Hangingout, Inc. v. Google, Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Hanginout, Inc.
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv02811
Filed: November 26, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: John A. Houston
Presiding Judge: Nita L. Stormes
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. § 44
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting 59 Joint Motion for Modification of Case Schedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 12/1/14. (cge)
November 25, 2014 Filing 59 Joint MOTION Modification of Case Schedule by Google, Inc.. (Caruso, Margaret) (cxl).
September 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting 56 Joint Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 9/12/14. (cge)
September 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ESI PROTOCOL ORDER re 56 Joint MOTION for Production of Electronically Stored Information (ESI) Protocol filed by Google, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 9/12/14.(cge)
September 10, 2014 Filing 56 Joint MOTION for Protective Order , Joint MOTION for Production of Electronically Stored Information (ESI) Protocol by Google, Inc. (Caruso, Margaret) (cge).
August 12, 2014 Filing 55 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (Motion Hearing) held on 4/25/2014, before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Frank J. Rangus. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 9/2/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/12/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/10/2014. (akr)
August 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 54 SCHEDULING ORDER Regulating Discovery and Other Pre-Trial Proceedings. Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 10/14/2015 at 09:30 AM in the chambers of Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/22/2015. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/8/2016 at 01:30 PM before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia.Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 8/8/2014.(cxl)
August 8, 2014 Filing 53 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes: Case Management Conference held on 8/8/2014. (Plaintiff Attorney Andrew Skale). (Defendant Attorney Margaret Caruso, Cheryl Galvin). Scheduling order to issue.(no document attached) (ecp)
July 30, 2014 Filing 52 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Hanginout, Inc. re 51 Order, Set Hearings (Wagner, Benjamin) (cxl).
June 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Setting Rule 26 Compliance, and Notice of Telephonic Case Management for for 8/8/2014 at 11:00AM before Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 6/26/14.(cge)
June 25, 2014 Filing 50 ANSWER to 14 Amended Complaint by Google, Inc.(Caruso, Margaret) (cge).
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting 47 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Google, Inc. answer to First Amended Complaint due 6/25/2014. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 6/16/14. (cge)
June 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER: The case did not settle. The court will issue a scheduling order upon the filing of the answer.(no document attached) (ecp) (Modified text to remove signatory information on 6/13/2014) (cge).
June 9, 2014 Filing 47 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Google, Inc. (Caruso, Margaret) (cge).
June 5, 2014 Filing 46 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes: Settlement Conference held on 6/5/2014. Counsel to advise the court by Wednesday, June 11, whether they accept the court's settlement recommendation.(Plaintiff Attorney Andrew Skale). (Defendant Attorney Margret Caruso). (no document attached) (ecp) (cge).
May 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Setting Voluntary Settlement Conference for 6/5/2014 at 2:30PM before Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes. Briefs due 5/30/14. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 5/23/14.(cge)
May 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER (Redacted) denying 12 Hanginout's Motion for Preliminary Injunction; and denying 23 Google's Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim. Google must file an answer to the operative complaint no later than thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 5/12/14. (cge)
April 25, 2014 Filing 42 COURT EXHIBIT LIST. (ymm)
April 25, 2014 Filing 41 Minute Order for proceedings held before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia:Motion Hearing held on 4/25/2014. Court takes motions under submission. Submitting [12-1] Motion for Preliminary Injunction; Submitting [23-1] Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (Court Reporter/ECR Frank Rangus). (Plaintiff Attorney Andrew D. Skale, Justin Nahama, Ben Wagner).(Defendant Attorney Margaret M. Caruso). (no document attached) (ymm)
April 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Granting Hanginout's Ex Parte 37 Motion to Seal Portions of Reply in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 4/7/2014. (rlu)
April 4, 2014 Filing 38 [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 4/8/14] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 37 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Skale, Andrew) (rlu). (Main Document 38 replaced on 4/8/2014) (rlu). Modified on 4/8/2014 to add file date of lodgment (rlu).
April 4, 2014 Filing 37 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Skale, Andrew)(rlu).
