In Re: Incretin Mimetics Products Liability Litigation
Plaintiff: Sandra M. Sanders, Mike Sisson, Sonia Greene-Smith, Dorothy Panko, Debroah C. Mahoney, Irene Pyles, Ernestine Dickason, Leona Howard, Daniel Stark, Shirley Anderson, Nancy Butler, Crystal Breshears, James Barr, Cornell Stewart, Gloria Salamanca, Katherine Cancio, Kevin Van Kampen, Michael Greene, Johnnie Briggs, Samuel Foltz, Angela Payne, Harriet M. Bellanfant, Thomas Stevens, Juan Rosario, Charisma Shelton, Scellar Barnett, Deborah Wells, Carmel Haughton, Leonard Bringer, Miranda Hawkins, Marvolene S. Smith, Tracy Emmert, John Jacobs, Junious Jones, Lawrence Bertolino, Carole Brailey Seastrom, Elizabeth Breeding, James Victor Rodriguez, Susan A. Carson, Mary Campbell, Alex Barwick, Victoria Kurtz, Jan Wright, Lois Young, Michael D. Mahoney, Joyce E. Booth, Elizabeth Sloan, Georgia Lee Smith, Ann M. Nicometi, Thomas Zimmermann, Frank Di Matteo, Suzanne Cole, Shirley Wadford, Daniel Alloway, Estrelita Francia, Linda Escarciga, George Richard Seastrom, Louis K. Kelekolio, Jr., Debbie Medlin, Personal Representative of Estate of Mark Medlin, Sidney L. Salcido, Dixie Savage, Sharon Linamen, Lisa Veit, Sharon Foye, Mike MaGatz, Individually and as Successor-in-Interest of the Estate of Consetta MaGatz, deceased, William Lester, Michelle Anapolsky, Patricia Turner, Stanley Mrocka, Vicki Wolz, Michael A Morrow, Willene Gardner, Dick Alcala, Darlene Sederquist, James Morgan, Danitta Rinder, Earl Bartlett, Stephanie James, Lynn M. Frye, Andrew Cook, Mrs. Janice Seamon, Roger Hall, Robert Weaver, Josephine Reese, Jeanne Cichanski, Roosevelt Morris, Sr., Stella Pinkney Jones, Matthew Cavallo, Janice Matar, Mary Lee, Selestino Lovato, Rodolfo L. Martinez, Cynthia Richardson, Maria Gonzalez, Greg Henson, Janice E. Ray, Mary Jo Andrews, The Estate of Maria Benedicta Luna, Mark Rup, Sharon Goldwire, Colleen M. Jones, Neva Bean, Uretha Gilmer, Syliva L. Smith, Rick A. Parks, Linda Smith, Larita Jones, Cynthia Diane Latham, Phillip Evans, Maria Fedorczyk, Phronia Owen, Eugene Tesnear, Bobby Campbell, Marion Thomas, Brian Gauthier, Diane Kadunce, Irene Nieve Rodriguez, Shelby Jean McKinnon, Kathy Hager, Patricia Burchfield, Sherry Brookshire, Kathryn Groves, Sonia Sutton, Mark Thomas, ., George Washabaugh, Fred O'Quinn, Christine Premura, Joann Wiseman, Sheila Farr, Doug Yelton, Lucas Ojeda, Anthony Tatulli, Dorothy Young, Donna Bennett, Toby A. Aichelman, Wilma McIntyre, Mary Gregory, Wilson Peter Graham, Jr., Marion Morgan, Harry Schweinsberg, Jerry Clay Davis, Jacquelyn R. Cinquemani, Vicki L. Grady, Carol Cyrus, Daniel Utt, Gina Ervin, Erin Williams, Susan James, Ineatha Cummings, Carrie Cook, Debra Gilliam, Maria Gomez, Carla Lepine, Marilyn Brockschmidt, Agustin Martinez, Howard Jones, Richard W. Mahoney, Edith Magnabigon, Ralph Luntzer, Jr., Dianne Pinney, Herbert Howard, Rose M. Waffle, Beth Smith Incardona, Elaine Bacopoulos, L'Queniia Haugabook, Kathryn Yox, Susan Cherian, Ronald M. Cegelski, JR., Genevieve S. Price, Nicholas Dukellis, MaryAnne Falsone, Christopher Benjes, Melinda Ortega, Jane Hentzell, Kari Williams, Lawrence Thompson, Melinda McKenzie, Ms. Mickey Hyter, Deborah Warne, Rebecca Richard, Janet Johnson, Saundra Watson, Marvin Hamm, Gloria Kaniecki, Kathleen Knapp, Kathleen Anapolsky, Charles Cook, Jr., Gloria Howell, Antonio Martinez, Harry Smalls, Wilena Harrell, Rebecca Knight, Elaine White-Rowan, Sherrill Ulring, Michael Thompson, Tracy Williams, Roy Allen Vidrine, Clarence Duff, Dawn Hadry, Rhonda Maulden, Marie Mirvil, Mary Ellen Hernandez, Dennis McConaghy, Estate Of Janice Mcdaniel, Charisse Cameron, James Newton, Douglas Yelton, Shannon Byrd, Shirley Upchurch, Dianne Raso, Mark A. Salcido, Carolyn Lynn Fern, Sean Jacobson, Elizabeth O'Bryant, Linda Malinkey, Sherrelle Hinds Ware, Glendon Isaac Somero, Diane M. Celeste, Diane Vallieu, Glen Harriel, Rudolph Williams, Diane Meade, Malcolm Hugh Rann, Pamela Miller, Rajan (Independent Executor) Madassery, Kim Smith, Betty Smith, Leonard Lizen, Peggy Anderson, Fe B. Encina, Joseph McKown, Neil Lodato, Mark Smith, Guenter G. Hertel, Phyllis Gold, Gus Bentivegna, Marie Deronceray, Sharon Hughes, Ronald F. Cook, Nelson Stone, Milton Wayne Cornelius, Catherine Villig-Kaulfers, Rajan Madassery, Leanne Yarbrough, Peggy Hartzog, Karen Sherrill, Beth Pagel, Jackie Prater, Pam Geilhner, Ruby Strysko, Louis M. Salcido, Wanda Lucas, Gerald D. Hill, Robbin Tasler, Estate of David Winfrey, Billy Joseph Prater, Gizella Urmenyi, Sandra Hernandez, Freddie Louise Moyer, Albert Nembhard, Deana Corbin, John Bell, Daniel Curtis, Cathleen A. Rowland-Metz, Shirley Gillis Crow, Individually, Kristy Willingham, Paul Pang, Fidencio Rivas, Lorraine Golden, Michael Washington, Brittany J. Spencer, Personal Representative of the Estate of Colleen M. Jones, Gene Bordelon, Michael Tagget, Jerome Kastle, Frances Murphy, Jeffrey Lynn Walker, Jackie Lafrinere, Kathy M. Montgomery, Doris Parshall, Bruce Anderson, Ms. Tonya Harris, Jane Grinvalsky, John McCue, Ronald Caldemeyer, William E. Bock, Doris E. Corkern, Mary Graves, Kenneth Nosalik, Ruby Livsey, Ronald F. Patton, Deceased, Jennifer Saechou, Nick Mikus, Carol Rup, Eleanore Luongo, Samantha Brengard, Joyce Adams, John Buckley, John Nagel, Kelly Smith Jackson, Randall Cruz, Charles Eldon Taylor, Marilyn Vydra, Esmeralda Angelle, Daniel Meskauskas, McKinley Smith, John Tal, Connie Jeffries, Josephine Reyes, Peggy Miller, Claudia Richardson, Patricia A. Miller, Ben Ferdinand, Norma Kordick, Ross MacPherson, Byron Holder, Tina Harrell, Christopher Rup, Evelyn Parrott, Robert Parkinson, James Owen, Shalee Yocham, Silvana Rossi, Maurine P. Bingham, James B Harris, Kathryn George, Gerald Marsh, Carolyn Winfrey, Harry Carman, Wallace Williamson, Charles Works, Coverston Navy, Michael Kuzmick, William Weber, Barbara Pratt, Iris Fox, Susan Barr, Josefina Valles, Kasey Duval, Kenneth L. Martin, James Gray Gilbert, Jr., William Rosario, Juanita A. Benton, Jean W. Watson, George Matar, Catherine Citrano, Karen Lordi, Ernestine Mejia, Camille Neto, Cornelius McKinley, Susan E. Colby, Barbara Z. Jones, Anthony V. DeGennaro, Marjorie Punk, Joann Cortese, Shirley Vaughn, Brenda McCullough, James Holzbaur, Samantha Figueroa, Danny Lenzi, Marcella Ragonese, Randall Wilhoit, Mary Pardy, Joseph Giuffre, Lucinda Gilbert, Gayle Crim, Tanya Somero, Sean Smith, Margarita G. Herrera, Nancy Sylvainus, Aileen Segerstrom, Cassandra Nickles, Margarita Aguilar, Jodi Alloway, Steven Willingham, Mrs. Esther Beck, Reyna Hernandez, Debbie Maul Campbell, Elizabeth K. Olson, Nabila Tahhan, Christine Mrocka, Donna D. Dunkin, Karen Evans, Dianne Jones, Edward Naufel, Roxanna Cox, frederick meadows, Barbara Lenyard, Thelma Ozburn, Pamela Macedo, Linda Urbina, William B. Parker, Diondra Henry, Jason Blosser, Shirley Foster, Ronald Powers, Jr., Betty Garber, Shirley Ferguson, Jeannette A. Caprio, Judy Wales, Kenneth Loether, Robert Ikemeier, Sharron Dewitt, Daisy Wren, Aaron Johnson, Gayle Smith, Ray Corkern, Teena Reynolds, Mary Meadows, Thomas Jones, Lynette Lofing, Irena Szymczyk, Gail Gilliam, Cheryl Ellefson, Raley's, Pears Foye, Velma Fuller, Judy E. Smith, Irma Jimenez, Elizabeth McDowell, Dennis Woll, Crystal Bingham, Gerald Green, Mary Rowe, Nancy J. Harris, Jean Dorleans, Robert A. Breyer, Jr., Linda Dargis-Giroux, Susan A. Woods, Edward Ladzinski, Jerry Simpson, Joyce Muller, Joanna Sweet, Teresa Stacey, Ruth Ann Sellers, Kerry Owens, John C. Eargle, Jr., Sharon Brown, Roy Wickware, Louis Hicks, John Sawyer, Fayette Thomas, Diane Thorne, Lisa K. Carlson, Russell P Goerger, Meryl D'Amico, Mary Stemler, Peter Neff, Riyad Khoury, Tim Cagle, Theodore A. Johnson, Yolanda Bradford, Kathy Hayes, Eric Cyrus, Donna M. Kruse, Ilka Kelekolio, Shawna Terpstra, Patricia Mahoney, Terry Orlowski, Virginia Augustinack, Carol Goodwin, Brendon Burton, John Malinowski, Doris Dinwiddie, Gail Jensen, Kandyce Johnson, Kelly Jones, Kim Quadrozzi, Karen Thomas, Cheng Sio Saechao, Laura Hanel, Joan Forman, Kristine Cary, Kristen Dos Passos-Krieg, Mary Lilley, Deborah Laureto-Markiewicz, James Vydra, Walter Locke, Joan Allen, Deborah Finn, Eugene John Hrycak, Cynthia Almeida, Theresa Gunderson, Joyce Sue Machan, Marie Anselme, Lorraine Gaines, Joyce Robinson, Stephanie Thomas, Norma McKown, Marie Swenson, Margaret E Adkins, Bernardine Beeson, Anna Karwan, Barry Simon, Brian Levine, Maurice Franke, Carmen De Jesus, Wanda Pumphrey, Carolyn A. Cross, Luis Bautista, Bruce Rininger, Ruby Serrano, Sally Donzelli, Kathy McIntosh, Ronald Hogan, Guy Riley, Brenda Thomason, Mark E. Mohn, William Howard, Alexander Nelson, Irwin Franco, Deborah Swick, Delores Moore, Natahn Fujimoto, Rita Love, William Booth, Carrie Powers, Paul Carter, Reccodo McKinley, Melvin O Johnson, Individually, Sarah Coleman, Janice Wagar, Kandy Pearson, Marty Ward, Craig Ransavage, Wendy Wagner, Donald Hillman, Stanley Shelofsky, Mieczyslaw Szymczyk, Berni Kuzemchakt, Frances Raskin, Polly Davidson, Charlotte Allgaier, J.S., Maxine Breeden, Gloria Derby, Barbara Dashney, Rita Kern, Lucian Baker, Jennifer Hannan, Kim Whitener, Ernest Bruce Knapp, Lois Guptill, Robert Kohlmeyer, Janice Nance, Vera Goodlow, Dorothy Diego, Dan Fulkerson, Michael Matye, James Skazis, Valerie Capito-Mundy, Elaine Hansen, JoAnn Fourkiller, John Conklin, Sabrina Hayes, Shambre Skidmore, Kery Smith, Patricia Swarthout, Baron McKinley, Nancy Sawyer, Carol Richard, Paul R. Soliday, Lance Thompson, Betty J. Hobbs, Lindy Phillips, Elizabeth A. Emch, Angela Gary, Rosewell B. Encina, Georgia Turner, Thomas W. McNeil, Noreen Johnson, Karen Brooks, Marcia Catello, Adela Kitzony, Rosalie Duhon, Mary Peggy Childers-Rann, Sharon Mitchell, Beverly Jean Patton, Mary Lou Mullen, Salvatore Piscione, Lloyd Heggs, Beth A. Barker, Judy Gomez, William F McBride, Jeffrey Kellogg, Cathea Newsome, Edwin J. Strysko, Ellen Allen, David Borowski, Janice G. Hunt, Carol Pierce, Ruth Weiland, Demoyne Crow Estate of Dennis, Reid F. Waffle, Ruby Temple Esquivel, Shane Sowatzki, Jani Smith, Nathaniel Rugolo, Joyce Briggs, Mary Reinis, Louise Strickland, Angelo Consilvio, James Paul Amundson, Virginia Gray, Joseph A. Sabia, Erna Lacy, Glenna Leafty, Audrey Moore, Marylin Chismar, Morris Price, Lorie Waits, Personal Representative of Estate of Michael D. Waits, Anastasia Ondic, Debra Dean, Megan Levator Morehouse, Estate of Eva Neff, Gary Jones, Carol Phillips, Mishek Tucker, Robert A. Breyer, Susan Bossemeyer, Ieshia George, Gabrielle Ryan, Melvin Maples, Maureen O'Donnell, Nancy Smith, Jean Mourning and Meloney Rhodes
Defendant: Amylin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Does 1-100, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., M.D. Santiago Aparo, Novo Nordisk Inc., M.D. Elizabeth Buatti, Merck & Co., Inc., H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co., Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC and Jeffrey H. Shiff
Case Number: 3:2013md02452
Filed: August 26, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Anthony J Battaglia
Referring Judge: Mitchell D Dembin
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331pi
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 3003 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 19cv0975-AJB-MDD, Greathouse v. Novo Nordisk Inc. (Case opened in CASD on 5/23/2019) (no document attached) (jdt)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3002 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Caption and Complaint by George Kelley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Proposed Interim Estate Respresentative (Intestate Decedent), #2 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Amended Short Form Complaint for Damages)(Dearing, David) (acc).
July 15, 2019 Filing 3001 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 19cv1308-AJB-MDD, Menear v. Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Case opened in CASD) (no document attached) (jdt)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3000 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Novo Nordisk Inc. No Parties With Financial Interest. (Williams, Raymond) (acc).
July 11, 2019 Filing 2999 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Novo Nordisk Inc., as to Novo Nordisk Inc. (Williams, Raymond) (acc).
July 11, 2019 Filing 2998 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Novo Nordisk Inc. No Parties With Financial Interest. (Williams, Raymond) (acc).
July 11, 2019 Filing 2997 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Novo Nordisk Inc., as to Novo Nordisk Inc. (Williams, Raymond) (acc).
July 10, 2019 Filing 2996 Summons Issued re #2994 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2995 Summons Issued re #2993 Long Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2994 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Catherine Marie Cain against Novo Nordisk Inc., filed by Catherine Marie Cain. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael) (acc).
July 10, 2019 Filing 2993 LONG FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand for Nedal I. Qasim against Amlyn Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Eli Lilly and Company, filed by Nedal I Qasim. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael) (acc).
July 9, 2019 Filing 2992 NOTICE Suggestion of Death and Motion to Substitute Party by George Kelley (Dearing, David) Modified on 7/9/2019 to correct event type (acc).
July 8, 2019 Filing 2991 DECLARATION of Proposed Interim Estate Representative by Plaintiff Roselyn Dulaney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Death Certificate)(Johnson, Michael) (acc).
July 2, 2019 Filing 2990 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 19cv1233-AJB-MDD, Falconer-Smith v. Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC et al. (Case opened in CASD) (no document attached) (jdt)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2989 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 19cv1234-AJB-MDD, Fettman v. Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Case opened in CASD) (no document attached) (jdt)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2988 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 19cv1231-AJB-MDD, Shearer v. Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Case opened in CASD) (no document attached) (jdt)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2987 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily) (acc).
June 28, 2019 Filing 2986 DECLARATION of Proposed Interim Estate Representative re #1616 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous (Other 1) by Plaintiff Trina Kendrick. (Lopez, Matthew) (acc).
June 27, 2019 Filing 2985 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 19cv1202-AJB-MDD, Nuzzo v. Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC et al (Case opened in CASD) (no document attached) (jdt)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2984 Summons Issued re #2979 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2983 Amended SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., filed by Susan Giuffre. (jrm)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2982 ORDER granting #2977 Joint Motion for Leave to File an Amended Short Form Complaint. The Clerk of Court is instructed to update the caption in the lead case, 13md2452 as follows: SUSAN GIUFFRE, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST OF THE ESTATE OF JOSEPH GIUFFRE, DECEASED, Plaintiff, v. MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP., Defendants. The Clerk of Court is further instructed to docket the amended complaint as attachment 1 to the motion. (Doc. No. 2977-1.). Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 6/24/2019. (jrm (jao).
June 24, 2019 Filing 2981 Amended SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., filed by Ginger Johnson. (jrm)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2980 ORDER granting #2971 Joint Motion for Leave to File an Amended Short Form Complaint. The Clerk of Court is instructed to update the caption in the lead case, 13md2452 as follows: GINGER JOHNSON, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESS-IN-INTEREST OF THE ESTATE OF JOEL ALAN JOHNSON, DECEASED, Plaintiff, v. MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP., Defendant. The Clerk of Court is further instructed to docket the amended complaint attached as Exhibit A to the motion. (Doc. No. 2971-1.). Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 6/24/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jrm) (jao).
June 24, 2019 Filing 2979 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Eli Lilly and Company, Novo Nordisk Inc., filed by Phillip Ravid. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Plattenberger, Jacob) (acc).
June 21, 2019 Filing 2978 DECLARATION of Proposed Interim Estate Representative by Plaintiff Joseph Giuffre. (Johnson, Michael) (acc).
