Judgment entered in favor of Larry Sorenson against MCWE for MCWE's sixth count from fraud. Judgment entered in favor of BBVA against MCWE on BBVA's declaratory relief action. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 8/25/2015. (jah)
May 28, 2015 178 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendant's 133 Motion for Sanctions Against Jack Wilkinson. Court awards Dft the amount of $12,496.00 in attys fees and costs pursuant to FRCP 37, in accordance with Appendix A. Dft is to coordinate with Mr. Wilkinson regarding payment of this sanction by 6/3/2015, and Mr. Wilkinson shall submit payment to Dft by 7/31/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 5/28/2015. (jah)
May 27, 2015 177 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's 158 Motion to Compel Discovery and Request for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 5/27/2015. (jah)
May 8, 2015 166 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendant's 109 Motion for Evidentiary and Monetary Sanctions Against Plaintiff. Court finds that Pla wilfully engaged in the spoliation of relevant evidence, and that Pla has demonstrated a pattern of recalcitrant behavior duri ng discovery in this litigation. Dft's request for an adverse inference jury instruction is granted. Court also finds that monetary sanctions are appropriate under Rule 37 and Court's inherent authority. The amount of monetary sanctions imp osed against Pla will be determined after Court's review of Dft's detailed time calculations and Declaration(s), and after Pla has had the opportunity to respond. Pla's response shall be filed by 6/5/2015. Pla's request for attorneys' fees is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 5/8/2015. (jah). Modified on 5/8/2015 - Corrected text. Regenerated NEF (jah).
December 22, 2014 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 84 Ex Parte Motion to Continue. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 12/22/2014. (knb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Compass Bank v. Morris Cerullo World Evangelism
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Compass Bank
Represented By: Ronald E Darling
Represented By: Deborah S. Gershon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris Cerullo World Evangelism
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?