April 4, 2014 Filing 36 REPLY to Response to Motion re 12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Hanginout, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ben L. Wagner In Support of Preliminary Injunction, # 2 Appendix of Exhibits to Declaration of Ben Wagner, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit 12, # 15 Exhibit 13, # 16 Exhibit 14, # 17 Exhibit 15, # 18 Exhibit 16, # 19 Exhibit 17, # 20 Exhibit 18)(Skale, Andrew) (cge).
April 4, 2014 Filing 35 REPLY to Response to Motion re 23 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Lodgment of Non-Electronic Exhibit, # 2 Declaration of Margret M. Caruso, # 3 Exhibit 1 to Caruso Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 2 to Caruso Declaration, # 5 Proof of Service)(Caruso, Margaret)(cge).
March 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Granting Google Inc.'s 28 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 3/24/2014. (rlu)
March 24, 2014 Filing 32 NOTICE by Google, Inc. re 31 Objection (Caruso, Margaret) (cxl).
March 21, 2014 Filing 31 **DOCUMENT WITHDRAWN PER 32 ** OBJECTION by Google, Inc. re 12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Objections to Declaration and Exhibits Filed In Support Thereof. (Caruso, Margaret)(cxl).
March 21, 2014 Filing 30 RESPONSE in Opposition re 12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Lodgment of Non-Electronic Exhibits, # 2 Declaration of Andrew Abrams, # 3 Table of Exhibits, # 4 Exhibit 1, # 5 Declaration of Serge Lachapelle, # 6 Declaration of Margret Caruso, # 7 Table of Exhibits, # 8 Exhibit 1, # 9 Exhibit 2, # 10 Exhibit 3, # 11 Exhibit 4, # 12 Exhibit 5, # 13 Exhibit 6, # 14 Exhibit 7, # 15 Exhibit 8, # 16 Exhibit 9, # 17 Declaration of Matthew Leske, # 18 Table of Exhibits, # 19 Exhibit 1, # 20 Exhibit 2, # 21 Exhibit 3, # 22 Exhibit 4, # 23 Declaration of Ellery Long, # 24 Table of Exhibits, # 25 Exhibit 1, # 26 Exhibit 2, # 27 Exhibit 3, # 28 Exhibit 4, # 29 Exhibit 5, # 30 Proof of Service)(Caruso, Margaret) (cxl).
March 21, 2014 Filing 29 [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 3/24/2014] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 28 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Caruso, Margaret)(rlu). (Main Document 29 replaced on 3/25/2014) (rlu). Modified on 3/25/2014 to add file date of lodgment (rlu).
March 21, 2014 Filing 28 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Caruso, Margaret) (rlu).
March 21, 2014 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re 23 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Hanginout, Inc.. (Skale, Andrew) (cxl).
March 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 25 Second Joint Motion to Modify Briefing and Hearing Schedule on Plaintiff's 12 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Responses due by 3/21/2014. Replies due by 4/4/2014. Motion Hearing rescheduled to 4/25/2014 at 2:00PM before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 3/7/14. (cge)
March 6, 2014 Filing 25 Joint MOTION to / Modify Briefing and Hearing Schedule on Hanginout, Inc.'s Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Hanginout, Inc. (Skale, Andrew) (cge).
March 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge Battaglia, Set briefing schedule as to 23 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Opposition due by 3/21/2014, Reply due by 4/4/2014, no sur-replies will be filed. Motion Hearing set for 4/25/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 3B before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia.(no document attached) (sc)(cge).
February 28, 2014 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Google, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Caruso, Margaret) (cge).
February 27, 2014 Filing 22 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes: Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 2/27/2014. (Plaintiff Attorney Andrew Skale, Ben Wagner). (Defendant Attorney Margret Caruso). Case did not settle.(no document attached) (ecp) (cge).
February 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting 20 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant has until February 28, 2014 to file an answer or otherwise contact the Courts law clerk to calendar a hearing date for a 12(b)(6) motion. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 02/12/2014. (yeb)
February 11, 2014 Filing 20 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Dismiss by Google, Inc.. (Caruso, Margaret) (yeb).
February 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting 18 Joint Motion for Modification of Briefing and Hearing Schedule Regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Responses due by 3/13/2014, Replies due by 3/20/2014. Motion Hearing set for 3/27/2014 at 4:00PM in Courtroom 3B before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia.Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 2/5/14. (cge)
February 4, 2014 Filing 18 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition and Reply to Hanginout's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction by Google, Inc.. (Caruso, Margaret) (yeb).