June 21, 2019 Filing 2977 MOTION to Substitute Party by Joseph Giuffre. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint)(Johnson, Michael) (acc).
June 21, 2019 Filing 2976 NOTIFICATION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to Joseph Giuffre by Joseph Giuffre. (Johnson, Michael) (acc).
June 21, 2019 Filing 2975 DECLARATION of Proposed Interim Estate Representative by Plaintiff Thomas Adams. (Johnson, Michael) (acc).
June 21, 2019 Filing 2974 MOTION to Substitute Party by Thomas Adams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint)(Johnson, Michael) (acc).
June 21, 2019 Filing 2973 NOTIFICATION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to Thomas Adams by Thomas Adams. (Johnson, Michael) (acc).
June 21, 2019 Filing 2972 DECLARATION of Proposed Interim Estate Representative by Plaintiff Joel Alan Johnson. (Johnson, Michael) (acc).
June 21, 2019 Filing 2971 MOTION to Substitute Party by Joel Alan Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint)(Johnson, Michael) (acc).
June 21, 2019 Filing 2970 NOTIFICATION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to Joel Alan Johnson by Joel Alan Johnson. (Johnson, Michael) (acc).
June 20, 2019 Filing 2969 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily) (acc).
June 20, 2019 Filing 2968 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily) (acc).
June 18, 2019 Filing 2967 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eli Lilly and Company, as to Eli Lilly and Company. (Laurendeau, Amy) (acc).
June 18, 2019 Filing 2966 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eli Lilly and Company, as to Eli Lilly and Company. (Laurendeau, Amy) (acc).
June 18, 2019 Filing 2965 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eli Lilly and Company, as to Eli Lilly and Company. (Laurendeau, Amy) (acc).
June 18, 2019 Filing 2964 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, as to Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Laurendeau, Amy) (acc).
June 18, 2019 Filing 2963 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, as to Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Laurendeau, Amy) (acc).
June 18, 2019 Filing 2962 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, as to Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Laurendeau, Amy) (acc).
June 17, 2019 Filing 2961 Summons Issued re #2958 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2960 Summons Issued re #2957 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2959 Summons Issued re #2956 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2958 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Shawn Melvin Mullins against Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Eli Lilly and Company, filed by Shawn Melvin Mullins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2957 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand LONG FORM COMPLAINT for Edward Bogart, Individually and as Successor in Interest and Surviving Heir of Margaret Bogart, Deceased against Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Eli Lilly and Company, filed by Edward Bogart. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2956 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Jeffery Todd Scott on Behalf of the Estate of Bobbie Quarles Scott, Deceased against Novo Nordisk Inc., filed by Jeffery Todd Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael) (acc).
June 11, 2019 Filing 2955 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily) (acc).
June 11, 2019 Filing 2954 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily) (acc).
June 7, 2019 Filing 2953 Summons Issued re #2951 Long Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2952 Summons Issued re #2950 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2951 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand LONG FORM COMPLAINT for Roselyn Dulaney, Individually and as Successor in Interest and Surviving Spouse of Edwin Wayne Dulaney, Deceased against Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Eli Lilly and Company, filed by Roselyn Dulaney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael) (acc).
June 7, 2019 Filing 2950 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Eli Lilly and Company, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.(a New Jersey corporation ), Novo Nordisk Inc., filed by ALICIA COVARRUBIAS. (Attachments: #1 CIVIL COVER SHEET)New Summons Requested. (Humphrey, Debra) (Main Document 2950 replaced on 6/7/2019) (acc).
June 6, 2019 Filing 2949 Summons Issued re #2948 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2948 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Agostinacci against Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Eli Lilly and Company, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., Novo Nordisk Inc., filed by Joseph Agostinacci. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit CCS)New Summons Requested. (Humphrey, Debra) (acc). (Main Document 2948 replaced on 6/6/2019) (acc).
June 5, 2019 Filing 2947 DECLARATION of Proposed Interim Estate Representative by Plaintiff Jennifer Shelley, Individually and as successor-in-interest to Linda Pounds, deceased. (Attachments: #1 Death Certificate)(Webb, Seth) (acc).
June 3, 2019 Filing 2946 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 19cv1037-AJB-MDD, Vitiello v. Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC et al. (Case opened in CASD) (no document attached) (jdt)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2945 Summons Issued re #2944 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2944 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Patricia Vitiello as the Executor of the Estate of Stanley Biren against Amylin Pharamaceuticals LLC, Eli Lilly and Company, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.(a New Jersey corporation ), Novo Nordisk Inc., filed by Stanley Biren. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit CCS)New Summons Requested. (Humphrey, Debra) (acc).
June 3, 2019 Filing 2943 Summons Issued re #2940 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2942 Summons Issued re #2939 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2941 Summons Issued re #2938 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
May 31, 2019 Filing 2940 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Eli Lilly and Company, filed by Barbara Anne Kimball, Beverly Quintero, Michael Weidenhamer, Tammy Weidenhamer, Thomas Edward Weidenhamer.New Summons Requested. (Lopez, Matthew)(acc).
May 31, 2019 Filing 2939 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., filed by Joseph Vigilante, Patricia Vigilante. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Plattenberger, Jacob) (acc).
May 31, 2019 Filing 2938 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.(a New Jersey corporation ), filed by Marjorie Corley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Plattenberger, Jacob)(acc).
May 29, 2019 Filing 2937 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily) (acc).
May 29, 2019 Filing 2936 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily) (acc).
May 28, 2019 Filing 2935 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eli Lilly & Company, as to Eli Lilly & Company. (Laurendeau, Amy) (jao).
May 28, 2019 Filing 2934 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, as to Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Laurendeau, Amy) (jao).
May 28, 2019 Filing 2933 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eli Lilly & Company, as to Eli Lilly & Company. (Laurendeau, Amy) (jao).
May 28, 2019 Filing 2932 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, as to Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Laurendeau, Amy)(jao).
May 28, 2019 Filing 2931 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eli Lilly and Company, as to Eli Lilly and Company. (Laurendeau, Amy) (jao).
May 28, 2019 Filing 2930 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amylin Pharamaceuticals LLC, as to Amlyn Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Laurendeau, Amy) (jao).
May 24, 2019 Filing 2929 Amended SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Eli Lilly & Company, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.(a New Jersey corporation ), filed by Jared Cloud. (acc)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2928 ORDER Granting #2921 Joint Motion for Leave to File an Amended Short Form Complaint. The Clerk of Court is instructed to update the caption in the lead case, 13md2452as follows:JARED CLOUD, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST OFTHE ESTATE OF CYNTHIA BROWN,Plaintiff,v.AMYLIN PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, ELI LILLY AND COMPANY, ANDMERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.,Defendants. The Clerk of Court is further instructed to docket the amended complaint attached to the motion. (Doc. No. 2921-1). Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 5/24/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(acc)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2927 Amended SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., filed by Evelyn Parrott. (acc)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2926 ORDER Granting #2854 Joint Motion for Leave to File an Amended Short Form Complaint. The Clerk of Court is instructed to update the caption in the lead case, 13md2452as follows:EVELYN PARROTT, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS ADMINISTRATOR OF THEESTATE OF RODNEY PARROTT,Plaintiff,v.MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.,Defendants. The Clerk of Court is further instructed to docket the amended complaint attached as B to the motion. (Doc. No. 2854-2). Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 5/24/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(acc)
May 23, 2019 Filing 2925 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 19cv0965-AJB-MDD, Rambis v. Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Case opened in CASD) (no document attached) (jdt)
May 23, 2019 Filing 2924 Amended SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Novo Nordisk Inc., filed by Lisa A Curry. (acc)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2923 ORDER Granting #2918 Joint Motion for Leave to File an Amended Short Form Complaint. The Clerk of Court is instructed to update the caption in the lead case, 13md2452as follows:LISA A. CURRY, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTERESTAND SURVIVING SPOUSE OF GEORGE T. CURRY, DECEASED,Plaintiff,v.NOVO NORDISK INC.,Defendants. The Clerk of Court is further instructed to docket the amended complaint attached to the motion. (Doc. No. 2918-1). Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 5/23/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(acc)
May 23, 2019 Filing 2922 DECLARATION of Proposed Interim Estate Representative as to Cynthia Brown by Plaintiff Jared Cloud. (Johnson, Michael) (acc).
May 23, 2019 Filing 2921 MOTION to Substitute Party by Cynthia Brown. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint)(Johnson, Michael) (acc).
May 23, 2019 Filing 2920 NOTIFICATION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to Cynthia Brown by Cynthia Brown. (Johnson, Michael) (acc).
May 23, 2019 Filing 2919 DECLARATION of Proposed Interim Estate Representative as to George T. Curry by Plaintiff Lisa A Curry. (Johnson, Michael) (acc).
May 23, 2019 Filing 2918 MOTION to Substitute Party by George T. Curry. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint)(Johnson, Michael)Attorney Michael K. Johnson added to party George T. Curry(pty:pla), Attorney Michael K. Johnson added to party George T. Curry(pty:pla)(acc).
May 23, 2019 Filing 2917 NOTIFICATION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to George T. Curry by George T. Curry. (Johnson, Michael) (acc).
May 23, 2019 Filing 2916 COUNTERCLAIM against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., filed by Pamela Rambis. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Civil Cover, #2 Supplement Summons) (Schrama, Martin) (acc).
May 20, 2019 Filing 2915 Summons Issued re #2914 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (tcf)(jrd)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2914 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Mary Perla Trezza against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.(a New Jersey corporation ), filed by Mary Perla Trezza. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael) (tcf).
May 9, 2019 Filing 2913 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Novo Nordisk Inc . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Williams, Raymond) (acc).
May 9, 2019 Filing 2912 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Novo Nordisk Inc., as to Novo Nordisk Inc. (Williams, Raymond) (acc).
May 9, 2019 Filing 2911 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Novo Nordisk Inc. . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Williams, Raymond)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2910 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Novo Nordisk Inc., as to Novo Nordisk Inc. (Williams, Raymond) (acc).
May 9, 2019 Filing 2909 NOTICE to Substitute Party by Margaret Boatwright. (Feidler, Stefan) Modified on 5/10/2019 to correct event type (acc).
May 8, 2019 Filing 2906 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily) (acc).
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2904 ORDER Granting #2903 Joint Motion for Leave to File Amended Short Form Complaint. The Clerk of Court is instructed to update the caption in the lead case, 13md2452as follows:MACY BAIRD, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVEOF THE ESTATE OF KENNETH BAIRD,Plaintiff,v.MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.,Defendant.The Clerk of Court is further instructed to docket the amended complaint attachedas Exhibit A-1 to the motion. (Doc. No. 2903.). Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 5/6/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(acc)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2908 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 19cv0849-AJB-MDD, Hernandez v. Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Case opened in CASD) (no document attached) (jdt)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2907 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 19cv0850-AJB-MDD, Childers v. Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Case opened in CASD.) (no document attached) (jdt)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2905 AMENDED SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., filed by Macy Baird. (acc)
May 2, 2019 Filing 2903 MOTION to Substitute Party by Kenneth Baird. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint)(Johnson, Michael)(acc).
May 2, 2019 Filing 2902 NOTIFICATION OF DEATH Upon the Record by Kenneth Baird. (Johnson, Michael) (acc).
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2901 AMENDED ORDER Concerning Claims of Privilege and Privilege Logs. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 5/1/2019.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(acc)
April 30, 2019 Filing 2900 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct the Order Concerning Claims of Privilege and Privilege Logs by Novo Nordisk Inc. (Williams, Raymond) (acc).
April 29, 2019 Filing 2899 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (tcf)(jrd)
April 26, 2019 Filing 2898 DECLARATION of Proposed Interim Estate Representative re #1616 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous (Other 1) by Plaintiff Marie Steele. (Lopez, Matthew) (tcf).
April 26, 2019 Filing 2897 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Karen Lee Ryan, Individually and as Successor in Interest and Surviving Spouse of Steven James Ryan, Deceased against Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Eli Lilly and Company, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.(a New Jersey corporation ), filed by Karen Lee Ryan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael) (tcf).
April 24, 2019 Filing 2896 NOTICE of Appearance on behalf of James Welch (Florin, Chad) (acc).
April 24, 2019 Filing 2895 NOTICE of Appearance on behalf of James Welch (Florin, Wilfried) (acc).
April 22, 2019 Filing 2894 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 19cv0731-AJB-MDD, Welch v. Novo Nordisk, Inc. (Case opened in CASD) (no document attached) (jdt)
April 16, 2019 Filing 2893 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 19cv0699-AJB-MDD, King v. Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC et al. (Case opened in CASD) (no document attached) (jdt)
April 10, 2019 Filing 2892 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily) (acc).
April 10, 2019 Filing 2891 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily) (acc).
April 10, 2019 Filing 2890 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily) (acc).
April 8, 2019 Filing 2889 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 19cv0656-AJB-MDD, Islas v. Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Case opened in CASD) (no document attached) (jdt)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2888 ORDER Granting #2885 Motion to Modify Case Management Order. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 4/4/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(acc)
April 2, 2019 Filing 2887 Summons Issued re #2886 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
April 1, 2019 Filing 2886 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., filed by Jennifer Shelley, Individually and as successor-in-interest to Linda Pounds, deceased. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Webb, Seth) (acc).
March 29, 2019 Filing 2885 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct the Case Management Order by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.. (Boehm, Paul) (ag).
March 29, 2019 Filing 2884 Summons Issued re #2882 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2883 ORDER Granting #2855 Joint Motion to Approve Fourth Amended Stipulation and Enter Order Related to Filings by Derivative Plaintiffs Acting as Interim Estate Representatives. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 3/29/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(acc)
March 28, 2019 Filing 2882 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., filed by Trina Kendrick, Bernanetia Williams, Robert L. Williams Jr. New Summons Requested. (Lopez, Matthew) (acc).
March 27, 2019 Filing 2881 Summons Issued re #2856 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
March 27, 2019 Filing 2880 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eli Lilly and Company, as to Eli Lilly and Company. (Laurendeau, Amy) (acc).
March 27, 2019 Filing 2879 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eli Lilly and Company, as to Eli Lilly and Company. (Laurendeau, Amy) (acc).
March 27, 2019 Filing 2878 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eli Lilly and Company, as to Eli Lilly and Company. (Laurendeau, Amy) (acc).
March 27, 2019 Filing 2877 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eli Lilly and Company, as to Eli Lilly and Company. (Laurendeau, Amy) (acc).
March 27, 2019 Filing 2876 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eli Lilly and Company, as to Eli Lilly and Company. (Laurendeau, Amy) (acc).
March 27, 2019 Filing 2875 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amlyn Pharmaceuticals, LLC, as to Amlyn Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Laurendeau, Amy) (acc).
March 27, 2019 Filing 2874 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amlyn Pharmaceuticals, LLC, as to Amlyn Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Laurendeau, Amy) (acc).
March 27, 2019 Filing 2873 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amlyn Pharmaceuticals, LLC, as to Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Laurendeau, Amy) (acc).
March 27, 2019 Filing 2872 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amlyn Pharmaceuticals, LLC, as to Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Laurendeau, Amy) (acc).
March 27, 2019 Filing 2871 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amlyn Pharmaceuticals, LLC, as to Amlyn Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Laurendeau, Amy) (acc).
March 27, 2019 Filing 2870 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Novo Nordisk Inc. No Parties With Financial Interest. (Williams, Raymond) (acc).
March 27, 2019 Filing 2869 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Novo Nordisk Inc., as to Novo Nordisk Inc. (Williams, Raymond) (acc).
March 27, 2019 Filing 2868 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Novo Nordisk Inc. No Parties With Financial Interest. (Williams, Raymond)(acc).
March 27, 2019 Filing 2867 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Novo Nordisk Inc., as to Novo Nordisk Inc. (Williams, Raymond)(acc).
March 27, 2019 Filing 2866 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Novo Nordisk Inc. No Parties With Financial Interest. (Williams, Raymond)(acc).
March 27, 2019 Filing 2865 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Novo Nordisk Inc., as to Novo Nordisk Inc. (Williams, Raymond) (acc).
March 27, 2019 Filing 2864 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Novo Nordisk Inc. No Parties With Financial Interest. (Williams, Raymond) (acc).
March 27, 2019 Filing 2863 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Novo Nordisk Inc., as to Novo Nordisk Inc. (Williams, Raymond) (acc).
March 27, 2019 Filing 2862 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Novo Nordisk Inc. No Parties With Financial Interest. (Williams, Raymond) (acc).
March 27, 2019 Filing 2861 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Novo Nordisk Inc., as to Novo Nordisk Inc. (Williams, Raymond) (acc).
March 27, 2019 Filing 2860 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Novo Nordisk Inc. No Parties With Financial Interest. (Williams, Raymond) (acc).
March 27, 2019 Filing 2859 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Novo Nordisk Inc., as to Novo Nordisk Inc. (Williams, Raymond) (acc).
March 27, 2019 Filing 2858 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Novo Nordisk Inc. . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Williams, Raymond) (acc).
March 27, 2019 Filing 2857 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Novo Nordisk Inc., as to Novo Nordisk Inc. (Williams, Raymond) (acc).
March 27, 2019 Filing 2856 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.(a New Jersey corporation ), filed by Rheta Schloss, Individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Barry I. Schloss. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Barone Baden, Kimberly) (acc).
March 26, 2019 Filing 2855 Joint MOTION to Approve Fifth Amended Stipulation and Enter Order Related to Filings by Derivative Plaintiffs Acting as Interim Estate Representatives by All Plaintiffs. (Plattenberger, Jacob)(acc).
March 25, 2019 Filing 2854 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Short Form Complaint by Evelyn Parrott, Rodney Parrott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Cates, Dave) (acc).
March 21, 2019 Filing 2853 Summons Issued re #2851 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
March 21, 2019 Filing 2852 Summons Issued re #2850 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
March 20, 2019 Filing 2851 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Eli Lilly and Company, Novo Nordisk Inc., filed by Melvin Paul Ruehl, Individually and as Administrator of the Estate of George P. Russo, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Barone Baden, Kimberly) (acc).
March 19, 2019 Filing 2850 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., filed by Elizabeth Pratt, Individually and as Special Administrator of the Estate of David Wilson Pratt. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Barone Baden, Kimberly) (acc).
March 18, 2019 Filing 2849 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Amlyn Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Eli Lilly and Company, Novo Nordisk Inc., filed by Cheryl Ferebee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Barone Baden, Kimberly)
March 11, 2019 Filing 2847 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily) (acc).
March 11, 2019 Filing 2846 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily) (acc).
March 8, 2019 Filing 2845 NOTICE to Withdraw as Attorney by Ann Nostin. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Schedule A)(Johnson, Michael) Modified on 3/8/2019 to correct event type (acc).
