Gardner v. Cafepress Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Steven M. Gardner
Defendant: Cafepress Inc. and Beverly Teall
Case Number: 3:2013cv01108
Filed: May 8, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Jan M. Adler
Presiding Judge: Gonzalo P. Curiel
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER: (1) Granting In Part and Denying In Part 100 Plaintiff's Motion to Consolidate and to Set New Scheduling Dates; (2) Vacating Hearing Date. Plaintiff's Motion to Consolidate is Granted as to consolidation and Denied as to schedu ling dates; Gardner I, No. 3:13-cv-1108-GPC-JLB, and Gardner II, No. 3:14-cv-792-GPC-JLB, are CONSOLIDATED; The parties are directed to file a joint motion with the magistrate judge to obtain new scheduling dates by 1/16/2015; Plaintiff is directed to file a consolidated complaint by 2/6/2015; and the hearing set for 12/19/2014, is Vacated. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 12/16/2014. (srm)
December 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER: (1) Granting In Part and Denying In Part 96 CafePress Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment on Liability of Alternatively, for Partial Summary Judgment on Damages; (2) Granting 128 CafePress Inc.'s Motion to Strike; (3) Vacating Hearing Date. It is Ordered that ECF Nos. 124 and 125 are Stricken and the hearing set for December 5, 2014, is Vacated. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 12/4/2014. (srm)
September 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER Granting In Part and Denying In Part 54 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint; (2) Vacating Hearing Date. Plaintiff Shall File an amended complaint with the causes of action specified in his Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint and cure any deficiencies noted by October 10, 2014; and The hearing set for September 26, 2014 is Vacated. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 9/25/2014. (srm)
March 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Resetting Mandatory Settlement Conference. Mandatory Settlement Conference reset for 4/7/2014 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 3/11/2014.(knb)
February 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Denying 15 Defendant CafePress Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment and Granting CafePress Inc.'s Alternative Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's Rule 56(d) request is Denied as moot. The hearing on set for February 28, 2014, is Vacated. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 2/26/2014. (srm)(jrd)
November 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Granting In Part 18 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion to Continue Briefing Schedule and Hearing on 15 Motion for Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing reset for 2/28/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2D before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Responses due by 1/24/2014, Replies due by 2/7/2014. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 11/19/2013. (srm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gardner v. Cafepress Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cafepress Inc.
Represented By: Ian Charles Ballon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Teall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven M. Gardner
Represented By: Darren James Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?