Morales v. Palomar Health et al
Plaintiff: |
Yaret Morales |
Defendant: |
Palomar Health, Bruce Friedberg, CEP American LLC, Kelly Pretorious, Rady Children's Hospital and Health Center, Wendy Hunter and Children's Specialist of San Diego, A Medical Group, Inc. |
Case Number: |
3:2014cv00164 |
Filed: |
January 23, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of California |
Office: |
San Diego Office |
County: |
San Diego |
Presiding Judge: |
Gonzalo P. Curiel |
Presiding Judge: |
Bernard G. Skomal |
Nature of Suit: |
Personal Injury- Medical Malpractice |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1395 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 27, 2017 |
Filing
186
ORDER Requiring Supplemental Briefing Re: Ex Parte Petition for Minor's Compromise. Plaintiff shall submit the supplemental briefing on or before 8/3/2017. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 7/27/2017. (fth)
|
July 11, 2017 |
Filing
185
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION Approving 182 Ex Parte MOTION to Confirm Minor's Compromise and for Fees and Costs. Any written objections to this report must be filed with the court and served on all parties no later than July 26, 2017. Any reply to the objections shall be filed with the court and served on all parties no later than August 2, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 7/11/17.(dlg)
|
November 17, 2016 |
Filing
166
ORDER Granting Defendant's 127 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Exercising Pendent Jurisdiction Over Remaining State Law Claims; Denying as Moot Defendants' 128 , 129 Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony; and Denying as Moot Plaintiff's 133 Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 11/16/16. (dlg)
|
October 20, 2016 |
Filing
154
Notice of Tentative Ruling on Defendant's Motion 127 for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 10/20/16.(dlg)
|
July 14, 2016 |
Filing
126
ORDER denying 121 Plaintiff's Motion to Reconsider this Court's Order denying Plaintiff's Motion to Substitute Expert Witness 120 . As provided in the attached Order, Plaintiffs Motion to Reconsider is DENIED. Dr. Mandeville must appear for her deposition as required by the subpoena or as otherwise agreed with counsel for Defendants or as otherwise ordered by a court of competent jurisdiction. Counsel for Plaintiff is ORDERED provide a copy of this Order promptly to Dr. Mandeville. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 7/14/16. (Dembin, Mitchell)
|
June 23, 2016 |
Filing
120
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 118 Plaintiff's Motion to Substitute Expert and to Amend Scheduling Order, as presented in the Joint Motion of the parties. Plaintiffs Motion to Substitute another expert for Dr. Mandeville is DENIED. Plaintiffs Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order is GRANTED. The Scheduling Order is amended as follows: 1. The expert discovery deadline is extended to July 29, 2016, to allow for the deposition of Dr. Mandeville. 2. The deadline to file any pretrial motions, including Daubert motions, is extended to August 15, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 6/23/16. (Dembin, Mitchell)
|
August 12, 2014 |
Filing
49
ORDER: (1) Granting 30 Palomar Health's Motion to Dismiss as Unopposed; (2) Denying 31 Friedberg and CEP's Motion to Dismiss. The hearing on these motions, currently set for August 15, 2014, is Vacated. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 8/12/2014. (srm)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?