March 7, 2019 Filing 2848 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: Case Number 19cv0452-AJB-MDD, Bedolla v. Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. et al. (Case opened in CASD) (no document attached) (jdt)
March 7, 2019 Filing 2844 Summons Issued re #2842 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
March 7, 2019 Filing 2843 Summons Issued re #2841 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
March 7, 2019 Filing 2842 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Annie L. Jackson against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.(a New Jersey corporation ), filed by Annie L Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Goetz, Michael) (acc).
March 6, 2019 Filing 2841 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Jana L. Ross, Individually and as Successor in Interest and Surviving Spouse of James Jarl Ross, Deceased against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.(a New Jersey corporation ), filed by Jana L. Ross. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael) (acc).
March 5, 2019 Filing 2840 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily) (acc).
March 5, 2019 Filing 2839 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily) (acc).
March 5, 2019 Filing 2838 Summons Issued re #2835 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
March 5, 2019 Filing 2837 Summons Issued re #2834 Long Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
March 5, 2019 Filing 2836 Summons Issued re #2833 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
March 5, 2019 Filing 2835 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Arnold Vetter, Individually and as Successor in Interest and Surviving Spouse of Cindy Marie Vetter, Deceased against Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Eli Lilly and Company, Novo Nordisk Inc., filed by Arnold Vetter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael) (acc).
March 5, 2019 Filing 2834 LONG FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand for Kay Francis Barker, Individually and as Successor in Interest and Surviving Spouse of Thomas Stanley Barker, Deceased against Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Eli Lilly and Company, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.(a New Jersey corporation ), filed by Kay Francis Barker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael)(acc).
March 5, 2019 Filing 2833 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Kathleen Salvio, Individually and as Successor in Interest and Surviving Spouse of Louis J. Salvio, Deceased against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.(a New Jersey corporation ), filed by Kathleen Salvio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael) (acc).
March 1, 2019 Filing 2832 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 19cv0416-AJB-MDD, Lowther v. Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC et al. (Case opened in CASD) (no document attached) (jdt)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2831 Summons Issued re #2825 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2830 Summons Issued re #2824 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2829 Summons Issued re #2823 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2828 Summons Issued re #2822 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2827 Summons Issued re #2821 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
February 28, 2019 Filing 2826 Summons Issued re #2820 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
February 28, 2019 Filing 2825 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Deborah Gafford Devaney, Individually and as Successor in Interest and Surviving Spouse of Jimmy Fred Devaney, Deceased against Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Eli Lilly and Company, Novo Nordisk Inc., filed by Deborah Gafford Devaney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael) (acc).
February 28, 2019 Filing 2824 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Joe Bill Aaron, Individually and as Successor in Interest and Surviving Spouse of Paula June Aaron, Deceased against Novo Nordisk Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael) (acc).
February 28, 2019 Filing 2823 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Marie Steele and Garnell Foster, individually and as successors-in-interest to Dolly Ann Ford, deceased against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., filed by Garnell Foster, Marie Steele.New Summons Requested. (Lopez, Matthew) (acc).
February 28, 2019 Filing 2822 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Robert Kenneth Reedy, Individually and as Successor in Interest and Surviving Spouse of Nancy Cline Reedy, Deceased against Novo Nordisk Inc., filed by Robert Kenneth Reedy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael)(acc).
February 28, 2019 Filing 2821 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Pamela Jean Day, Individually and as Successor in Interest and Surviving Spouse of Harold Randol Day, Deceased against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., Novo Nordisk Inc., filed by Pamela Jean Day. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael) (acc).
February 28, 2019 Filing 2820 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Jereme Durfee, Individually and as Successor in Interest and Surviving Spouse of Mary Ann Durfee, Deceased against Novo Nordisk Inc., filed by Jereme Durfee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael)(acc).
February 27, 2019 Filing 2819 Summons Issued re #2818 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2818 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Novo Nordisk Inc., filed by Estate of Concetta Ferrone, Guy E. Ferrone, Sr., Individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Concetta Ferrone. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Barone Baden, Kimberly) (acc).
February 26, 2019 Filing 2817 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eli Lilly and Company, as to Eli Lilly and Company. (Laurendeau, Amy) (acc).
February 26, 2019 Filing 2816 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, as to Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Laurendeau, Amy) (acc).
February 26, 2019 Filing 2815 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eli Lilly and Company, as to Eli Lilly and Company. (Laurendeau, Amy) (acc).
February 26, 2019 Filing 2814 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, as to Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Laurendeau, Amy) (acc).
February 26, 2019 Filing 2813 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eli Lilly and Company, as to Eli Lilly and Company. (Laurendeau, Amy) (acc).
February 26, 2019 Filing 2812 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, as to Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Laurendeau, Amy) (acc).
February 22, 2019 Filing 2811 Summons Issued re #2804 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
February 21, 2019 Filing 2810 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Novo Nordisk Inc . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Williams, Raymond)(acc).
February 21, 2019 Filing 2809 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Novo Nordisk Inc., as to Novo Nordisk Inc. (Williams, Raymond) (acc).
February 21, 2019 Filing 2808 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Novo Nordisk Inc . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Williams, Raymond) (acc).
February 21, 2019 Filing 2807 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Novo Nordisk Inc., as to Novo Nordisk Inc. (Williams, Raymond) (acc).
February 21, 2019 Filing 2806 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Novo Nordisk Inc . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Williams, Raymond)(acc).
February 21, 2019 Filing 2805 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Novo Nordisk Inc., as to Novo Nordisk Inc. (Williams, Raymond) (acc).
February 21, 2019 Filing 2804 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., filed by John Vaughan, Tonya Vaughan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Barone Baden, Kimberly) (acc).
February 19, 2019 Filing 2803 Summons Issued re #2802 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
February 18, 2019 Filing 2802 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Eli Lilly and Company, Novo Nordisk Inc., filed by Robert M Bass. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Plattenberger, Jacob) (acc).
February 13, 2019 Filing 2801 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 19cv315-AJB-MDD, Ivy v. Novo Nordisk Inc. (Case opened in CASD) (no document attached) (jdt)
February 13, 2019 Filing 2800 NOTICE to Withdraw as Attorney by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Marks, William) (acc). Modified on 3/5/2019 to correct event type (acc).
February 11, 2019 Filing 2799 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily) (acc).
February 11, 2019 Filing 2798 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily) (acc).
February 7, 2019 Filing 2797 Summons Issued re #2796 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
February 7, 2019 Filing 2796 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Kulbir Khatker, Individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Anita Khatker, Deceased against Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Eli Lilly and Company, Novo Nordisk Inc., filed by Kulbir Khatker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration)New Summons Requested. (Goetz, Michael) (acc).
February 4, 2019 Filing 2795 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 19cv0240-AJB-MDD, Willis v. Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC et al (Case opened in CASD). (no document attached) (jdt)
February 4, 2019 Filing 2794 Summons Issued re #2793 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
February 1, 2019 Filing 2793 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Amlyn Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Eli Lilly and Company, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.(a New Jersey corporation ), Novo Nordisk Inc., filed by Mary Willis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Humphrey, Debra) (acc).
January 30, 2019 Filing 2792 Summons Issued re #2789 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
January 30, 2019 Filing 2789 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Angela Lynn Green, Individually and as Successor in Interest and Surviving Heir of the Estate of Marilyn L. Van Camp, Deceased against Amlyn Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Eli Lilly and Company, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., Novo Nordisk Inc., filed by Angela Lynn Green. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael) (acc).
January 29, 2019 Filing 2791 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 19cv0198-AJB-MDD, Knapp v. Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. et al (Case opened in CASD) (no document attached) (jdt)
January 29, 2019 Filing 2790 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 19cv0202-AJB-MDD, Matassa v. Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. et al (Case opened in CASD) (no document attached) (jdt)
January 22, 2019 Filing 2788 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ADAM B. MICHAELS AS AN ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR DEFENDANT ELI LILLY AND COMPANY by Eli Lilly and Company (Hamilton, Matthew) (acc).
January 18, 2019 Filing 2787 NOTICE of Change of Address by Vickie E Turner (Turner, Vickie)(acc).
January 16, 2019 Filing 2786 DECLARATION of Proposed Interim Estate Representative by Plaintiff Debra Rae Atwood. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Death Certificate)(Johnson, Michael) (acc).
January 15, 2019 Filing 2785 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Novo Nordisk Inc . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Williams, Raymond) (acc).
January 15, 2019 Filing 2784 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Novo Nordisk Inc., as to Novo Nordisk Inc. (Williams, Raymond) (acc).
January 15, 2019 Filing 2783 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Novo Nordisk Inc . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Williams, Raymond) (acc).
January 15, 2019 Filing 2782 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Novo Nordisk Inc., as to Novo Nordisk Inc. (Williams, Raymond) (acc).
January 15, 2019 Filing 2781 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Novo Nordisk Inc . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Williams, Raymond) (acc).
January 15, 2019 Filing 2780 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Novo Nordisk Inc., as to Novo Nordisk Inc. (Williams, Raymond) (acc).
January 15, 2019 Filing 2779 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Novo Nordisk Inc. . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Williams, Raymond) (acc).
January 15, 2019 Filing 2778 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Novo Nordisk Inc., as to Novo Nordisk Inc. (Williams, Raymond) (acc).
January 14, 2019 Filing 2777 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 19cv0096-AJB(MDD), English et al v. Novo Nordisk Inc. (Filed in CASD) (no document attached) (rmc)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2773 ORDER: (1) Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to File Certain Documents in Support of their Motion to Compel Discovery Under Seal (2) Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to File Certain Documents in Support of Reply for Motion to Compel Discovery (3) Granting Defendant Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.'s Motion to File Under Seal its Motion to Seal Documents Attached to and Memoranda in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Discovery (4) Vacating Hearing Date of January 17, 2019. (Doc. Nos. #2610 , #2666 , #2690 ) Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 1/11/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
January 8, 2019 Filing 2772 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: Case Number 19cv47-AJB-MDD, MSP RECOVERY CLAIMS, SERIES LLC. et al v. Merck Sharpe & Dohme Corp. (Case filed in Southern District of Florida.) (no document attached) (jdt)
January 7, 2019 Filing 2771 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily) (acc).
January 7, 2019 Filing 2770 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily) (acc).
December 28, 2018 Filing 2769 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eli Lilly and Company, as to Eli Lilly and Company. (Laurendeau, Amy) (acc).
December 28, 2018 Filing 2768 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, as to Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Laurendeau, Amy) (acc).
December 27, 2018 Filing 2767 Summons Issued re #2765 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2766 Summons Issued re #2760 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2765 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Querida Marie Rohrback against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., filed by Querida Marie Rohrback. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael) (acc).
December 27, 2018 Filing 2764 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily) (acc).
December 27, 2018 Filing 2763 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily) (acc).
December 27, 2018 Filing 2762 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily) (acc).
December 27, 2018 Filing 2761 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily) (acc).
December 27, 2018 Filing 2760 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Debra Rae Atwood, On Behalf of Saundra Lou Holder's Surviving Beneficiaries and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Saundra Lou Holder, Deceased against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., filed by Debra Rae Atwood. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael) (acc).
December 26, 2018 Filing 2759 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eli Lilly and Company, as to Eli Lilly and Company. (Laurendeau, Amy) (acc).
December 26, 2018 Filing 2758 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, as to Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Laurendeau, Amy) (acc).
December 24, 2018 Filing 2757 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: McCloud et al v. Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., Case No. 18-cv-02870-AJB-MDD (Filed in CASD) (no document attached) (rmc)
December 21, 2018 Filing 2756 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eli Lilly and Company, as to Eli Lilly and Company. (Laurendeau, Amy) (acc).
December 21, 2018 Filing 2755 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, as to Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Laurendeau, Amy) (acc).
December 21, 2018 Filing 2754 Summons Issued re #2749 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
December 21, 2018 Filing 2753 Summons Issued re #2748 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
December 21, 2018 Filing 2752 Summons Issued re #2747 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
December 21, 2018 Filing 2751 Summons Issued re #2746 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
December 20, 2018 Filing 2750 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily) (acc).
December 20, 2018 Filing 2749 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Peter Lawrence Lewis against Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Eli Lilly and Company, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., Novo Nordisk Inc., filed by Peter Lawrence Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael) (acc).
December 20, 2018 Filing 2748 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Dominick Cretella against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., filed by Dominick Cretella. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael) (acc).
December 20, 2018 Filing 2747 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Becky Goudy, Individually and as Successor in Interest and Surviving Spouse of Arthur Eric Goudy, Deceased against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., filed by Becky Goudy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael) (acc).
December 20, 2018 Filing 2746 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Dennis Cofer, Individually and as Successor in Interest and Surviving Spouse of Kathleen Beth Cofer, Deceased against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., filed by Dennis Cofer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael) (acc).
December 17, 2018 Filing 2745 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-36), re MDL No. 2452 (jdt)
December 17, 2018 Filing 2744 DECLARATION of Proposed Interim Estate Representative re #2404 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous (Other 1), by Plaintiff Amy L. Manzo. (Lopez, Matthew)(acc).
December 17, 2018 Filing 2743 Summons Issued re #2742 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
December 14, 2018 Filing 2742 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Andrew Sorge, Individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Sheila Sorge, Deceased against Merck Sharpe & Dohme, Corp., filed by Andrew Sorge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration)New Summons Requested. (Goetz, Michael) (acc).
December 10, 2018 Filing 2741 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.. (Pistilli, Emily) (rmc).
December 10, 2018 Filing 2740 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.. (Pistilli, Emily) (rmc).
December 4, 2018 Filing 2739 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 18cv2733-AJB-MDD, Brown v. Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Filed in CASD) (no document attached) (jdt)
December 4, 2018 Filing 2738 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eli Lilly and Company, as to Eli Lilly and Company. (Laurendeau, Amy) (acc).
December 4, 2018 Filing 2737 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amlyn Pharmaceuticals, LLC, as to Amlyn Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Laurendeau, Amy) (acc).
December 4, 2018 Filing 2736 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eli Lilly and Company, as to Eli Lilly and Company. (Laurendeau, Amy)(acc).
December 4, 2018 Filing 2735 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, as to Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Laurendeau, Amy) (acc).
November 30, 2018 Filing 2734 Summons Issued re #2733 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
November 30, 2018 Filing 2733 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Jamie Rodriguez-Suero, Individually and as Successor in Interest and Surviving Heir of Miriam H. Suero, Deceased against Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Eli Lilly and Company, Novo Nordisk Inc., filed by Jamie Rodriguez-Suero. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael)(acc).
November 20, 2018 Filing 2731 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Motion Hearing) held on 11/1/2018 before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jeannette N. Hill. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 12/11/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/21/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/19/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service. Notice of Filing of Official Transcript only.) (akr)
November 16, 2018 Filing 2730 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eli Lilly and Company, as to Eli Lilly and Company. (Laurendeau, Amy) (acc).
November 16, 2018 Filing 2729 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, as to Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Laurendeau, Amy) (acc).
November 16, 2018 Filing 2728 DECLARATION of Proposed Interim Estate Representative by Plaintiff Judy Ann Hasty. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Death Certificate)(Johnson, Michael) (acc).
November 15, 2018 Filing 2732 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: Case Number 18cv2619-AJB-MDD, Russell v. Novo Nordisk Inc. (Filed in CASD) (no document attached) (jdt)
November 12, 2018 Filing 2727 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Novo Nordisk Inc . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Williams, Raymond)(acc).
November 12, 2018 Filing 2726 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Novo Nordisk Inc., as to Novo Nordisk Inc. (Williams, Raymond) (acc).
November 12, 2018 Filing 2725 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Novo Nordisk Inc. . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Williams, Raymond) (acc).
November 12, 2018 Filing 2724 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Novo Nordisk Inc., as to Novo Nordisk Inc. (Williams, Raymond) (acc).
November 12, 2018 Filing 2723 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Novo Nordisk Inc . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Williams, Raymond) (acc).
November 12, 2018 Filing 2722 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Novo Nordisk Inc., as to Novo Nordisk Inc. (Williams, Raymond)(acc).
November 12, 2018 Filing 2721 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Novo Nordisk Inc. . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Williams, Raymond) (acc).
November 12, 2018 Filing 2720 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Novo Nordisk Inc., as to Novo Nordisk Inc. (Williams, Raymond) (acc).
November 12, 2018 Filing 2719 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Novo Nordisk Inc. . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Williams, Raymond)(acc).
November 12, 2018 Filing 2718 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Novo Nordisk Inc., as to Novo Nordisk Inc. (Williams, Raymond) (acc).
November 12, 2018 Filing 2717 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Novo Nordisk Inc. . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Williams, Raymond)(acc).
November 12, 2018 Filing 2716 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Novo Nordisk Inc., as to Novo Nordisk Inc. (Williams, Raymond) (acc).
November 12, 2018 Filing 2715 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Novo Nordisk Inc. . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Williams, Raymond) (acc).
November 12, 2018 Filing 2714 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Novo Nordisk Inc., as to Novo Nordisk Inc. (Williams, Raymond) (acc).
November 12, 2018 Filing 2713 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Novo Nordisk Inc. . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Williams, Raymond) (acc).
November 12, 2018 Filing 2712 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Novo Nordisk Inc., as to Novo Nordisk Inc. (Williams, Raymond) (acc).
November 12, 2018 Filing 2711 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Novo Nordisk Inc. . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Williams, Raymond) (acc).
November 12, 2018 Filing 2710 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Novo Nordisk Inc., as to Novo Nordisk Inc. (Williams, Raymond) (acc).
November 12, 2018 Filing 2709 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Novo Nordisk Inc. . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Williams, Raymond)(acc).
November 12, 2018 Filing 2708 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Novo Nordisk Inc., as to Novo Nordisk Inc. (Williams, Raymond) (acc).
November 12, 2018 Filing 2707 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Novo Nordisk Inc. . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Williams, Raymond) (acc).
November 12, 2018 Filing 2706 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Novo Nordisk Inc., as to Novo Nordisk Inc. (Williams, Raymond) (acc).
November 12, 2018 Filing 2705 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Novo Nordisk Inc. . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Williams, Raymond) (acc).
November 12, 2018 Filing 2704 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Novo Nordisk Inc., as to Novo Nordisk Inc. (Williams, Raymond) (acc).
November 7, 2018 Filing 2703 Summons Issued re #2702 Long Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
November 7, 2018 Filing 2702 LONG FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand John Moore, Individually and As Successor in Interest and Surviving Spouse of Esther Louise Moore, Deceased against Amlyn Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Eli Lilly and Company, filed by John Moore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael) (acc).
November 7, 2018 Filing 2701 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Teresa Washabaugh. (Parker, Brad) (acc).
November 6, 2018 Filing 2700 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eli Lilly and Company, as to Eli Lilly and Company. (Laurendeau, Amy) (acc).
November 6, 2018 Filing 2699 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, as to Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Laurendeau, Amy) (acc).
November 6, 2018 Filing 2698 Summons Issued re #2696 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
November 5, 2018 Filing 2697 NOTICE of Intent to Request Redaction by Paul Edward Boehm re #2682 Transcript,,, (Boehm, Paul)
November 5, 2018 Filing 2696 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Eli Lilly and Company, filed by Clarence Norl, Loretta Norl. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Drakulich, Robert)(acc).
