Gregory v. San Diego, County of et al

Plaintiff: Patricia A. Gregory
Defendant: San Diego, County of, William D. Gore, Jennifer Montiel and Does 1 through XX
Case Number: 3:2013cv01016
Filed: April 29, 2013
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Jan M. Adler
Presiding Judge: William Q. Hayes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 28, 2015 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint is granted. (Doc. 41 ). The Third Amended Complaint is dismissed with prejudice. The Court will direct the clerk to close the case. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 4/28/2015. (mdc)
January 7, 2015 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint is granted. (Doc. 35 ). Plaintiff shall file the proposed third amended complaint attached to the motion within ten (10) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 1/7/2015. (mdc)
May 14, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint is GRANTED. (ECF No. 22 ). The First Amended Complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice. No later than thirty (30) days from the date this Order is filed, Plaintiff may file a motion for leave to fi le a second amended complaint, accompanied by a proposed second amended complaint. If Plaintiff fails to timely file a motion for leave to file a second amended complaint, this case shall remain closed without further order of the Court. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 5/14/2014. (mdc)(Modified on 5/15/2014 - Corrected text re capitalization and spacing issues; NEF was regenerated.)(mdc)(jrd)
January 13, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint is granted. (Doc. 17 ). Plaintiff shall file the proposed first amended complaint attached to the motion within ten days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 1/13/2014. (mdc)
October 15, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Motion to Dismiss is granted. (Doc. 10 ). The Complaint is dismissed without prejudice. No later than 30 days from the date this Order is filed, Plaintiff may file a motion for leave to file a first amended complaint, accompanied by a pro posed first amended complaint. If Plaintiff fails to timely file a motion for leave to file a first amended complaint, this case shall remain closed without further order of the Court. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 10/15/2013. (mdc) Modified on 10/15/2013 - Pro se plaintiff was electronically served. (mdc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gregory v. San Diego, County of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia A. Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Diego, County of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William D. Gore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Montiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through XX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?