Tapia v. Zale Delaware Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Naomi Tapia
Defendant: Zale Delaware Inc. and Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Case Number: 3:2013cv01565
Filed: July 3, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: Imperial
Presiding Judge: William Q. Hayes
Presiding Judge: Nita L. Stormes
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER Granting 115 Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis on 4/18/2017. (knb)
July 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER denying Defendant's 85 Motion to Decertify Class; denying Defendant's 86 Motion to Stay Dissemination of Class Notice. The parties shall appear for oral argument of the cross motions for summary judgment 78 , 89 . Oral Argument set for 12/12/2016 02:30 PM before Judge Cynthia Bashant. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 7/25/2016. (jah)
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 44 Motion to Certify Class. Court certifies two classes: 1) all current and former hourly employees of Zale Delaware Inc. dba Zale Corporation who were designated by Zale as nonexempt and who worked in California an y time between 7/3/2009 and the trial of this matter; and 2) all current and former hourly employees of Zale Delaware Inc. dba Zale Corporation who were designated by Zale as nonexempt and who worked in the United States any time between 7/3/2010 and the trial of this matter. Court appoints Naomi Tapia as the respresentative and the Sullivan Law Group, APC as the class counsel. Court denies as moot Pla's 55 Motion to File Supplemental Authority and to Submit a Copy of the Expert's Resume. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 4/6/2016. (jah)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tapia v. Zale Delaware Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naomi Tapia
Represented By: Lara Ann Prodanovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zale Delaware Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?