November 2, 2018 Filing 2692 Summons Issued re #2689 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
November 1, 2018 Filing 2695 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: Case Number 18cv2506-AJB-MDD, Mosley v. Amylin Pharamceuticals, LLC et al. (Filed in CASD) (no document attached) (jdt)
November 1, 2018 Filing 2694 COURT EXHIBIT LIST (Telephonic Attorney Appearances). (ymm)
November 1, 2018 Filing 2693 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia: Telephonic Status Conference held on 11/1/2018. Counsel to contact the Court regarding a future date.(Court Reporter/ECR Jeannette Hill). (Counsel speaking on the record: Paul Boehm, Matt Kenerly, Ray Williams, Thor Hoerman, Amy Lorendau and Kenneth King) (Also See Court Exhibit A for Telephonic Attorney List ). (no document attached) (ymm)
November 1, 2018 Filing 2691 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #2690 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Boehm, Paul) (aef).
November 1, 2018 Filing 2690 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Boehm, Paul)(aef).
November 1, 2018 Filing 2689 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Eli Lilly & Company, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., Cathea Newsome, Novo Nordisk Inc., filed by Carroll Mosley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Service)New Summons Requested. (Sacks, Shayna) (acc). (Main Document 2689 replaced on 11/2/2018) (acc).
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2688 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia Rejecting re #2684 Motion to File Documents Under Seal, from Plaintiff Jean Adams. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ. L. Rule 5.1: Missing time and date on motion and/or supporting documentation, "The Court and Counsel will discuss the motion to compel further information about des-flouro-sitagliptin at the telephonic status conference on November 1, 2018 at 1:00 p.m.". IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is rejected. It is ordered that the Clerk STRIKE the document from the record, and serve a copy of this order on all parties. Signed by the Chambers of Judge Anthony J. Battaglia.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
October 31, 2018 Filing 2687 Summons Issued re #2686 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
October 31, 2018 Filing 2686 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Mary Lou Olivier, Gretchen Olivier Olano, and Jacob Henry Olivier, as Successors in Interest and Surviving Heirs of Harold A. Olivier, Jr., Deceased against Novo Nordisk Inc., filed by Gretchen Olivier Olano, Jacob Henry Olivier, Mary Lou Olivier. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael) (acc).
October 31, 2018 Filing 2685 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #2684 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Johnson, Michael) (aef).
October 31, 2018 Filing 2684 ***DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ECF #2688 *** - MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Johnson, Michael) (aef). Modified on 11/1/2018 to strike document; motion termed (aef).
October 31, 2018 Filing 2683 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily) (acc).
October 29, 2018 Filing 2682 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Motion Hearing) held on 10/25/2018 before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jeannette N. Hill. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 11/19/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/29/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/28/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service. Notice of Filing of Official Transcript only.) (akr)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2680 ORDER Regarding Telephonic Status Conference on November 1, 2018 at 1:00pm. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 10/26/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(acc)
October 25, 2018 Filing 2681 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia: Motion Hearing held on 10/25/2018. Matter submitted. Status Conference set for 11/1/2018 01:00 PM before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia.(Court Reporter/ECR Jeannette Hill). (Plaintiff Attorney Max Kimberly). (Defendant Attorney Amy Laurendaeau; Raymond Williams; Paul Boehm). Associated Cases: 3:13-md-02452-AJB-MDD et al.(no document attached) (gac) Modified on 11/5/2018 to correct date of motion hearing.(ymm).
October 24, 2018 Filing 2678 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eli Lilly and Company, as to Eli Lilly and Company. (Laurendeau, Amy) (acc).
October 24, 2018 Filing 2677 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, as to Amlyn Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Laurendeau, Amy) (acc).
October 24, 2018 Filing 2676 Summons Issued re #2674 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
October 24, 2018 Filing 2675 DECLARATION of Proposed Interim Estate Representative by Plaintiff Teresa Washabaugh. (Attachments: #1 Death Certificate)(Parker, Brad) (acc).
October 24, 2018 Filing 2674 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Judy Ann Hasty, As Successor in Interest and Surviving Heir of Gary Lynn Cantrell, Deceased against Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Eli Lilly and Company, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., Novo Nordisk Inc., filed by Judy Ann Hasty. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael) (acc).
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2673 ORDER by Judge Battaglia: Vacating the Order taxing costs (Doc. No. 1739), in light of the Ninth Circuit's decision on appeal.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (sc)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2672 ORDER finding as moot #1745 Motion for Taxation of Costs. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) CC: MDL Panel(no document attached) (sc)
October 23, 2018 Filing 2671 STATUS REPORT on behalf of all defendants regarding plaintiffs' Motion to Re-Tax Costs by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Boehm, Paul)(acc).
October 23, 2018 Filing 2670 NOTICE of Appearance (Parker, Brad) (acc).
October 22, 2018 Filing 2679 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 18cv2423-AJB-MDD, Molitierno v. Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Filed in CASD) (no document attached) (jdt)
October 22, 2018 Filing 2669 REPLY to Response to Motion re #2653 MOTION to Compel Fact Witness Depositions filed by All Plaintiffs. (Johnson, Michael) (acc).
October 18, 2018 Filing 2668 REPLY to Response to Motion re #2613 MOTION to Compel Discovery as to All Defendants filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit)(Johnson, Michael). (jah).
October 18, 2018 Filing 2667 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #2666 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Johnson, Michael) (aef).
October 18, 2018 Filing 2666 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Johnson, Michael) (aef).
October 15, 2018 Filing 2665 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2653 MOTION to Compel Fact Witness Depositions filed by Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Laurendeau, Amy) (acc).
October 11, 2018 Filing 2664 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2613 MOTION to Compel Discovery as to All Defendants filed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Boehm, Paul)(acc).
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2663 ORDER Granting #2659 Joint Motion to Extend Page Limits for Briefing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Discovery as to All Defendants. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 10/11/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(acc)
October 11, 2018 Filing 2662 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion/TIME CHANGE ONLY: #2613 MOTION to Compel Discovery as to All Defendants : Motion Hearing set for 10/25/2018 is moved up to 10:00 AM on the same day in Courtroom 4A before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (sc)
October 11, 2018 Filing 2661 NOTICE of Appearance of Diane K. Watkins (Watkins, Diane)(acc).
October 11, 2018 Filing 2659 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Boehm, Paul)Attorney Paul Edward Boehm added to party Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.(pty:dft), Attorney Paul Edward Boehm added to party Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.(pty:dft) (acc).
October 8, 2018 Filing 2660 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 18cv2318-AJB-MDD, Barker v. Novo Nordisk Inc. (Filed in CASD) (no document attached) (jdt)
October 8, 2018 Filing 2658 DECLARATION of Proposed Interim Estate Representative by Plaintiff Billy J. Ross. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Death Certificate)(Sill, Matthew)(acc).
October 2, 2018 Filing 2657 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily) (acc).
October 2, 2018 Filing 2656 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily) (acc).
October 2, 2018 Filing 2655 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily) (acc).
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2654 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re #2653 MOTION to Compel Fact Witness Depositions : Responses due by 10/15/2018; Replies due by 10/22/2018; sur-replies will not be accepted. Motion hearing scheduled for 1/17/19 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 4A.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (sc)
September 28, 2018 Filing 2653 MOTION to Compel Fact Witness Depositions by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Johnson, Michael) (acc).
September 27, 2018 Filing 2651 Summons Issued re #2650 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
September 26, 2018 Filing 2652 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 18cv2250-AJB-MDD, Lowe-Broadwine et al v. Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC et al. (Filed in CASD) (no document attached) (jdt)
September 26, 2018 Filing 2650 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Eli Lilly and Company, filed by WILLIAM LOWE, SALINA LOWE-BROADWINE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Service) (Sacks, Shayna) (acc). (Main Document 2650 replaced on 9/27/2018) (acc).
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2649 ORDER Requiring Status Report From Counsel on Plaintiffs' Motion to Re-Tax Costs. Status Report due by 10/25/2018. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 9/26/2018.(acc)
September 24, 2018 Filing 2648 Summons Issued re #2643 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
September 24, 2018 Filing 2647 Summons Issued re #2642 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
September 24, 2018 Filing 2646 Summons Issued re #2641 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
September 24, 2018 Filing 2645 Summons Issued re #2640 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
September 24, 2018 Filing 2644 Summons Issued re #2639 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
September 24, 2018 Filing 2643 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand James Daniels, Individually and as Successor in Interest and Surviving Heir of Patricia Daniels, Deceased against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., Novo Nordisk Inc., filed by James Daniels. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael) (acc).
September 24, 2018 Filing 2642 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Bonnie Jane Morgan, Individually and as Successor in Interest and Surviving Spouse of Randall Leroy Morgan, Deceased against Novo Nordisk Inc., filed by Bonnie Jane Morgan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael) (acc).
September 24, 2018 Filing 2641 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Lydia Calderon, Individually and as Successor in Interest and Surviving Spouse of Daniel John Calderon, Deceased against Novo Nordisk Inc., filed by Lydia Calderon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael) (acc).
September 24, 2018 Filing 2640 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Shelly Carolyn West, Individually and as Successor in Interest and Surviving Heir of Sue Swearingen Shumaker, Deceased against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., filed by Shelly Carolyn West. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael) (acc).
September 24, 2018 Filing 2639 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand JOEL ALAN JOHNSON against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., filed by Joel Alan Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael)(acc).
September 19, 2018 Filing 2638 DECLARATION of Proposed Interim Estate Representative by Plaintiff Samuel Milkman. (Attachments: #1 Death Certificate)(Plattenberger, Jacob)
September 18, 2018 Filing 2637 Summons Issued re #2636 Amended Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
September 18, 2018 Filing 2636 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., filed by Amy L. Manzo.New Summons Requested. (Lopez, Matthew) (acc).
September 12, 2018 Filing 2635 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily) (acc).
September 12, 2018 Filing 2634 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily) (acc).
September 12, 2018 Filing 2633 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily) (acc).
September 12, 2018 Filing 2632 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily) (acc).
September 12, 2018 Filing 2631 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily) (acc).
September 12, 2018 Filing 2630 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily) (acc).
September 12, 2018 Filing 2629 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eli Lilly and Company, as to Eli Lilly and Company. (Laurendeau, Amy) (acc).
September 12, 2018 Filing 2628 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eli Lilly and Company, as to Eli Lilly and Company. (Laurendeau, Amy) (acc).
September 12, 2018 Filing 2627 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, as to Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Laurendeau, Amy) (acc).
September 12, 2018 Filing 2626 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, as to Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Laurendeau, Amy) (acc).
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2625 ORDER Granting #2622 Motion to Modify the Case Management Order. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 9/10/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(acc)
September 10, 2018 Filing 2623 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily) (acc).
September 7, 2018 Filing 2622 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct the Case Management Order Deadline for Submitting Disputes Regarding Fact Witness Depositions by All Plaintiffs. (Johnson, Michael) (acc).
September 6, 2018 Filing 2621 Summons Issued re #2617 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
September 5, 2018 Filing 2624 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 18cv2053-AJB(MDD), Pletcher v. Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC et al (Filed in CASD) (no document attached) (rmc)
September 5, 2018 Filing 2620 DECLARATION of Proposed Interim Estate Representative by Plaintiff Matthias Mulvey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Death Certificate)(Johnson, Michael)(acc).
September 5, 2018 Filing 2619 DECLARATION of Proposed Interim Estate Representative by Plaintiff Don Bowen, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Death Certificate)(Johnson, Michael)(acc).
September 5, 2018 Filing 2618 DECLARATION of Proposed Interim Estate Representative by Plaintiff Billy Edward Baker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Death Certificate)(Johnson, Michael)(acc).
September 4, 2018 Filing 2617 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Amylin Pharamaceuticals LLC, Amylin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Eli Lilly & Company, Eli Lilly and Company, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., Merck Sharp & Dohme Ltd., Merck Sharpe & Dohme, Corp., Novo Nordisk Inc., filed by Mark Pletcher. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet) (Sacks, Shayna)(acc).
September 4, 2018 Filing 2616 Summons Issued re #2614 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
September 4, 2018 Filing 2615 NOTICE of Appearance on behalf of Douglas Kinley individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Betty Kinley (Thomas, Brady) (acc).
September 4, 2018 Filing 2614 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Bereda Mason, Individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of C L Mason, Deceased against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., filed by Bereda Mason. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit)New Summons Requested. (Goetz, Michael) (acc).
August 31, 2018 Filing 2613 MOTION to Compel Discovery as to All Defendants by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Michael K. Johnson, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Exhibit 27, #30 Exhibit 28, #31 Exhibit 29, #32 Exhibit 30, #33 Exhibit 31, #34 Exhibit 32, #35 Exhibit 33, #36 Exhibit 34, #37 Exhibit 35, #38 Exhibit 36, #39 Exhibit 37, #40 Exhibit 38, #41 Exhibit 39, #42 Exhibit 40, #43 Exhibit 41)(Johnson, Michael) (acc).
August 31, 2018 Filing 2612 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1438 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Johnson, Michael) (aef).
August 31, 2018 Filing 2611 DECLARATION re #2610 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal by Michael K. Johnson by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs. (Johnson, Michael) (acc).
August 31, 2018 Filing 2610 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Johnson, Michael) (aef).
August 29, 2018 Filing 2609 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eli Lilly and Company, as to Eli Lilly and Company. (Laurendeau, Amy) (acc).
August 29, 2018 Filing 2608 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, as to Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Laurendeau, Amy) (acc).
August 27, 2018 Filing 2606 Summons Issued re #2603 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
August 27, 2018 Filing 2605 Summons Issued re #2602 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
August 27, 2018 Filing 2604 Summons Issued re #2601 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
August 24, 2018 Filing 2607 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 18cv1976-AJB-MDD, Johnson v. Merk Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Filed in CASD) (no document attached) (jdt)
August 24, 2018 Filing 2603 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Harold Pike, Individually and as Successor in Interest and Surviving Spouse of Connie R. Pike, Deceased against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., filed by Harold Pike. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael) (acc).
August 24, 2018 Filing 2602 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand LONG FORM COMPLAINT for Christina M. Arredondo, Individually and as Successor in Interest and Surviving Heir of Linda M. Arredondo, Deceased against Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Eli Lilly and Company, Novo Nordisk Inc., filed by Christina M. Arredondo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael) (acc).
August 24, 2018 Filing 2601 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Luis Avelar against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., filed by Luis Avelar. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael) (acc).
August 21, 2018 Filing 2600 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eli Lilly and Company, as to Eli Lilly and Company. (Laurendeau, Amy) (acc).
August 21, 2018 Filing 2599 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, as to Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Laurendeau, Amy)(acc).
August 21, 2018 Filing 2598 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eli Lilly and Company, as to Eli Lilly and Company. (Laurendeau, Amy) (acc).
August 21, 2018 Filing 2597 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, as to Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Laurendeau, Amy)(acc).
August 21, 2018 Filing 2596 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eli Lilly and Company, as to Eli Lilly and Company. (Laurendeau, Amy) (acc).
August 21, 2018 Filing 2595 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, as to Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Laurendeau, Amy) (acc).
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2594 ORDER granting #2590 Joint Motion to Modify the Case Management Order. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 8/21/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(acc)
August 20, 2018 Filing 2593 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily) (acc).
August 20, 2018 Filing 2592 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily) (acc).
August 20, 2018 Filing 2591 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily) (acc).
August 17, 2018 Filing 2590 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct the Case Management Order by All Plaintiffs. (Johnson, Michael) (acc).
August 16, 2018 Filing 2589 NOTICE of Change of Address by John M. Restaino, Jr (Restaino, John) (acc).
August 16, 2018 Filing 2588 Summons Issued re #2579 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
August 16, 2018 Filing 2587 Summons Issued re #2578 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
August 16, 2018 Filing 2586 Summons Issued re #2577 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
August 16, 2018 Filing 2585 Summons Issued re #2576 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
August 16, 2018 Filing 2584 Summons Issued re #2575 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
August 16, 2018 Filing 2583 Summons Issued re #2574 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
August 16, 2018 Filing 2582 Summons Issued re #2573 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
August 16, 2018 Filing 2581 Summons Issued re #2572 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
August 16, 2018 Filing 2580 DECLARATION of Proposed Interim Estate Representative by Plaintiff Beverly Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Death Certificate)(Johnson, Michael) (acc).
August 16, 2018 Filing 2579 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Jerry Botarf against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., Novo Nordisk Inc., filed by Jerry Botarf. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael)(acc).
August 16, 2018 Filing 2578 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Joseph Lindsay against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., Novo Nordisk Inc., filed by Joseph Lindsay. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael) (acc).
August 16, 2018 Filing 2577 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Don Bowen, Sr., Individually and as Successor in Interest and Surviving Spouse of Tomilyn Bowen, Deceased against Novo Nordisk Inc., filed by Don Bowen, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael) (acc).
August 16, 2018 Filing 2576 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Matthias Mulvey, Individually and as Successor in Interest and Surviving Spouse of Rosemary Mulvey, Deceased against Novo Nordisk Inc., filed by Matthias Mulvey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael)(acc).
August 16, 2018 Filing 2575 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Mary Anne Pearson, Individually and as Successor in Interest and Surviving Spouse of Douglas Pearson, Deceased against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., Novo Nordisk Inc., filed by Mary Anne Pearson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael) (acc).
August 16, 2018 Filing 2574 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Carmen Garcia against Novo Nordisk Inc., filed by Carmen Garcia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael)(acc).
August 16, 2018 Filing 2573 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand LONG FORM COMPLAINT for Robert Earl Idom, Individually and as Successor in Interest and Surviving Spouse of Luella Idom, Deceased against Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Eli Lilly and Company, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., Novo Nordisk Inc., filed by Robert Earl Idom. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael) (acc).
August 16, 2018 Filing 2572 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Billy Edward Baker, Individually and as Successor in Interest and Surviving Spouse of Teresa Ann Baker, Deceased against Novo Nordisk Inc., filed by Billy Edward Baker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael) (acc).
August 14, 2018 Filing 2571 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 18cv1894-AJB-MDD, Wentz v. Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (filed in CASD) (no document attached) (jdt)
August 9, 2018 Filing 2570 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Novo Nordisk Inc. . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Williams, Raymond)(acc).
August 9, 2018 Filing 2569 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Novo Nordisk Inc., as to Novo Nordisk Inc. (Williams, Raymond) (acc).
August 9, 2018 Filing 2568 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Novo Nordisk Inc. . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Williams, Raymond) (acc).
August 9, 2018 Filing 2567 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Novo Nordisk Inc., as to Novo Nordisk Inc. (Williams, Raymond) (acc).
August 9, 2018 Filing 2566 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Novo Nordisk Inc. . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Williams, Raymond) (acc).
