Parts.Com, LLC v. Google Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Parts.Com, LLC
Defendant: Google Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv01074
Filed: May 6, 2013
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Janis L. Sammartino
Referring Judge: William McCurine
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 3, 2014 36 REPORT of Patent and Trademark Closing, regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) 3,500,783, re 35 Clerk's Judgment. cc:USPTO (ag)
June 25, 2014 35 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Court grants Google's motion to dismiss Parts.com's FAC in its entirety. This Order concludes the litigation in this matter.(jao)
June 25, 2014 34 Featured Case ORDER Granting 21 Motion to Dismiss The First Amended Complaint. The Court grants Google's motion to dismiss Parts.com's FAC in its entirety. This Order concludes the litigation in this matter. The Clerk shall close the file. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 6/25/2014. (jao)
June 23, 2014 33 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (Motion Hearing) held on 6/12/2014, before Judge Janis L. Sammartino. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Gayle Wakefield. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 7/14/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/24/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/22/2014. (akr)
June 12, 2014 32 Minute Order for proceedings held before Judge Janis L. Sammartino : Hearing on Motion to Dismiss 21 held and taken under submission; Court to issue written order (Court Reporter/ECR Gayle Wakefield / CRD A Ramos / Plaintiff Attorney James V. Fazio / Defendant Attorney Margaret M. Caruso) (no document attached) (acr)
June 2, 2014 31 Featured Case ORDER Resetting Motion Hearing as to 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Google's Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint. Presently before the Court is Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint. (ECF No. 21). The motion hearing set for June 6, 2014 is hereby reset for June 12, 2014 at 2:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 6/2/2014.(jao)
May 16, 2014 30 Featured Case ORDER Resetting Motion Hearing as to 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Google's Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint. The motion hearing set for May 22, 2014 is hereby reset for June 6, 2014 at 2:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 5/16/2014.(jao)
April 8, 2014 29 Featured Case ORDER Resetting Motion Hearing as to 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Google's Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint. Although the Court previously vacated the motion hearing that was set for March 13, 2014 and took this matter under submission, (ECF No. 27), the Court finds, upon further review, that a hearing is needed to address several issues raised by the parties' briefing. Accordingly, the Court sets a hearing on Googles motion to dismiss for May 22, 2014 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 4/8/2014.(jao)
March 28, 2014 28 Featured Case TRANSFER ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following listed cases are transferred from the calendar of the Honorable Jan M. Adler to the calendar of the Honorable Jill L. Burkhardt for all further proceedings. All conference or hearing dates set before Magistrate Judge Adler, if any, are VACATED and will be rescheduled before Magistrate Judge Burkhardt. Any dates set before any district judge remain unchanged. After this transfer, the case number should be changed to reflect Magistrate Judge Burkhardt's initials. Therefore, in all case numbers, the (JMA) that appears after the case number should be changed to (JLB) to ensure all documents are properly routed. The new case number is 13cv1074JLS(JLB). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 3/28/2014.(jao)
February 24, 2014 27 Featured Case ORDER Vacating Hearing re 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Google's Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint. The hearing set for the Motion on March 13, 2014 is hereby vacated, and the matter is taken under submission without oral argument pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1.d.1. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 2/24/2014.(jao)
February 20, 2014 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Google's Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Fitzpatrick, # 2 Declaration Lloyd)(Caruso, Margaret) (jao).
February 14, 2014 25 Featured Case ORDER Granting 24 Joint Motion to Continue Hearing Date. Good cause appearing, the parties' Joint Motion is granted. The February 27, 2014 hearing is hereby continued to 1:30 p.m. on Thursday, March 13, 2014. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 2/14/2014. (jao)
February 13, 2014 24 Joint MOTION to Continue the Hearing Date for Google's Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint by Google Inc.. (Caruso, Margaret) (jao).
February 13, 2014 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Google's Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint filed by Parts.Com, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Proof of Service)(Fazio, James) (jao).
