Schutza et al v. San Diego, City of et al
Plaintiff: Scott Schutza and John Karczewski
Defendant: San Diego, City of, Air California Adventure, Inc. and DOES 1-10
Case Number: 3:2013cv02992
Filed: December 12, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Presiding Judge: Karen S. Crawford
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER on Request to Stay Execution of Judgment [Doc. Nos. 122 , 128 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 4/30/2018. (jjg)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 112 AMENDED CLERK'S JUDGMENT. IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED: The Court finds the requested fees are reasonable, and grants Plaintiffs' motion for attorneys' fees in the amount of $83,120 and $6,478 in costs. The Court also awards $12,000 in statutory damages to each of the Plaintiffs for the three violations of the Unruh Act. It is So Ordered. (jjg)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 111 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED: The Court finds the requested fees are reasonable, and grants Plaintiffs' motion for attorneys' fees inthe amount of $83,1203 and $6,478 in costs. The Court also awards $12,000 in statutory damages to each of the Plaintiffs for the three violations of the Unruh Act. It is So Ordered. (jjg)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER on Motion for Attorneys' Fees [Doc. No. 104 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 7/24/2017. (jjg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schutza et al v. San Diego, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Schutza
Represented By: Mark D. Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Karczewski
Represented By: Mark D. Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Diego, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air California Adventure, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?