August 9, 2018 Filing 2565 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Novo Nordisk Inc., as to Novo Nordisk Inc. (Williams, Raymond) Modified on 8/9/2018 (acc).
August 6, 2018 Filing 2563 NOTICE of Appearance on behalf of Giordano Yepez, (Humphrey, Debra) (acc).
August 6, 2018 Filing 2562 NOTICE of Appearance on behalf of Carol Seiler-Kuzmick, (Humphrey, Debra)(acc).
August 6, 2018 Filing 2561 NOTICE of Appearance on behalf of Consetta MaGatz, (Humphrey, Debra) (acc).
August 6, 2018 Filing 2560 NOTICE of Appearance on behalf of Emory Ledbetter, (Humphrey, Debra) (acc).
August 6, 2018 Filing 2559 NOTICE of Appearance on behalf of John Jarvais, (Humphrey, Debra)(acc).
August 6, 2018 Filing 2558 NOTICE of Appearance on behalf of Xuan Duong, (Humphrey, Debra) (acc).
August 6, 2018 Filing 2557 NOTICE of Appearance on behalf of Mary Dixon, (Humphrey, Debra)(acc).
August 6, 2018 Filing 2556 NOTICE of Appearance on behalf of Amparo Alcala, (Humphrey, Debra)(acc).
August 6, 2018 Filing 2555 NOTICE of Appearance (Ratner, Dale)(acc).
August 6, 2018 Filing 2554 NOTICE of Appearance Carol Seiler-Kuzmick (Ratner, Dale) (acc).
August 6, 2018 Filing 2553 NOTICE of Appearance (Ratner, Dale) (acc).
August 6, 2018 Filing 2552 NOTICE of Appearance (Ratner, Dale)(acc).
August 6, 2018 Filing 2551 NOTICE of Appearance (Ratner, Dale)(acc).
August 6, 2018 Filing 2550 NOTICE of Appearance (Ratner, Dale)(acc).
August 6, 2018 Filing 2549 NOTICE of Appearance (Ratner, Dale)(acc).
August 6, 2018 Filing 2548 NOTICE of Appearance (Ratner, Dale) (acc).
August 2, 2018 Filing 2564 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 18cv1790-AJB-MDD Quickmire v. Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. et al (filed in CASD). (no document attached) (jdt)
August 2, 2018 Filing 2547 DECLARATION of Proposed Interim Estate Representative by Plaintiff Christina Dargan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Death Certificate)(Johnson, Michael) (acc).
August 2, 2018 Filing 2546 DECLARATION of Proposed Interim Estate Representative by Plaintiff Janet Vawter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Death Certificate)(Johnson, Michael) (acc).
August 2, 2018 Filing 2545 DECLARATION of Proposed Interim Estate Representative by Plaintiff Elmore Timmons, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Death Certificate)(Johnson, Michael) (acc).
July 27, 2018 Filing 2544 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily) (acc).
July 27, 2018 Filing 2543 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily) (acc).
July 27, 2018 Filing 2542 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily) (acc).
July 27, 2018 Filing 2541 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily)(acc).
July 27, 2018 Filing 2540 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily) (acc).
July 27, 2018 Filing 2539 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily) (acc).
July 27, 2018 Filing 2538 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily) Modified on 7/30/2018 (acc).
July 27, 2018 Filing 2537 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily) (acc).
July 25, 2018 Filing 2536 Summons Issued re #2533 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
July 25, 2018 Filing 2535 Summons Issued re [2532} Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
July 25, 2018 Filing 2534 DECLARATION of Proposed Interim Estate Representative by Plaintiff Brian Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Death Certificate)(Johnson, Michael) (acc).
July 25, 2018 Filing 2533 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Ann Nostin against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., filed by Ann Nostin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael)(acc).
July 25, 2018 Filing 2532 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Michelle Ann Ray, Individually and as Successor in Interest and Surviving Spouse of Bobby Henry Ray, Jr., Deceased against Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Eli Lilly and Company, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., Novo Nordisk Inc., filed by Michelle Ann Ray. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael) (acc).
July 18, 2018 Filing 2531 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eli Lilly and Company, as to Eli Lilly and Company. (Laurendeau, Amy) (acc).
July 18, 2018 Filing 2530 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, as to Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Laurendeau, Amy) (acc).
July 18, 2018 Filing 2529 Summons Issued re #2528 Long Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
July 18, 2018 Filing 2528 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand LONG FORM COMPLAINT for Beverly Jackson, Individually and as Successor in Interest and Surviving Spouse of William R. Jackson, Deceased against Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Eli Lilly and Company, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., Novo Nordisk Inc., filed by Beverly Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael) (acc).
July 18, 2018 Filing 2527 Summons Issued re #2525 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
July 18, 2018 Filing 2526 Summons Issued re #2524 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
July 18, 2018 Filing 2525 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Gisela Stanley against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., filed by Gisela Stanley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael) (acc).
July 18, 2018 Filing 2524 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Katherine North, Individually and as Successor in Interest and Surviving Spouse of Clarence Milton North, Deceased against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., filed by Katherine North. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael) (acc).
June 28, 2018 Filing 2523 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 18cv1467-AJB-MDD Boyd et al v. Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. et al (filed in CASD). (no document attached) (jdt)
June 28, 2018 Filing 2522 Summons Issued re #2520 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
June 28, 2018 Filing 2521 Summons Issued re #2519 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
June 28, 2018 Filing 2520 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Ella McInelly, Individually and as Successor in Interest and Surviving Heir of Jerry Don Reece, Deceased against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., filed by Ella McInelly. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael) (acc).
June 28, 2018 Filing 2519 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Katherina Costello, Individually and as Successor in Interest and Surviving Heir of Marjorie Penne, Deceased against Novo Nordisk Inc., filed by Katherina Costello. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael) (acc).
June 26, 2018 Filing 2518 DECLARATION of Proposed Interim Estate Representative by Plaintiff Anne Petrat. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Death Certificate)(Johnson, Michael) (acc).
June 22, 2018 Filing 2517 Summons Issued re #2515 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
June 22, 2018 Filing 2516 Summons Issued re #2514 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
June 21, 2018 Filing 2515 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Lonnie Rollison against Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Eli Lilly and Company, filed by Lonnie Rollison. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Goetz, Michael) (acc).
June 21, 2018 Filing 2514 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Kathleen DiRocco, Individually and as Executrix of the Estate of Michael DiRocco, Deceased against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., filed by Kathleen DiRocco. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Goetz, Michael) (acc).
June 20, 2018 Filing 2513 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 18cv1340-AJB(MDD), Costiglio v. Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC et al (Filed in CASD) (no document attached) (rmc)
June 20, 2018 Filing 2512 DECLARATION of Proposed Interim Estate Representative by Plaintiff Lawrence Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Death Certificate)(Johnson, Michael) (acc).
June 20, 2018 Filing 2511 DECLARATION of Proposed Interim Estate Representative by Plaintiff Tamara Guliaiev. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Death Certificate)(Johnson, Michael) (acc).
June 20, 2018 Filing 2510 DECLARATION of Proposed Interim Estate Representative by Plaintiff Betty Schobey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Death Certificate)(Johnson, Michael) (acc).
June 20, 2018 Filing 2509 DECLARATION of Proposed Interim Estate Representative by Plaintiff Randy Myrup. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Death Certificate)(Johnson, Michael) (acc).
June 20, 2018 Filing 2508 DECLARATION of Proposed Interim Estate Representative by Plaintiff Carla Lepine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Death Certificate)(Johnson, Michael) (acc).
June 20, 2018 Filing 2507 DECLARATION of Proposed Interim Estate Representative by Plaintiff Elaine Bacopoulos. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Death Certificate)(Johnson, Michael) (acc).
June 20, 2018 Filing 2506 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily) (acc).
June 19, 2018 Filing 2505 DECLARATION of Proposed Interim Estate Representative re #2404 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous (Other 1), by Plaintiff Mark Kelner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Death Certificate)(Lopez, Matthew) (acc).
June 19, 2018 Filing 2504 DECLARATION of Proposed Interim Estate Representative re #2404 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous (Other 1), by Plaintiff Carrie Cook. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Death Certificate)(Lopez, Matthew) (acc).
June 15, 2018 Filing 2503 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eli Lilly and Company, as to Eli Lilly and Company. (Laurendeau, Amy)(acc).
June 15, 2018 Filing 2502 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, as to Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Laurendeau, Amy) (acc).
June 15, 2018 Filing 2501 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eli Lilly and Company, as to Eli Lilly and Company. (Laurendeau, Amy) (acc).
June 15, 2018 Filing 2500 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, as to Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Laurendeau, Amy) (acc).
June 14, 2018 Filing 2499 DECLARATION of Proposed Interim Estate Representative re #2404 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous (Other 1), by Plaintiff Melinda Silk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Death Certificate)(Lopez, Matthew) (acc).
June 14, 2018 Filing 2498 DECLARATION of Proposed Interim Estate Representative re #2404 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous (Other 1), by Plaintiff Lucas Ojeda. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Death Certificate)(Lopez, Matthew) (acc).
June 14, 2018 Filing 2497 DECLARATION of Proposed Interim Estate Representative re #2404 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous (Other 1), by Plaintiff Jaklin Sayegh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Death Certificate)(Lopez, Matthew) (acc).
June 14, 2018 Filing 2496 DECLARATION of Proposed Interim Estate Representative re #2404 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous (Other 1), by Plaintiff Leona Knicely. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Death Certificate)(Lopez, Matthew)(acc).
June 14, 2018 Filing 2495 DECLARATION of Proposed Interim Estate Representative re #2404 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous (Other 1), by Plaintiff Nancy Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Death Certificate)(Lopez, Matthew) (acc).
June 13, 2018 Filing 2494 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Novo Nordisk Inc. . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Williams, Raymond) (acc).
June 13, 2018 Filing 2493 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Novo Nordisk Inc., as to Novo Nordisk Inc. (Williams, Raymond)(acc).
June 13, 2018 Filing 2492 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Novo Nordisk Inc. . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Williams, Raymond)(acc).
June 13, 2018 Filing 2491 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Novo Nordisk Inc., as to Novo Nordisk Inc. (Williams, Raymond) (acc).
June 13, 2018 Filing 2490 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Novo Nordisk Inc. . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Williams, Raymond)(acc).
June 13, 2018 Filing 2489 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Novo Nordisk Inc., as to Novo Nordisk Inc. (Williams, Raymond) (acc).
June 13, 2018 Filing 2488 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Novo Nordisk Inc. . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Williams, Raymond)(acc).
June 13, 2018 Filing 2487 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Novo Nordisk Inc., as to Novo Nordisk Inc. (Williams, Raymond) (acc).
June 13, 2018 Filing 2486 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Novo Nordisk Inc. . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Williams, Raymond)(acc).
June 13, 2018 Filing 2485 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Novo Nordisk Inc., as to Novo Nordisk Inc. (Williams, Raymond) (acc).
June 13, 2018 Filing 2484 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Novo Nordisk Inc. . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Williams, Raymond) (acc).
June 13, 2018 Filing 2483 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Novo Nordisk Inc., as to Novo Nordisk Inc. (Williams, Raymond) (acc).
June 4, 2018 Filing 2482 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.. (Pistilli, Emily) (anh).
June 4, 2018 Filing 2481 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.. (Pistilli, Emily) (anh).
June 4, 2018 Filing 2480 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.. (Pistilli, Emily) (anh).
June 1, 2018 Filing 2479 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 18cv1121-AJB(MDD), Orlowski v. Novo Nordisk Inc. (Filed in CASD) (no document attached) (rmc)
May 30, 2018 Filing 2478 Summons Issued re #2475 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
May 30, 2018 Filing 2477 Summons Issued re #2474 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
May 30, 2018 Filing 2476 Summons Issued re #2473 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
May 30, 2018 Filing 2475 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Elmore Timmons, Jr., Individually and as Successor in Interest and Surviving Heir of Elmore Timmons, Deceased against Novo Nordisk Inc., filed by Elmore Timmons, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael) (acc).
May 30, 2018 Filing 2474 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Louise Strickland against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., Novo Nordisk Inc., filed by Louise Strickland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael) (acc).
May 30, 2018 Filing 2473 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Claudia Richardson against Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Eli Lilly and Company, filed by Claudia Richardson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael) (acc).
May 29, 2018 Filing 2472 Summons Issued re #2470 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
May 29, 2018 Filing 2471 Summons Issued re #2469 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
May 25, 2018 Filing 2470 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Anna Jacqueline Kelley, Individually and as Successor in Interest and Surviving Spouse of William Richard Kelley, Deceased against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., filed by Anna Jacqueline Kelley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael) (acc).
May 25, 2018 Filing 2469 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Belinda Ledbetter and Emory Ledbetter against All Defendants, filed by Belinda Ledbetter.New Summons Requested. (Ratner, Dale) (Main Document 2469 replaced on 5/29/2018) (acc).
May 25, 2018 Filing 2468 Summons Issued re #2465 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
May 24, 2018 Filing 2467 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Gloria Howell re #2464 Short Form Complaint - MDL 2452, filed by Gloria Howell . (Sacks, Shayna)
May 24, 2018 Filing 2466 DECLARATION of Proposed Interim Estate Representative re #2404 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous (Other 1), by Plaintiff Betty L Stuard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Death certificate, #2 Exhibit Letters of Independent Administration)(Elliott, Neal)(acc).
May 23, 2018 Filing 2465 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Gloria Howell, Individually, on behalf of all wrongful death beneficiaries, and as proposed personal representative for Ola Lee Williams, deceased against All Defendants, filed by Gloria Howell.New Summons Requested. (Sacks, Shayna) (acc).
May 23, 2018 Filing 2464 ***WITHDRAWN per #2467 ***SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Gloria Williams, Individually, on behalf of all wrongful death beneficiaries, and as proposed personal representative for Ola Lee Williams, deceased against Amylin Pharamaceuticals LLC, filed by Gloria Howell.New Summons Requested. (Sacks, Shayna) Modified on 5/25/2018 (acc).
May 14, 2018 Filing 2463 Summons Issued re #2462 Amended Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
May 14, 2018 Filing 2462 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Short Form Complaint against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., filed by Jeanette Engle.New Summons Requested. (Lopez, Matthew) (acc).
May 14, 2018 Filing 2461 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily) (acc).
May 14, 2018 Filing 2460 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily) (acc).
May 14, 2018 Filing 2459 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily) (acc).
May 14, 2018 Filing 2458 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily) (acc).
May 14, 2018 Filing 2457 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily) (acc).
May 14, 2018 Filing 2456 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily) (acc).
May 10, 2018 Filing 2455 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eli Lilly and Company, as to Eli Lilly and Company. (Laurendeau, Amy) (acc).
May 10, 2018 Filing 2454 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, as to Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Laurendeau, Amy) (acc).
May 10, 2018 Filing 2453 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eli Lilly and Company, as to Eli Lilly and Company. (Laurendeau, Amy) (acc).
May 10, 2018 Filing 2452 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, as to Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Laurendeau, Amy) (acc).
May 10, 2018 Filing 2451 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eli Lilly and Company, as to Eli Lilly and Company. (Laurendeau, Amy) (acc).
May 10, 2018 Filing 2450 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, as to Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Laurendeau, Amy) (acc).
May 10, 2018 Filing 2449 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eli Lilly and Company, as to Eli Lilly and Company. (Laurendeau, Amy) (acc).
May 10, 2018 Filing 2448 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, as to Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Laurendeau, Amy) (acc).
May 4, 2018 Filing 2447 Summons Issued re #2446 Amended Short Form Comaplaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
May 4, 2018 Filing 2446 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Emma Turner, As Personal Representative of Robert Turner against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., Merck & Co., Inc., filed by Emma Turner.New Summons Requested. (Boyd, Ernest) (acc).
May 2, 2018 Filing 2445 Summons Issued re #2443 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
May 1, 2018 Filing 2444 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 18cv837-AJB(MDD), Bishop v. Merk Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Filed in CASD) (no document attached) (rmc)
May 1, 2018 Filing 2443 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Eli Lilly and Company, filed by Samuel Milkman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Plattenberger, Jacob) (acc).
April 30, 2018 Filing 2442 Summons Issued re #2441 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
April 30, 2018 Filing 2441 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Janet Vawter, Individually and as Successor in Interest and Surviving Spouse of Keith Vawter, Deceased against Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Eli Lilly and Company, Novo Nordisk Inc., filed by Janet Vawter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael)(acc).
April 30, 2018 Filing 2440 Summons Issued re #2439 Long Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
April 27, 2018 Filing 2439 LONG FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Long Form Complaint for Joyce King, Individually and as Successor in Interest and Surviving Spouse of Jeffrey King, Sr., Deceased against Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Eli Lilly and Company, Joyce King, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., Novo Nordisk Inc., filed by Joyce King. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael) (acc).
April 23, 2018 Filing 2438 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily) (acc).
April 23, 2018 Filing 2437 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily) (acc).
April 19, 2018 Filing 2436 Summons Issued re #2434 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
April 19, 2018 Filing 2435 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 18cv758-AJB(MDD), Marchitte v. Novo Nordisk, Inc. (transfer from Western District of New York, 1:18-cv-00408) (no document attached) (rmc)
April 19, 2018 Filing 2434 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Yvette Patton Rucker, Individually and as Successor in Interest and Surviving Spouse of Ralph Rucker, Deceased against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., filed by Yvette Patton Rucker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael) (acc).
April 18, 2018 Filing 2433 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-35), re MDL No. 2452 (rmc)
April 13, 2018 Filing 2432 Summons Issued re #2428 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
April 13, 2018 Filing 2431 Summons Issued re #2427 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
April 13, 2018 Filing 2430 Summons Issued re #2426 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
April 13, 2018 Filing 2429 Summons Issued re #2425 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
April 12, 2018 Filing 2428 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Irene Nieve Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Ratner, Dale) (acc). (Main Document 2428 replaced on 4/13/2018) (acc). (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/13/2018) (acc).
April 12, 2018 Filing 2427 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Ronald Lipsman, Individually and as Successor in Interest and Surviving Spouse of Rochelle Lipsman, Deceased against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., filed by Ronald Lipsman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael) (acc).
April 12, 2018 Filing 2426 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Brian Wright, Individually and as Successor in Interest and Surviving Heir of Bobbye Wright, Deceased against Amlyn Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Eli Lilly and Company, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., Novo Nordisk Inc., filed by Brian Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael) (acc).
April 12, 2018 Filing 2425 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Paul Wilson, Sr., Individually and as Successor in Interest and Surviving Spouse of Brenda Kay Wilson, Deceased against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., filed by Paul Wilson, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael) (acc).
April 9, 2018 Filing 2424 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily) (acc).
April 2, 2018 Filing 2423 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eli Lilly and Company, as to Eli Lilly and Company. (Laurendeau, Amy)(acc).
April 2, 2018 Filing 2422 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, as to Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Laurendeau, Amy) (acc).