January 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting 16 Joint Motion and Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. The court received a Joint Motion to hold, in advance of the normal timeline, an Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. For good cause shown, the court Grant the motion. It is ordered that an Early Neutral Evaluation will be held on February 27, 2014 at 2:30 p.m. in the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 1/31/2014. (cxl)(av1).
January 31, 2014 Filing 16 Joint MOTION for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference by Hanginout, Inc. (Skale, Andrew)(cge).
January 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER finding as moot 9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in light of the amended complaint. (no document attached) (sc) (cge).
January 28, 2014 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Google, Inc., filed by Hanginout, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C) (Wagner, Benjamin)(yeb). No new parties added, no new summons requested or issued.
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge Battaglia, Set briefing schedule as to 12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Oppositions due by 2/5/2014, Replies due by 2/12/2014, no sur-replies will be filed. Motion Hearing set for 3/13/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 3B before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia.(no document attached) (sc)
January 22, 2014 Filing 12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Hanginout, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration of Justin Malone, # 3 Notice of Lodgment of Non-Electronic Exhibits Submitted, # 4 Table of Exhibits to Declaration of Justin Malone, # 5 Exhibit 1 , # 6 Exhibit 2, # 7 Exhibit 3, # 8 Exhibit 4 , # 9 Exhibit 5 , # 10 Exhibit 6 , # 11 Exhibit 7, # 12 Exhibit 8, # 13 Exhibit 9, # 14 Exhibit 10, # 15 Exhibit 11, # 16 Exhibit 12, # 17 Exhibit 13, # 18 Exhibit 14, # 19 Exhibit 15, # 20 Exhibit 16, # 21 Exhibit 17 , # 22 Exhibit 18 , # 23 Exhibit 19 , # 24 Exhibit 20, # 25 Exhibit 21, # 26 Exhibit 22, # 27 Exhibit 23, # 28 Exhibit 24 , # 29 Exhibit 25, # 30 Exhibit 26, # 31 Exhibit 27, # 32 Exhibit 28, # 33 Exhibit 29, # 34 Exhibit 30, # 35 Exhibit 31, # 36 Proof of Service)(Skale, Andrew) (Modified to remove excess text on 1/24/2014) (cge).
January 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge Battaglia, Set briefing schedule as to 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Opposition due by 1/28/2014, Replies due by 2/11/2014, no sur-replies will be filed. Motion Hearing set for 3/13/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 3B before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia.(no document attached) (sc)
January 14, 2014 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge John A. Houston recuses from this case and requests another District Judge be assigned. This case has been randomly reassigned to Judge Anthony J. Battaglia for all further proceedings. Pending hearings previously set before the original Judge have been transferred to the newly assigned Judge The new case number is 13cv2811-AJB(NLS).(no document attached) (jsp)
January 10, 2014 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration of Margret M. Caruso, # 3 Exhibit 1 to Caruso Declaration)(Caruso, Margaret)Attorney Margaret M. Caruso added to party Google, Inc.(pty:dft) (kaj).
January 10, 2014 Filing 8 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Google, Inc. (Caruso, Margaret). (jah).
December 27, 2013 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hanginout, Inc.. Google, Inc. served. (Skale, Andrew) (jpp).
December 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting 5 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Google, Inc. answer due 1/13/2014.. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 12/18/13. (jpp)
December 17, 2013 Filing 5 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by Hanginout, Inc.. (Skale, Andrew) (jpp).
November 26, 2013 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hanginout, Inc. (dlg) 3 (cap). Modified on 11/27/2013 (dlg).
November 26, 2013 Filing 3 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (dlg) (cap).
November 26, 2013 Filing 2 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) *85674799*, *85916316* cc:USPTO (dlg) (cap).
November 26, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Google, Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0974-6538453), filed by Hanginout, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:13-cv-2811-JAH-NLS. Judge John A. Houston and Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes are assigned to the case. (Skale, Andrew)(dlg) (cap). Modified on 11/27/2013 (dlg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hangingout, Inc. v. Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hanginout, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew D Skale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?