January 31, 2014 22 Transfer Order. It is hereby ordered that the following listed cases are transferred from the calendar of the Honorable William McCurine, Jr. to the calendar of the Honorable Jan M. Adler for all further proceedings. The new case number is 13cv1074-JLS(JMA). All future conference or hearing dates set before Magistrate Judge McCurine, if any, are vacated and will be rescheduled before Magistrate Judge Adler. Counsel will contact the Chambers of Judge Adler to reschedule any conferences of hearings within five days of the entry of this Order. Any dates set before the District Judge remain unchanged. Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 1/31/2014. (jao)
January 17, 2014 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Google's Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Caruso, Margaret) (jao).
January 8, 2014 20 Featured Case ORDER Granting Second Joint Motion to Extend Defendant Goolge Inc.'s Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the First Amended Complaint 19 . Defendant shall have up to and including January 17, 2014 to respond to the FAC. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 1/8/2014. (vam)
January 3, 2014 19 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Second Joint Motion to Extend Defendant Google Inc.'s Time To Answer Or Otherwise Respond To The First Amended Complaint by Google Inc.. (Caruso, Margaret) (jao).
January 3, 2014 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Trevor Quick Coddington on behalf of Parts.Com, LLC (Coddington, Trevor)Attorney Trevor Quick Coddington added to party Parts.Com, LLC(pty:pla) (jao).
December 23, 2013 17 Featured Case ORDER granting 16 Joint Motion to Extend Defendant Google Inc.'s Time to Answer or otherwise Respond to the First Amended Complaint. Defendant shall have up to and including January 10, 2014 to respond to the First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 12/23/2013. (aef)
December 20, 2013 16 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to First Amended Complaint by Google Inc.. (Caruso, Margaret) (aef).
December 18, 2013 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Google Inc., filed by Parts.Com, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Proof of Service) (Fazio, James) (jao).
December 4, 2013 14 Featured Case ORDER Granting 9 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. The Court grants Defendant's Motion to Dismiss in its entirety. Dismissal of claims 1, 2, and 5 is without prejudice. Because the laches determination was exceedingly close, and because the appropriateness of laches is such a fact-specific inquiry, it is possible that Plaintiff may be able to allege additional facts sufficient to plead plausible claims to rebut this finding. Dismissal of claims 3, 4, and 6, however, is with prejudice. If Plaintiff wishes, it shall file an amended complaint within fourteen days of the date on which this Order is electronically docketed. Failure to file an amended complaint by this date may result in dismissal of this case with prejudice. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 12/4/2013. (jao)
September 20, 2013 13 Featured Case ORDER Vacating Hearing. The hearing set for the motion on Thursday, September 26, 2013 is hereby vacated, and the matter is taken under submission (ECF 9 ). Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 9/20/2013.(knb) (jrl).
August 22, 2013 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Google Inc.. (Caruso, Margaret) (jao).
August 15, 2013 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Parts.Com, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proof of Service)(Fazio, James) (jao).
July 12, 2013 10 Featured Case ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim : A hearing on the motion is currently set for September 26, 2013. Plaintiff Parts.com, LLC shall file an opposition on or before August 15, 2013. Defendant Google Inc. shall file a reply on or before August 22, 2013. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 7/12/2013.(jao)
July 5, 2013 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration of Margret Caruso, # 3 Exhibit 1 of Caruso Declaration)(Caruso, Margaret) (jao).
June 4, 2013 8 Featured Case ORDER Granting 6 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall have up to and including July 5, 2013 to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 6/4/2013. (jao)
May 31, 2013 7 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Google Inc. (Caruso, Margaret) (jao).
May 31, 2013 6 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Google Inc.(Caruso, Margaret) (jao).
May 21, 2013 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Parts.Com, LLC. Google Inc. served. (Fazio, James) (jao).
May 6, 2013 4 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (dlg) (cap).
May 6, 2013 3 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Parts.Com, LLC (dlg) (cap).
May 6, 2013 2 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) *3,500,783* cc:USPTO (dlg) (cap).
May 6, 2013 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Google Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0974-5875653), filed by Parts.Com, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:13-cv-1074-JLS-WMC. Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr. are assigned to the case. (Fazio, James)(dlg) (cap).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parts.Com, LLC v. Google Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parts.Com, LLC
Represented By: James V Fazio, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc.
Represented By: Margaret M. Caruso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?