April 2, 2018 Filing 2421 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eli Lilly and Company, as to Eli Lilly and Company. (Laurendeau, Amy) (acc).
April 2, 2018 Filing 2420 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, as to Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Laurendeau, Amy) (acc).
April 2, 2018 Filing 2419 Summons Issued re #2417 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
April 2, 2018 Filing 2418 Summons Issued re #2415 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
April 2, 2018 Filing 2417 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Christina Dargan, Individually and as Successor in Interest and Surviving Heir of Pearline Roane, Deceased against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., filed by Christina Dargan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael)(acc).
March 30, 2018 Filing 2416 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 18cv650-AJB(MDD), Macheachron v. Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC et al (Case filed in CASD) (no document attached) (rmc)
March 30, 2018 Filing 2415 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Barbara Pratt, Individually and as Successor in Interest and Surviving Spouse of Kenneth Pratt, Deceased against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., filed by Barbara Pratt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael) (acc).
March 28, 2018 Filing 2414 Summons Issued re #2413 Amended Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
March 28, 2018 Filing 2413 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., filed by Gwendolyn Flynn.New Summons Requested. (Lopez, Matthew) (acc).
March 27, 2018 Filing 2412 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #2407 Transcript. Mail sent to Rolf Fiebiger. (acc)
March 26, 2018 Filing 2411 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #2396 Notice of Filing of Transcript. Mail sent to Timothy J Becker. (acc)
March 23, 2018 Filing 2410 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eli Lilly and Company, as to Eli Lilly and Company. (Laurendeau, Amy) (acc).
March 23, 2018 Filing 2409 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, as to Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Laurendeau, Amy) (acc).
March 23, 2018 Filing 2408 Summons Issued re #2406 Long Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
March 22, 2018 Filing 2407 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Status Hearing) held on 3/20/2018, before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jeannette N. Hill. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 4/12/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/23/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/20/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service. Notice of Filing of Official Transcript only.) (akr)
March 22, 2018 Filing 2406 LONG FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand LONG FORM COMPLAINT Elaine Bacopoulos, Individually and as Successor in Interest and Surviving Spouse of Bill Bacopoulos, Deceased against Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Eli Lilly and Company, filed by Elaine Bacopoulos. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael) Modified on 3/23/2018 to change docket text(acc).
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2404 ORDER granting #2400 Joint Motion to Approve Fourth Amended Stipulation and Enter Order Related to Filings Derivative Plaintiffs Acting as Interim Estate Representatives. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 3/22/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(acc)
March 21, 2018 Filing 2403 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Brown on behalf of Bonnie Wyllie (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jrd)Attorney Timothy Brown added to party Bonnie Wyllie(pty:pla)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2401 Order Following Case Management Conference. Case Management Conference held on 3/20/2018. The filing deadline for Daubert and summary judgment motions is set for 12/11/2018, oppositions are due 1//11/2019, and replies are due 2/8/2019. The Court will hear argument on the motions pending at that time on 2/20/2019 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 4A. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 3/21/2018.(acc)
March 21, 2018 Filing 2400 Joint MOTION to Approve Fourth Amended Stipulation and Enter Order Related to Filings by Derivative Plaintiffs Acting as Interim Estate Representatives by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Plattenberger, Jacob) QC re: proposed order (acc).
March 20, 2018 Filing 2405 COURT EXHIBIT LIST. (ymm)
March 20, 2018 Filing 2402 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia: Telephonic Status Hearing held on 3/20/2018. Court will issue order.Court marks Attorney Telephonic Appearances as Court Exhibit 1.(Court Reporter/ECR Jeannette Hill). (Plaintiff Attorney (See Court Exhibit 1 for all Telephonic Attorney Appearances)). (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (ymm)
March 14, 2018 Filing 2399 Summons Issued re #2397 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
March 14, 2018 Filing 2398 Summons Issued re #2394 Amended Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
March 14, 2018 Filing 2397 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., filed by Billy J. Ross. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Sill, Matthew) (acc).
March 14, 2018 Filing 2396 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Appeal Mandate Hearing) held on 2/27/2018, before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jeannette N. Hill. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 4/4/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/16/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/12/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service. Notice of Filing of Official Transcript only.) (akr)
March 14, 2018 Filing 2395 Summons Issued re #2389 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
March 14, 2018 Filing 2394 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., filed by Harriet M. Bellanfant.New Summons Requested. (Lopez, Matthew)(acc).
March 13, 2018 Filing 2393 STATUS REPORT / Defendants' Brief Regarding the Sequencing of Discovery and Dispositive Motions by Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Amy J. Laurendeau, #2 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Laurendeau, #3 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Laurendeau, #4 Exhibit C to the Declaration of Laurendeau, #5 Exhibit D to the Declaration of Laurendeau, #6 Exhibit E to the Declaration of Laurendeau, #7 Exhibit F to the Declaration of Laurendeau, #8 Exhibit G to the Declaration of Laurendeau, #9 Exhibit H to the Declaration of Laurendeau, #10 Exhibit I to the Declaration of Laurendeau, #11 Exhibit J to the Declaration of Laurendeau)(Laurendeau, Amy) (acc).
March 13, 2018 Filing 2392 STATUS REPORT Regarding Proposed Post-Appeal Schedule by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Johnson, Michael)(acc).
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2391 ORDER BY JUDGE BATTAGLIA: Plaintiff's Steering Committee should make telephonic arrangements for the 3/20/18 status hearing, provide the Court with the conference call information and provide a list of participants 24 hours prior to the conference. (no document attached) (sc)
March 13, 2018 Filing 2390 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, as to Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Laurendeau, Amy) (acc).
March 13, 2018 Filing 2389 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., filed by Ruth Ann Sellers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Bruehl, Curtis)
March 9, 2018 Filing 2388 Summons Issued re #2386 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
March 9, 2018 Filing 2387 Summons Issued re #2385 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
March 8, 2018 Filing 2386 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Velda Nunno against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., filed by Velda Nunno. (Attachments: #1 Notice)New Summons Requested. (Boyd, Ernest) (acc).
March 8, 2018 Filing 2385 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Anne Petrat, Individually and as Successor in Interest and Surviving Spouse of Dietmar Petrat, Deceased against Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Eli Lilly and Company, filed by Anne Petrat. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael) (acc).
March 7, 2018 Filing 2384 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 18cv496-AJB(MDD), Morehouse v. Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. et al (transfer from Mississippi Northern, 4:18-cv-00051) (no document attached) (rmc)
March 7, 2018 Filing 2383 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-34) re MDL No. 2452. (rmc)
March 1, 2018 Filing 2382 NOTICE of Change of Address by Dale Bernardo Ratner (Ratner, Dale)(acc).
February 27, 2018 Filing 2381 COURT EXHIBIT LIST. (ymm)
February 27, 2018 Filing 2380 MANDATE of USCA vacating and remanding to the USDC as to #1621 Notice of Appeal to the 9th Circuit. (akr)
February 27, 2018 Filing 2379 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia: Telephonic Appeal Mandate Hearing held on 2/27/2018. Court spreads the Mandate and Appeal Mandate ordered filed for USCA Case Number(s): 15-56997. Court sets 3/13/18 filing deadline. Attorney telephonic appearance list filed as court exhibit 1. ( Status Hearing set for 3/20/2018 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4A before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia.)(Court Reporter/ECR Jeannette Hill). (Plaintiff Attorney - All telephonic appearances). (Defendant Attorney - All telephonic appearances). (no document attached) (ymm)
February 27, 2018 Filing 2378 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Eli Lilly and Company, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., filed by Brittany J. Spencer, Personal Representative of the Estate of Colleen M. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Appointment) (Barone Baden, Kimberly) (acc).
February 26, 2018 Filing 2377 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eli Lilly and Company, as to Eli Lilly and Company. (Laurendeau, Amy) (acc).
February 26, 2018 Filing 2376 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, as to Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Laurendeau, Amy) (acc).
February 20, 2018 Filing 2375 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Novo Nordisk Inc. . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Williams, Raymond)(acc).
February 20, 2018 Filing 2374 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Novo Nordisk Inc., as to Novo Nordisk Inc. (Williams, Raymond) (acc).
February 20, 2018 Filing 2373 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Novo Nordisk Inc. . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Williams, Raymond) (acc).
February 20, 2018 Filing 2372 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Novo Nordisk Inc., as to Novo Nordisk Inc. (Williams, Raymond) (acc).
February 20, 2018 Filing 2371 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Novo Nordisk Inc. . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Williams, Raymond)(acc).
February 20, 2018 Filing 2370 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Novo Nordisk Inc., as to Novo Nordisk Inc. (Williams, Raymond)(acc).
February 20, 2018 Filing 2369 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Novo Nordisk Inc. . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Williams, Raymond)(acc).
February 20, 2018 Filing 2368 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Novo Nordisk Inc., as to Novo Nordisk Inc. (Williams, Raymond)(acc).
February 8, 2018 Filing 2367 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 18-cv-00306-AJB-MDD, Fleming v. Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP et al (Case filed in CASD) (no document attached) (jjg)
February 7, 2018 Filing 2366 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily) (acc).
February 7, 2018 Filing 2365 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily)(acc).
February 7, 2018 Filing 2364 NOTICE of Appearance of William T. Marks (Marks, William)(acc).
January 31, 2018 Filing 2363 Summons Issued re #2362 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
January 31, 2018 Filing 2362 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., filed by Mark Kelner.New Summons Requested. (Lopez, Matthew)(acc).
January 31, 2018 Filing 2361 Summons Issued re #2360 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
January 31, 2018 Filing 2360 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Dick Alcala. (Attachments: #1 Coversheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons) (Ratner, Dale) Modified on 1/31/2018 to flatten pdfs(acc). (Main Document 2360 replaced on 1/31/2018) (acc). (Attachment 1 replaced on 1/31/2018) (acc).
January 30, 2018 Filing 2359 DECLARATION of Proposed Interim Estate Representative by Plaintiff Nancy Santiago. (Attachments: #1 Death Certificate)(Plattenberger, Jacob)(acc).
January 30, 2018 Filing 2358 DECLARATION of Proposed Interim Estate Representative by Plaintiff Glen Harriel. (Attachments: #1 Death Certificate)(Plattenberger, Jacob)(acc).
January 29, 2018 Filing 2357 Summons Issued re #2355 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
January 29, 2018 Filing 2356 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 18-cv-00199-AJB-MDD Hillman et al v. Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Filed in CASD) (no document attached) (rmc)
January 29, 2018 Filing 2355 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., filed by Marco Sully Rodriguez, Executor of the Estate of Nuris Padilla. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Barone Baden, Kimberly) (acc).
January 23, 2018 Filing 2354 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eli Lilly and Company, as to Eli Lilly and Company. (Laurendeau, Amy) (acc).
January 23, 2018 Filing 2353 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amlyn Pharmaceuticals, LLC, as to Amylin Pharamaceuticals LLC. (Laurendeau, Amy)(acc).
January 23, 2018 Filing 2352 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily) (acc).
January 23, 2018 Filing 2351 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily)(acc).
January 23, 2018 Filing 2349 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs re #2348 Joint MOTION to Continue the Appeal Mandate Hearing (Thompson, Ryan)(acc).
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2350 ORDER granting #2348 Joint Motion to Continue. Telephonic Appeal Mandate Hearing set for 2/27/2018 04:30 PM before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 1/22/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(acc)
January 22, 2018 Filing 2348 Joint MOTION to Continue the Appeal Mandate Hearing by All Plaintiffs. (Thompson, Ryan) QC re: missing cert of service(acc).
January 8, 2018 Filing 2347 Summons Issued re #2288 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
January 8, 2018 Filing 2346 Summons Issued re #2287 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
January 5, 2018 Filing 2345 Summons Issued re #2344 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
January 5, 2018 Filing 2344 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., filed by Julia Polakoff. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Plattenberger, Jacob)(acc).
January 5, 2018 Filing 2343 NOTICE of Spreading the Mandate: Appeal Mandate Hearing set for 2/7/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4A before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia. Plaintiffs' Steering Committee and defense counsel only need appear and should provide a list of participants and call in information 24 hours prior to the conference via efile. (no document attached) (ymm) Modified on 1/5/2018 (ymm).
December 22, 2017 Filing 2342 Summons Issued re #2340 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
December 22, 2017 Filing 2341 Summons Issued re #2339 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
December 22, 2017 Filing 2340 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Ted Goldsmith, Individually and as Successor in Interest and Surviving Spouse of Janice Miller-Goldsmith, Deceased against Novo Nordisk Inc., filed by Ted Goldsmith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael) (acc).
December 22, 2017 Filing 2339 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., filed by Sharon Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Plattenberger, Jacob)(acc).
December 20, 2017 Filing 2338 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Novo Nordisk Inc. . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Williams, Raymond)(acc).
December 20, 2017 Filing 2337 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Novo Nordisk Inc., as to Novo Nordisk Inc. (Williams, Raymond) (acc).
December 20, 2017 Filing 2336 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Novo Nordisk Inc . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Williams, Raymond)(acc).
December 20, 2017 Filing 2335 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Novo Nordisk Inc., as to Novo Nordisk Inc. (Williams, Raymond)(acc).
December 20, 2017 Filing 2334 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Novo Nordisk Inc . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Williams, Raymond)(acc).
December 20, 2017 Filing 2333 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Novo Nordisk Inc., as to Novo Nordisk Inc. (Williams, Raymond) (acc).
December 20, 2017 Filing 2332 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Novo Nordisk Inc . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Williams, Raymond)(acc).
December 20, 2017 Filing 2331 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Novo Nordisk Inc., as to Novo Nordisk Inc. (Williams, Raymond)(acc).
December 20, 2017 Filing 2330 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Novo Nordisk Inc . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Williams, Raymond)(acc).
December 20, 2017 Filing 2329 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Novo Nordisk Inc., as to Novo Nordisk Inc. (Williams, Raymond) (acc).
December 20, 2017 Filing 2328 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Novo Nordisk Inc . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Williams, Raymond)(acc).
December 20, 2017 Filing 2327 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Novo Nordisk Inc., as to Novo Nordisk Inc. (Williams, Raymond)(acc).
December 20, 2017 Filing 2326 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Novo Nordisk Inc . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Williams, Raymond)(acc).
December 20, 2017 Filing 2325 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Novo Nordisk Inc., as to Novo Nordisk Inc. (Williams, Raymond) (acc).
December 20, 2017 Filing 2324 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Novo Nordisk Inc . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Williams, Raymond) (acc).
December 20, 2017 Filing 2323 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Novo Nordisk Inc., as to Novo Nordisk Inc. (Williams, Raymond) (acc).
December 20, 2017 Filing 2322 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Novo Nordisk Inc. . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Williams, Raymond)(acc).
December 20, 2017 Filing 2321 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Novo Nordisk Inc., as to Novo Nordisk Inc. (Williams, Raymond) (acc).
December 18, 2017 Filing 2320 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eli Lilly and Company, as to Eli Lilly and Company. (Laurendeau, Amy) (acc).
December 18, 2017 Filing 2319 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, as to Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Laurendeau, Amy) (acc).
December 18, 2017 Filing 2318 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily)(acc).
December 18, 2017 Filing 2317 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily) (acc).
December 14, 2017 Filing 2316 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Eli Lilly and Company (Rickabaugh, Jessica) (acc).
December 12, 2017 Filing 2315 Summons Issued re #2310 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
December 12, 2017 Filing 2314 Summons Issued re #2309 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
December 12, 2017 Filing 2313 Summons Issued re #2308 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
December 12, 2017 Filing 2312 Summons Issued re #2307 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
December 12, 2017 Filing 2311 Summons Issued re #2306 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
December 12, 2017 Filing 2310 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Terrell Charpia against Novo Nordisk Inc., filed by Terrell Charpia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael) (acc).
December 11, 2017 Filing 2309 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Terri Schoppmeyer, Individually and as Successor in Interest and Surviving Spouse of Christian Schoppmeyer, Deceased against Amlyn Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Eli Lilly and Company, Novo Nordisk Inc., filed by Terri Schoppmeyer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael)(acc).
December 11, 2017 Filing 2308 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Beverly Burgess-Jackman, Individually and as Successor in Interest and Surviving Spouse of Valentine Jackman, Deceased against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., filed by Beverly Burgess-Jackman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael)(acc).
December 11, 2017 Filing 2307 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Ralph Howard, Individually and as Successor in Interest and Surviving Heir of Eloise Gardner, Deceased against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., filed by Ralph Howard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael) (acc).
December 11, 2017 Filing 2306 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Judy Terlingo against Novo Nordisk Inc., filed by Judy Terlingo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael)(acc).
December 7, 2017 Filing 2305 Summons Issued re #2304 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
December 6, 2017 Filing 2304 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., filed by Watson Reid Wentz.New Summons Requested. (Restaino, John)(acc).
December 5, 2017 Filing 2303 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eli Lilly and Company, as to Eli Lilly and Company. (Laurendeau, Amy) (rmc).
December 5, 2017 Filing 2302 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eli Lilly and Company, as to Eli Lilly and Company. (Laurendeau, Amy) (rmc).
December 5, 2017 Filing 2301 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, as to Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Laurendeau, Amy) (rmc).
December 5, 2017 Filing 2300 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, as to Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Laurendeau, Amy) (rmc).
December 4, 2017 Filing 2299 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily) (acc).
December 4, 2017 Filing 2298 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily) (acc).
December 4, 2017 Filing 2297 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily) (acc).
December 4, 2017 Filing 2296 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily) (acc).
December 4, 2017 Filing 2295 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily)(acc).
November 29, 2017 Filing 2294 Summons Issued re #2291 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
November 29, 2017 Filing 2293 Summons Issued re #2290 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
November 29, 2017 Filing 2292 Summons Issued re #2289 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
November 29, 2017 Filing 2291 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Betty Reven, Individually and as Successor in Interest and Surviving Spouse of Larry Reven, Deceased against Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Eli Lilly and Company, filed by Betty Reven. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael)(acc).
November 29, 2017 Filing 2290 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Thomas Adams against Novo Nordisk Inc., filed by Thomas Adams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael)(acc).
November 29, 2017 Filing 2289 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Lawrence Williams, Individually and as Successor in Interest and Surviving Spouse of Anne Louise Williams, Deceased against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., filed by Lawrence Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael)(acc).
November 22, 2017 Filing 2288 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Sandra LaRosa, Individually and as Successor in Interest and Surviving Spouse of Thomas LaRosa, Deceased against Novo Nordisk Inc., filed by Sandra LaRosa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael)
November 22, 2017 Filing 2287 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Nancy Coblentz, Individually and as Successor in Interest and Surviving Spouse of Lawrence Coblentz, Deceased against Novo Nordisk Inc., filed by Nancy Coblentz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael)
November 16, 2017 Filing 2286 NOTICE of Appearance Ratner, Dale (Ratner, Dale) Main Document 2286 replaced on 11/16/2017. Flatten document (acc).
