Securities and Exchange Commission v. Lee et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: James Y. Lee, Larissa O. Ettore, ELX International, Inc., Clayton K. Lee, Advanced Century Corp., Lolita Gatchalian, Ultra International, Inc. and SOT Group, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2014cv00347
Filed: February 13, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Larry Alan Burns
Presiding Judge: Bernard G. Skomal
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER Denying Judgment Debtors' Motoin for Relief from the Order Freezing Assets (ECF No. 199 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 10/07/2019. (jrm)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER to Disburse Garnished Funds, re 166 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 2/20/2019.(jdt)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting 100 Motion for Reconsideration. The Court reconsiders its order denying default judgment, and now grants that motion. The SEC is now ordered to submit a proposed order in editable electronic format, granting judgment against all Rel ief Defendants, individual and corporate, and awarding relief. The proposed order should be submitted by email no later than January 27, 2017. With the issuance of the order of judgment against all Relief Defendants, the Court believes all issues in this case will have been adjudicated. If other issues remain, any party may file a notice by January 27, 2017 explaining what those issues are. Otherwise, the judgment against the Relief Defendants will also be the final judgment in this case. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 1/12/17. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kas)
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER denying 46 Motion for Default Judgment and denying as moot 60 MOTION for Oral Argument. Final Pretrial Conference re-set for 6/13/2016 12:00 PM before Judge Larry Alan Burns. Proposed Pretrial Order due no later than 5/31/2016. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 3/7/16. (kas)
April 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Requiring Amended Proof of Service or Re-Service of Defendants, ORDER Permitting Late Opposition to Motion for Default Judgment. In the interests of avoiding, if possible, a judgment by default, the Court will entertain a late opposition to the motion for default judgment If Clayton Lee, Advanced Century, Gatchalian, and/or Ultra International wish to oppose the motion for default judgment, they must file an opposition by May 4, 2015. If the Court hears nothing from them by that time, it w ill assume they do not intend to oppose the motion. The Clerk shall mail a copy of this order to Clayton Lee, Advanced Century Corp., Lolita Gatchalian, Ultra International, and Irving Einhorn at the addresses provided in Docket no. 48 . Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 4/22/15. (copies mailed)(kas)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Lee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Karen L Matteson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Y. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larissa O. Ettore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELX International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clayton K. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Century Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lolita Gatchalian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ultra International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOT Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?