November 14, 2017 Filing 2285 Summons Issued re #2284 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
November 14, 2017 Filing 2284 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Celia White, Individually and as Successor in Interest & Surviving Spouse of Scott Wayne White, Deceased against Novo Nordisk Inc., filed by Celia White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael) (acc).
November 13, 2017 Filing 2283 Summons Issued re #2282 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
November 10, 2017 Filing 2282 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Lucinda Gilbert, Individually and as Successor in Interest and Surviving Heir of Lucille Reed, Deceased against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., filed by Lucinda Gilbert. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael)(acc).
November 2, 2017 Filing 2281 Summons Issued re #2277 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
November 2, 2017 Filing 2280 Summons Issued re #2275 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
November 1, 2017 Filing 2279 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eli Lilly and Company, as to Eli Lilly and Company. (Laurendeau, Amy) (acc).
November 1, 2017 Filing 2278 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amlyn Pharmaceuticals, LLC, as to Amlyn Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Laurendeau, Amy) (acc).
November 1, 2017 Filing 2277 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., filed by Glen Harriel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Plattenberger, Jacob)(acc).
November 1, 2017 Filing 2276 NOTICE to Withdraw as Attorney (Notice of Withdrawal of Colleen C. Kelly as an Attorney of Record) by Eli Lilly and Company. (Howard, Robert) Modified on 11/2/2017 to correct event type (acc).
October 31, 2017 Filing 2275 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Tamara Guliaiev, Individually and as Successor in Interest and Surviving Spouse of Viktor Guliaiev, Deceased, against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., filed by Tamara Guliaiev. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael)(acc).
October 30, 2017 Filing 2274 Summons Issued re: #2273 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
October 27, 2017 Filing 2273 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Eli Lilly and Company, filed by Joyce Regina Colvin.New Summons Requested. (Lopez, Matthew)(acc).
October 27, 2017 Filing 2272 Summons Issued re #2271 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
October 26, 2017 Filing 2271 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Betty Schobey, Individually and as Successor in Interest and Surviving Spouse of Arthur Schobey, Deceased against Novo Nordisk Inc., filed by Betty Schobey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael)(acc).
October 25, 2017 Filing 2270 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily)(acc).
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2269 ORDER granting #2244 Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Attorney of Record. Attorney David R. Dorey terminated as co-counsel for Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 10/20/2017. (acc)
October 10, 2017 Filing 2268 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:17-cv-02079-AJB-MDD Shaw v. Amylin Pharamceuticals, LLC et al (Filed in CASD) (no document attached) (jjg)
October 9, 2017 Filing 2267 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eli Lilly and Company, as to Eli Lilly and Company. (Laurendeau, Amy)(acc).
October 9, 2017 Filing 2266 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, as to Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Laurendeau, Amy) (acc).
October 4, 2017 Filing 2265 Summons Issued re #2264 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
October 4, 2017 Filing 2264 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Timothy Anderson, Individually and as Successor in Interest and Surviving Heir of Gwendolyn Mitchell, Deceased against Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Eli Lilly and Company, filed by Timothy Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael)(acc).
October 2, 2017 Filing 2263 Summons Issued re #2262 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
October 2, 2017 Filing 2262 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Eli Lilly and Company, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., Novo Nordisk Inc., filed by Sandra Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Plattenberger, Jacob)(acc).
September 28, 2017 Filing 2261 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eli Lilly and Company, as to Eli Lilly and Company. (Laurendeau, Amy) (acc).
September 28, 2017 Filing 2260 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, as to Amlyn Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Laurendeau, Amy)(acc).
September 28, 2017 Filing 2259 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eli Lilly and Company, as to Eli Lilly and Company. (Laurendeau, Amy)(acc).
September 28, 2017 Filing 2258 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, as to Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Laurendeau, Amy) (acc).
September 22, 2017 Filing 2257 Summons Issued re #2256 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
September 22, 2017 Filing 2256 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Amlyn Pharmaceuticals, LLC, filed by Maria Gonzalez.New Summons Requested. (Restaino, John) (acc).
September 21, 2017 Filing 2255 Summons Issued re #2251 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
September 21, 2017 Filing 2254 Summons Issued re #2253 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
September 21, 2017 Filing 2251 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Carla Lepine, Individually and as Successor in Interest and Surviving Heir of Beverly Brown, Deceased against Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Eli Lilly and Company, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., Novo Nordisk Inc., filed by Carla Lepine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael) (acc).
September 20, 2017 Filing 2253 AMENDED SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., filed by Carrie Cook.New Summons Requested. (acc)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2252 ORDER granting #2248 Joint Motion for Leave to File an Amended Short Form Complaint. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 9/20/2017. (acc)
September 20, 2017 Filing 2250 NOTIFICATION OF DEATH Upon the Record by Mary Rowe. (Lopez, Matthew)(acc).
September 20, 2017 Filing 2249 NOTIFICATION OF DEATH Upon the Record by Michael McKown. (Lopez, Matthew)(acc).
September 20, 2017 Filing 2248 Joint MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Carrie Cook. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A-First Amended Complaint)(Lopez, Matthew)Attorney Matthew R. Lopez added to party Carrie Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew R. Lopez added to party Carrie Cook(pty:pla)(acc).
September 20, 2017 Filing 2247 DECLARATION of Proposed Interim Estate Representative re #2185 Short Form Complaint - MDL 2452, by Plaintiff Estate of Eva Neff. (Attachments: #1 Death Certificate, #2 Certificate of Service)(Plattenberger, Jacob)(acc).
August 30, 2017 Filing 2246 Summons Issued re #2245 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
August 29, 2017 Filing 2245 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand John Thomas Deutsch, Individually and as Successor in Interest and Surviving Heir of Lisa S. Deutsch against Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Eli Lilly and Company, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., Novo Nordisk Inc., filed by John Thomas Deutsch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael)(acc).
August 25, 2017 Filing 2244 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David R. Dorey in Support, #2 [Proposed] Order)(Dorey, David) QC re proposed order(acc).
August 17, 2017 Filing 2243 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily)(acc).
August 17, 2017 Filing 2242 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily)(acc).
August 17, 2017 Filing 2241 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily)(acc).
August 17, 2017 Filing 2240 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily)(acc).
August 17, 2017 Filing 2239 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily)(acc).
August 15, 2017 Filing 2238 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Novo Nordisk Inc. . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Williams, Raymond)(acc).
August 15, 2017 Filing 2237 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Novo Nordisk Inc., as to Novo Nordisk Inc. (Williams, Raymond)(acc).
August 15, 2017 Filing 2236 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Novo Nordisk Inc. . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Williams, Raymond)(acc).
August 15, 2017 Filing 2235 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Novo Nordisk Inc., as to Novo Nordisk Inc. (Williams, Raymond)(acc).
August 15, 2017 Filing 2234 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Novo Nordisk Inc. . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Williams, Raymond)(acc).
August 15, 2017 Filing 2233 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Novo Nordisk Inc., as to Novo Nordisk Inc. (Williams, Raymond)(acc).
August 15, 2017 Filing 2232 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Novo Nordisk Inc. . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Williams, Raymond)(acc).
August 15, 2017 Filing 2231 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Novo Nordisk Inc., as to Novo Nordisk Inc. (Williams, Raymond)(acc).
August 15, 2017 Filing 2230 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Novo Nordisk Inc. . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Williams, Raymond)(acc).
August 15, 2017 Filing 2229 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Novo Nordisk Inc., as to Novo Nordisk Inc. (Williams, Raymond)(acc).
August 14, 2017 Filing 2228 Summons Issued re #2226 . Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
August 14, 2017 Filing 2227 Summons Issued re #2225 . Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
August 14, 2017 Filing 2226 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Cathy Lynn Jones, Individually and as Successor in Interest and Surviving Spouse of Larry K. Jones, Deceased against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., filed by Cathy Lynn Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael) (acc).
August 14, 2017 Filing 2225 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Randy Myrup, Individually and as Successor in Interest and Surviving Spouse of Nita Stewart-Myrup, Deceased against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., Novo Nordisk Inc., filed by Randy Myrup. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael)(acc).
August 7, 2017 Filing 2224 Summons Issued re #2222 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
August 7, 2017 Filing 2223 Summons Issued re #2221 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
August 7, 2017 Filing 2222 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Elaine White-Rowan, Individually and as Successor in Interest and Surviving Spouse of George R. Rowan, Sr., Deceased against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., filed by Elaine White-Rowan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael) (acc).
August 7, 2017 Filing 2221 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Wanda Pumphrey, Individually and as Successor in Interest and Surviving Heir of Gregory A. Pumphrey, Deceased against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., filed by Wanda Pumphrey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael)
August 2, 2017 Filing 2220 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, as to Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Laurendeau, Amy)(acc).
August 2, 2017 Filing 2219 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eli Lilly and Company, as to Eli Lilly and Company. (Laurendeau, Amy)(acc).
August 2, 2017 Filing 2218 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eli Lilly and Company, as to Eli Lilly and Company. (Laurendeau, Amy) (acc).
August 2, 2017 Filing 2217 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, as to Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Laurendeau, Amy) (acc).
August 2, 2017 Filing 2216 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, as to Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Laurendeau, Amy)(acc).
August 2, 2017 Filing 2215 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eli Lilly and Company, as to Eli Lilly and Company. (Laurendeau, Amy)(acc).
August 2, 2017 Filing 2214 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharpe & Dohme, Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily)(acc).
August 2, 2017 Filing 2213 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily)(acc).
August 2, 2017 Filing 2212 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily)(acc).
August 2, 2017 Filing 2211 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily)(acc).
August 2, 2017 Filing 2210 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily)(acc).
August 2, 2017 Filing 2209 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily) (acc).
August 1, 2017 Filing 2208 Summons Issued re #2206 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
August 1, 2017 Filing 2207 Summons Issued re #2205 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
August 1, 2017 Filing 2206 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Kenneth Baird against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., filed by Kenneth Baird. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael)(acc).
August 1, 2017 Filing 2205 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Amylin Pharamaceuticals LLC, Eli Lilly and Company, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., Novo Nordisk Inc., filed by Russell P Goerger. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Plattenberger, Jacob)(acc).
August 1, 2017 Filing 2204 Summons Issued re #2199 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
August 1, 2017 Filing 2203 Summons Issued re #2198 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
August 1, 2017 Filing 2202 Summons Issued re #2197 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
August 1, 2017 Filing 2201 Summons Issued re #2196 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
August 1, 2017 Filing 2200 Summons Issued re #2195 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
July 31, 2017 Filing 2199 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Dennis Morningstar, Individually and as Successor in Interest and Surviving Spouse of Rita L. Morningstar, Deceased against Novo Nordisk Inc., filed by Dennis Morningstar. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael)(acc).
July 31, 2017 Filing 2198 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Ida Marie Snider, Individually and as Successor in Interest and Surviving Spouse of Daniel S. Snider, Deceased against Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Eli Lilly and Company, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., Novo Nordisk Inc., filed by Ida Marie Snider. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael)(acc).
July 31, 2017 Filing 2197 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Donald Nestor, Individually and as Successor in Interest and Surviving Spouse of Lois I. Nestor, Deceased against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., filed by Donald Nestor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael)(acc).
July 31, 2017 Filing 2196 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Timothy Jones against Amlyn Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Eli Lilly and Company, Novo Nordisk Inc., filed by Timothy Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael)(acc).
July 31, 2017 Filing 2195 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand JAN MARIE BROWN, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST AND SURVIVING SPOUSE OF DON MAX BROWN, DECEASED against Novo Nordisk Inc., filed by Jan Marie Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael)(acc).
July 25, 2017 Filing 2194 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Novo Nordisk Inc. . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Williams, Raymond)(acc).
July 25, 2017 Filing 2193 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Novo Nordisk Inc., as to Novo Nordisk Inc. (Williams, Raymond)(acc).
July 24, 2017 Filing 2192 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily)(acc).
July 24, 2017 Filing 2191 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily)(acc).
July 17, 2017 Filing 2190 Summons Issued re #2189 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
July 14, 2017 Filing 2189 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., filed by Nancy Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Lopez, Matthew)(acc).
July 10, 2017 Filing 2188 DECLARATION of Proposed Interim Estate Representative by Plaintiff Glenna Leafty. (Attachments: #1 Death Certificate)(Carlson, Craig) (acc).
July 8, 2017 Filing 2187 DECLARATION of Proposed Interim Estate Representative re #2135 Short Form Complaint - MDL 2452 by Plaintiff Girar Kolakian. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Plattenberger, Jacob)(acc).
June 30, 2017 Filing 2186 Summons Issued re #2185 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
June 30, 2017 Filing 2185 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Amylin Pharamaceuticals LLC, Eli Lilly & Company, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., Novo Nordisk Inc., filed by Estate of Eva Neff, Peter Neff. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Plattenberger, Jacob)(acc).
June 28, 2017 Filing 2184 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eli Lilly and Company, as to Eli Lilly and Company. (Laurendeau, Amy)(acc).
June 28, 2017 Filing 2183 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eli Lilly and Company, as to Eli Lilly and Company. (Laurendeau, Amy)(acc).
June 28, 2017 Filing 2182 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, as to Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Laurendeau, Amy)(acc).
June 28, 2017 Filing 2181 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, as to Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Laurendeau, Amy)(acc).
June 28, 2017 Filing 2180 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, as to Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Laurendeau, Amy) (acc).
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2179 ORDER granting #2178 Joint Motion to approve third amended stipulation and enter order related to filings by derivative plaintiffs acting as interim estate representatives. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 6/27/2017. (acc)
June 26, 2017 Filing 2178 Joint MOTION to Approve Third Amended Stipulation and Enter Order Related to Filings by Derivative Plaintiffs Acting as Interim Estate Representatives re #1865 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous (Other 1), by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Plattenberger, Jacob)Attorney Jacob W. Plattenberger added to party All Plaintiffs(pty:pla), Attorney Jacob W. Plattenberger added to party All Plaintiffs(pty:pla)(acc).
June 26, 2017 Filing 2177 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily)(acc).
June 20, 2017 Filing 2176 Summons Issued re #2175 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
June 19, 2017 Filing 2175 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Gladys Sherwood, Estate Of Sherwood, Larry. (Vines, Brian)(acc).
June 15, 2017 Filing 2174 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eli Lilly and Company, as to Eli Lilly and Company. (Laurendeau, Amy) (fth).
June 15, 2017 Filing 2173 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, as to Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Laurendeau, Amy) (fth).
June 7, 2017 Filing 2172 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (lrf)
June 7, 2017 Filing 2171 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand SHARON FLEISCHER, ON BEHALF OF THE ESTATE OF YVETTE DEMOINES, DECEASED against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., filed by Sharon Fleischer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael) (lrf).
June 5, 2017 Filing 2170 Summons Issued re #2168 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
June 5, 2017 Filing 2169 Summons Issued re #2167 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
June 5, 2017 Filing 2168 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand LINDA LINTON against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., filed by Linda Linton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael)(acc).
June 5, 2017 Filing 2167 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand CYNTHIA BURGIN, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST AND SURVIVING HEIR OF ROBERTA BURGIN, DECEASED against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., filed by Cynthia Burgin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael)(acc).
June 1, 2017 Filing 2166 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Novo Nordisk Inc. . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Williams, Raymond)(acc).
June 1, 2017 Filing 2165 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Novo Nordisk Inc., as to Novo Nordisk Inc. (Williams, Raymond)(acc).
June 1, 2017 Filing 2164 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Novo Nordisk Inc. . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Williams, Raymond)(acc).
June 1, 2017 Filing 2163 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Novo Nordisk Inc., as to Novo Nordisk Inc. (Williams, Raymond)(acc).
June 1, 2017 Filing 2162 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Novo Nordisk Inc. . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Williams, Raymond)(acc).
June 1, 2017 Filing 2161 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Novo Nordisk Inc., as to Novo Nordisk Inc. (Williams, Raymond)(acc).
June 1, 2017 Filing 2160 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Novo Nordisk Inc. . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Williams, Raymond)(acc).
June 1, 2017 Filing 2159 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Novo Nordisk Inc., as to Novo Nordisk Inc. (Williams, Raymond)(acc).
May 31, 2017 Filing 2158 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily)(acc).
May 31, 2017 Filing 2157 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily)(acc).
May 31, 2017 Filing 2156 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily)(acc).
May 31, 2017 Filing 2155 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily)(acc).
May 22, 2017 Filing 2154 Summons Issued re #2153 . Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
May 22, 2017 Filing 2153 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Eli Lilly and Company, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., filed by Colleen M. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Barone Baden, Kimberly)(acc).
May 22, 2017 Filing 2152 Summons Issued re #2142 . Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
May 22, 2017 Filing 2151 Summons Issued re #2141 . Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
May 22, 2017 Filing 2150 Summons Issued re #2140 . Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
May 22, 2017 Filing 2149 Summons Issued re #2139 . Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
May 22, 2017 Filing 2148 Summons Issued re #2138 . Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
May 22, 2017 Filing 2147 Summons Issued re #2137 . Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
May 19, 2017 Filing 2146 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eli Lilly and Company, as to Eli Lilly and Company. (Laurendeau, Amy)(acc).
May 19, 2017 Filing 2145 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amlyn Pharmaceuticals, LLC, as to Amlyn Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Laurendeau, Amy)(acc).
May 19, 2017 Filing 2144 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eli Lilly and Company, as to Eli Lilly and Company. (Laurendeau, Amy)(acc).
May 19, 2017 Filing 2143 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amlyn Pharmaceuticals, LLC, as to Amlyn Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Laurendeau, Amy)(acc).
May 19, 2017 Filing 2142 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Bobby McMillan, Individually and As Successor in Interest and Surviving Spouse of Melody L. McMillan, Deceased against Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Eli Lilly and Company, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., Novo Nordisk Inc., filed by Bobby McMillan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael)(acc).
May 19, 2017 Filing 2141 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Melinda Ortega, On Behalf of the Estate of Benita Ann Lammon, Deceased against Novo Nordisk Inc., filed by Melinda Ortega. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael)(acc).
May 19, 2017 Filing 2140 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Cynthia Nelsen against Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Eli Lilly and Company, filed by Cynthia Nelsen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael)(acc).
May 19, 2017 Filing 2139 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Theodore Loftness against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., filed by Theodore Loftness. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael)(acc).
May 19, 2017 Filing 2138 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Shirley Willard, Individually and As Successor in Interest and Surviving Spouse of Joseph Alan Willard, Deceased against Novo Nordisk Inc., filed by Shirley Willard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael)(acc).
May 19, 2017 Filing 2137 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Sheila Revie, Individually and As Successor in Interest and Surviving Spouse of Daniel Raymond Revie, III, Deceased against Novo Nordisk Inc., filed by Sheila Revie. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael)(acc).
May 15, 2017 Filing 2136 Summons Issued re #2135 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
May 15, 2017 Filing 2135 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., filed by Girar Kolakian, Ragida Kolakian. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Plattenberger, Jacob)(acc).
May 15, 2017 Filing 2134 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily)(acc).
May 15, 2017 Filing 2133 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily)(acc).
May 11, 2017 Filing 2132 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by William Lester (Lopez, Matthew) (acc).
May 11, 2017 Filing 2131 Summons Issued re #2130 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
May 10, 2017 Filing 2130 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Amlyn Pharmaceuticals, LLC, filed by Glenna Leafty, Richard Leafty. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Carlson, Craig) (acc).
May 8, 2017 Filing 2129 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:17-cv-00927-AJB-MDD Hernandez v. Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Filed in CASD) (no document attached) (jjg)
May 8, 2017 Filing 2128 Summons Issued re #2127 . Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
May 6, 2017 Filing 2127 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., filed by Eduardo Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael)(acc).
April 28, 2017 Filing 2126 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eli Lilly and Company, as to Eli Lilly and Company. (Laurendeau, Amy)(acc).
April 28, 2017 Filing 2125 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, as to Amlyn Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Laurendeau, Amy)(acc).
April 21, 2017 Filing 2124 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Novo Nordisk Inc. . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Williams, Raymond) (acc).
April 21, 2017 Filing 2123 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Novo Nordisk Inc., as to Novo Nordisk Inc. (Williams, Raymond)(acc).
April 19, 2017 Filing 2122 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily) (acc).
April 19, 2017 Filing 2121 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily) (acc).
April 18, 2017 Filing 2120 Summons Issued re #2090 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
April 3, 2017 Filing 2119 Summons Issued re #2118 Short Form Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
March 31, 2017 Filing 2118 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Amylin Pharamaceuticals LLC, Eli Lilly and Company, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., Novo Nordisk Inc., filed by Pamela Macedo, Walter Macedo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Plattenberger, Jacob) (acc).
March 31, 2017 Filing 2117 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eli Lilly and Company, as to Eli Lilly and Company. (Laurendeau, Amy) QC re: not dated(acc).
March 31, 2017 Filing 2116 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, as to Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Laurendeau, Amy) QC re: not dated(acc).
March 29, 2017 Filing 2115 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Novo Nordisk Inc. . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Williams, Raymond)(acc).
March 29, 2017 Filing 2114 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Novo Nordisk Inc., as to Novo Nordisk Inc. (Williams, Raymond)(acc).
March 23, 2017 Filing 2113 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:17-cv-00578-AJB-MDD Todaro v. Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC (filed in CASD) (no document attached) (kas)
March 23, 2017 Filing 2112 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, filed by Dante Todaro. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) CC: MDL PanelNew Summons Requested. (mpl)
March 22, 2017 Filing 2111 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:17-cv-00562-AJB-MDD Deel v. Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (case filed in CASD) (no document attached) (kas)
March 21, 2017 Filing 2110 NOTICE of Appearance (Feidler, Stefan) (dlg).
March 20, 2017 Filing 2109 DECLARATION of Proposed Interim Estate Representative re #2078 Short Form Complaint - MDL 2452 by Plaintiff Margaret T Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Plattenberger, Jacob)(acc).
March 20, 2017 Filing 2108 Summons Issued re #2106 . Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
March 20, 2017 Filing 2107 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily)(acc).
March 18, 2017 Filing 2106 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Amylin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Eli Lilly and Company, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., filed by Thomas W. McNeil. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael)(acc).
March 17, 2017 Filing 2105 DECLARATION of Proposed Interim Estate Representative re #1616 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous (Other 1) by Plaintiffs Claudetta Irene Wright, Joel Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Death Certificate)(Lopez, Matthew)(acc).
February 21, 2017 Filing 2104 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:17-cv-00337-AJB-MDD Bock v. Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. et al; 3:17-cv-00338-AJB-MDD Gunderson v. Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. et al (cases filed in CASD) (no document attached) (kas)
February 6, 2017 Filing 2103 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:17-cv-00227-AJB-MDD Dillon v. Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC et al (filed in CASD) (no document attached) (kas)
January 30, 2017 Filing 2102 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily)(acc).
January 30, 2017 Filing 2101 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily)(acc).
January 30, 2017 Filing 2100 Summons Issued re #2099 . Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
January 27, 2017 Filing 2099 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Amylin Pharamaceuticals LLC, Eli Lilly and Company, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., filed by Eman Khoury, Raghada Khoury, Riyad Khoury, Robert Khoury, Sultaneh Khoury, Jaklin Sayegh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Lopez, Matthew)(acc).
January 18, 2017 Filing 2098 DECLARATION of Proposed Interim Estate Representative re #1616 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous (Other 1) by Plaintiff Nicholas Dukellis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Death Certificate)(Lopez, Matthew)(acc).
January 18, 2017 Filing 2097 DECLARATION of Proposed Interim Estate Representative re #1616 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous (Other 1) by Plaintiff Joyce Adams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Death Certificate)(Lopez, Matthew)(acc).
January 12, 2017 Filing 2096 DECLARATION of Proposed Interim Estate Representative re #1616 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous (Other 1) by Plaintiff Jeanne Cichanski. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Death Certificate)(Lopez, Matthew)(acc).
January 12, 2017 Filing 2095 DECLARATION of Proposed Interim Estate Representative re #1616 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous (Other 1) by Plaintiff Lynette Lofing. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Death Certificate)(Lopez, Matthew)(acc).
January 9, 2017 Filing 2093 Summons Issued re #2092 . Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
January 9, 2017 Filing 2092 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Merck Sharpe & Dohme, Corp., filed by Leslie Jo Nickerson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Bruehl, Curtis)(acc).
January 9, 2017 Filing 2091 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.. (Pistilli, Emily) (acc).
January 6, 2017 Filing 2094 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:17-cv-00024-AJB-MDD Wilhelmi v. Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (filed in CASD) (no document attached) (kas)
January 3, 2017 Filing 2090 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., filed by Ebony Perez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Drakulich, Robert)(acc).
December 30, 2016 Filing 2089 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Novo Nordisk Inc. . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Williams, Raymond)(acc).
December 30, 2016 Filing 2088 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Novo Nordisk Inc., as to Novo Nordisk Inc. (Williams, Raymond)(acc).
December 30, 2016 Filing 2087 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Novo Nordisk Inc. . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Williams, Raymond)(acc).
December 30, 2016 Filing 2086 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Novo Nordisk Inc., as to Novo Nordisk Inc. (Williams, Raymond)(acc).
December 30, 2016 Filing 2085 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Novo Nordisk Inc. . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Williams, Raymond) (acc).
December 30, 2016 Filing 2084 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Novo Nordisk Inc., as to Novo Nordisk Inc. (Williams, Raymond)(acc).
December 28, 2016 Filing 2083 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily)(acc).
December 28, 2016 Filing 2082 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily)(acc).
December 28, 2016 Filing 2081 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily) (acc).
December 28, 2016 Filing 2080 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily)(acc).
December 27, 2016 Filing 2079 Summons Issued re #2078 . Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
December 23, 2016 Filing 2078 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Amylin Pharamaceuticals LLC, Eli Lilly & Company, Novo Nordisk Inc., filed by Margaret T Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Plattenberger, Jacob)(acc).
December 22, 2016 Filing 2077 DECLARATION of Proposed Interim Estate Representative re #1616 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous (Other 1) by Plaintiff Anthony Tarra. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Death Certificate)(Lopez, Matthew)(kas).
December 15, 2016 Filing 2076 Summons Issued re #2075 . Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
December 14, 2016 Filing 2075 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Amylin Pharamaceuticals LLC, Eli Lilly and Company, Novo Nordisk Inc., filed by Lorna Rich. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Lopez, Matthew) (acc).
November 30, 2016 Filing 2074 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:16-cv-02906-AJB-MDD Staton v. Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.; 3:16-cv-02907-AJB-MDD Sanders v. Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, et al; 3:16-cv-02908-AJB-MDD Sirchia v. Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. et al (all cases filed in CASD) (no document attached) (kas)
November 28, 2016 Filing 2072 Summons Reissued re #2071 as to Maritza Vega. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
November 28, 2016 Filing 2069 Summons Reissued re #2068 as to Aretha Penney. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
November 28, 2016 Filing 2066 Summons Reissued re #2065 as to Nancy Cichon. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
November 28, 2016 Filing 2064 Summons Reissued re #2063 as to James Crowder. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc) (Main Document 2064 replaced on 11/29/2016) (acc).
November 25, 2016 Filing 2060 DECLARATION of Proposed Interim Estate Representative re #1910 Short Form Complaint - MDL 2452, by Plaintiff Michael Tagget. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Plattenberger, Jacob)(acc).
November 23, 2016 Filing 2073 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:16-cv-02877-AJB-MDD Flahardy v. Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp; 3:16-cv-02880-AJB-MDD Curry, Jr. et al v. Novo Nordisk Inc. (cases filed in CASD) (no document attached) (kas)
November 23, 2016 Filing 2059 DECLARATION of Proposed Interim Estate Representative by Plaintiff Jane Grinvalsky. (Alonso, Andres)
November 18, 2016 Filing 2071 AMENDED COMPLAINT re #2070 with Jury Demand against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., filed by Maritza Vega.New Summons Requested. (acc)
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2070 ORDER granting #2058 Joint Motion for Leave to File Amended Short Form Complaint. The Clerk of Court is instructed to docket the amended complaint attached as Exhibit A to the motion. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 11/18/2016. (acc)
November 18, 2016 Filing 2068 AMENDED COMPLAINT re #2067 with Jury Demand against Novo Nordisk Inc., filed by Aretha Penney.New Summons Requested. (acc)
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2067 ORDER granting #2057 Joint Motion for Leave to File an Amended Short Form Complaint. The Clerk of Court is further instructed to docket the amended complaint attached as A to the motion. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 11/18/2016. (acc)
November 18, 2016 Filing 2065 AMENDED COMPLAINT re #2062 with Jury Demand against Amylin Pharamaceuticals LLC, Eli Lilly and Company, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., Novo Nordisk Inc., filed by Nancy Cichon.New Summons Requested. (acc)
November 18, 2016 Filing 2063 AMENDED COMPLAINT re #2061 with Jury Demand against Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Eli Lilly and Company, filed by James Crowder.New Summons Requested. (acc)
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2062 ORDER granting #2056 Joint Motion for Leave to File an Amended Short Form Complaint. The Clerk of Court is instructed to update the caption in both the individual case,14cv1943, and the lead case, 13md2452 as follows: NANCY CICHON, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF THE ESTATE OF ROBERT CICHON, DECEASED, Plaintiff, v. AMYLIN PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, et al., Defendants. The Clerk of Court is further instructed to docket the amended complaint attached as B to the motion. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 11/18/2016. (acc)
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2061 ORDER granting #2055 Joint Motion for Leave to File an Amended Short Form Complaint. The Clerk of Court is instructed to update the caption in both the individual case,13cv2878, and the lead case, 13md2452 as follows: JAMES CROWDER, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS INTERIM ESTATE REPRESENTATIVE FOR THE ESTATE OF RICHARD CROWDER, DECEASED, Plaintiff, v. AMYLIN PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, et al., Defendants.The Clerk of Court is further instructed to docket the amended short form complaint attached as Exhibit B to the motion. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 11/18/2016. (acc)
November 16, 2016 Filing 2058 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Short Form Complaint by Maritza Vega. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Preuss, Thomas) (acc).
November 15, 2016 Filing 2057 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Aretha Penney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Preuss, Thomas) (acc).
November 15, 2016 Filing 2056 Joint MOTION to Substitute Party (Plaintiff) and Amend Caption and Complaint by Robert Cichon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Preuss, Thomas) (acc).
November 15, 2016 Filing 2055 Joint MOTION to Substitute Party (Plaintiff) and Amend Caption and Complaint by Richard Crowder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Preuss, Thomas) (acc).
November 11, 2016 Filing 2053 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Novo Nordisk Inc. . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Williams, Raymond) (acc).
November 11, 2016 Filing 2052 NOTICE of Appearance (Williams, Raymond) (acc).
November 11, 2016 Filing 2051 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Novo Nordisk Inc. . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Williams, Raymond) (acc).
November 11, 2016 Filing 2050 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Novo Nordisk Inc., as to Novo Nordisk Inc.. (Williams, Raymond) (acc).
November 10, 2016 Filing 2054 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:16-cv-02770-AJB-MDD Frye v. Amylin Pharmaceticals, LLC et al (filed in CASD) (no document attached) (kas)
November 10, 2016 Filing 2049 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carolyn M Love. Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. served. (Johnson, Michael) (acc).
November 10, 2016 Filing 2048 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carolyn M Love. Novo Nordisk Inc. served. (Johnson, Michael) (acc).
November 10, 2016 Filing 2047 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carolyn M Love. Eli Lilly and Company served. (Johnson, Michael) (acc).
November 10, 2016 Filing 2046 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carolyn M Love. Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC served. (Johnson, Michael) (acc).
November 9, 2016 Filing 2045 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT re #2042 by Jane Grinvalsky . (Alonso, Andres) (dls).
November 8, 2016 Filing 2044 *Civil Case Cover Sheet re Doc. No. #2041 * (erroneously filed as NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT) by Jane Grinvalsky . (Alonso, Andres) (QC EMAIL - wrong pdf attached) (fth). (Modified on 11/9/2016 to update docket text) (dls).
November 8, 2016 Filing 2043 Summons Issued re #2041 . Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (dls)
November 8, 2016 Filing 2042 *DOCUMENT WITHDRAWN PER FILING OF DOC. NO. #2045 * Cover Sheet filed as Short Form Complaint with Jury Demand against Novo Nordisk Inc., filed by Jane Grinvalsky. (Alonso, Andres) (Modified on 11/9/2016 to withdraw document) (dls).
November 8, 2016 Filing 2041 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Novo Nordisk Inc., filed by Jane Grinvalsky. (Alonso, Andres) (dls).
November 7, 2016 Filing 2040 Summons Issued re #2038 . Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
November 4, 2016 Filing 2039 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:16-cv-02736-AJB-MDD Franco v. Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (filed in CASD) (no document attached) (kas)
November 4, 2016 Filing 2038 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., filed by Claudetta Irene Wright, Joel Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Lopez, Matthew) (acc).
November 2, 2016 Filing 2037 Summons Issued re #2035 . Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (dls)
November 2, 2016 Filing 2036 Summons Issued re #2034 . Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (dls)
November 1, 2016 Filing 2035 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., filed by Linda Nigro. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Drakulich, Robert) (dls).
November 1, 2016 Filing 2034 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Novo Nordisk Inc., filed by Vicki McBride, William F McBride. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Drakulich, Robert) (dls).
October 27, 2016 Filing 2033 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:16-cv-02655-AJB-MDD Luntzer, Jr. v. Amylin Pharamceuticals, LLC et al; :16-cv-02656-AJB-MDD Lester v. Amylin Pharamceuticals, LLC et al (cases filed in CASD) (no document attached) (kas)
October 26, 2016 Filing 2032 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.. (Pistilli, Emily) (dls).
October 26, 2016 Filing 2031 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily) (dls).
October 26, 2016 Filing 2030 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily) (dls).
October 26, 2016 Filing 2029 Summons Issued re #2028 . Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (dls) (summons not issued for Doc. No. 2027)
October 26, 2016 Filing 2028 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (Amended Complaint) against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., filed by Estate of Mohammed M. Querishi, Adil Querishi, Independent Administrator of the Estate of Mohammed M. Querishi, Syeda Querishi, Individually. (Barone Baden, Kimberly) (dls).
October 26, 2016 Filing 2027 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., filed by Estate of Mohammed M. Querishi, Adil Querishi, Independent Administrator of the Estate of Mohammed M. Querishi, Syeda Querishi, Individually. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Barone Baden, Kimberly) (dls).
October 24, 2016 Filing 2026 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily) (dls).
October 24, 2016 Filing 2025 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily) (dls).
October 24, 2016 Filing 2024 Summons Issued re #2023 . Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (dls)
October 21, 2016 Filing 2023 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., filed by Jeanne Cichanski. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Lopez, Matthew) (dls).
October 20, 2016 Filing 2022 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:16-cv-02610-AJB-MDD Arnold v. Merk Sharp & Dohme Corp. (filed in CASD) (no document attached) (kas)
October 17, 2016 Filing 2021 Summons Issued re #2019 . Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (dls)
October 17, 2016 Filing 2020 Summons Issued re #2018 . Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (dls)
October 14, 2016 Filing 2019 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Novo Nordisk Inc., filed by Nicholas Dukellis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Lopez, Matthew) (dls).
October 14, 2016 Filing 2018 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., filed by William Lester. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Lopez, Matthew) (dls).
October 10, 2016 Filing 2017 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Novo Nordisk Inc. . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Williams, Raymond) (dls).
October 10, 2016 Filing 2016 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Novo Nordisk Inc., as to Novo Nordisk Inc. (Williams, Raymond) (dls).
October 10, 2016 Filing 2015 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Novo Nordisk Inc. . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Williams, Raymond) (dls).
October 10, 2016 Filing 2014 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Novo Nordisk Inc., as to Novo Nordisk Inc.. (Williams, Raymond) (dls).
October 5, 2016 Filing 2013 Summons Issued re #2012 . Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (dls)
October 5, 2016 Filing 2012 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Eli Lilly and Company, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., Novo Nordisk Inc., filed by Carolyn M Love. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Johnson, Michael) (dls).
October 5, 2016 Filing 2011 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily) (dls).
October 5, 2016 Filing 2010 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Pistilli, Emily) (dls).
October 3, 2016 Filing 2009 Summons Issued re #2006 . Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (dls)
October 3, 2016 Filing 2008 Summons Issued re #2005 . Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (dls)
October 3, 2016 Filing 2007 Summons Issued re #1997 . Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (dls)
September 30, 2016 Filing 2006 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., filed by Brenda Lee Watkins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Drakulich, Robert) (dls).
September 30, 2016 Filing 2005 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., filed by Joan Forman, Richard Forman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)New Summons Requested. (Drakulich, Robert) (dls).
September 30, 2016 Filing 2004 DECLARATION of Proposed Interim Estate Representative by Plaintiff Sherri Denise Garrett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Death Certificate, #2 Proof of Service)(Drakulich, Robert) (dls).
September 30, 2016 Filing 2003 DECLARATION of Proposed Interim Estate Representative by Plaintiff Iona Salisbury. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Death Certificate, #2 Proof of Service)(Drakulich, Robert) (dls).
September 30, 2016 Filing 2002 DECLARATION of Proposed Interim Estate Representative by Plaintiff Barbara Strub. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Drakulich, Robert) (dls).
September 30, 2016 Filing 2001 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eli Lilly and Company, as to Eli Lilly and Company. (Laurendeau, Amy) (dls).
September 30, 2016 Filing 2000 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eli Lilly and Company, as to Eli Lilly and Company. (Laurendeau, Amy) (dls).
September 30, 2016 Filing 1999 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amlyn Pharmaceuticals, LLC, as to Amlyn Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Laurendeau, Amy) (dls).
September 30, 2016 Filing 1998 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC, as to Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Laurendeau, Amy)(dls).
September 30, 2016