March 26, 2019 |
Filing
621
ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 527 SourceAmerica's Motion for Summary Judgment or, Alternatively, Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/26/19. (dlg)
|
August 14, 2018 |
Filing
570
ORDER Denying 536 Motion to Seal Previously Filed Documents; Granting 542 , 554 Motions for Leave to File Excess Pages; Deferring Ruling on Motions to File Under Seal ( 544 , 547 , 551 , 556 ); Denying 563 Motion to Strike Bona Fide 39;s Opposition to SourceAmerica's Motion for Summary Judgment; and Granting 567 Motion to File Untimely Memorandum. The Court defers a ruling on the motions to file documents under seal (ECF Nos. 544, 547, 551, 556). Within fourteen days of the date of this order, SourceAmerica shall file a memorandum explaining the need to seal. All reply memoranda relating to the substantive motions discussed in the Court's order setting forth the relevant briefing schedule (ECF No. 533) shall be filed on or before August 24, 2018. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 8/13/18. (dlg)
|
July 31, 2018 |
Filing
540
ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 530 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Bona Fide shall, within five days of the date this order is filed, withdraw its motion to exclude Mary Karen Wills (ECF No. 532) and all attached exhibits, and re file these documents publicly except for the sealing approved above. This refiling of Bona Fide's motion to exclude Mary Karen Wills will not alter the previously set briefing schedule and hearing date. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 7/31/2018. (rmc)
|
July 19, 2018 |
Filing
533
ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule for Substantive Motions ( 519 , 520 , 521 , 526 , 572 , 532 ); Granting Motions for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation ( 522 , 523 ); and Granting Two Motions to Seal ( 524 , 528 and Calling for Further Briefing as to one Motion to Seal ( 530 ). The Court defers a ruling as to the motion to seal found at ECF No. 530 and orders SourceAmerica to file a memorandum, within seven days, justifying the redactions proposed by that motion. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 7/18/18. (dlg)
|
May 14, 2018 |
Filing
518
ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Counterdefendants' 493 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. The Court grants summary judgment in favor of Counterdefendants on SourceAmerica's UCL claims, and it denies summary judgment on SourceAmerica's CIPA claims. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/14/2018. (mpl)
|
July 24, 2017 |
Filing
476
ORDER denying Defendant's 370 Motion for Summary Judgment or, Alternatively, Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 7/24/2017. (fth)
|
July 12, 2017 |
Filing
468
ORDER Granting 464 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Leave to File to File Sur-Reply Responding to Defendant's Evidentiary Objections. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 7/12/17. (dlg)
|
April 14, 2017 |
Filing
396
PROTECTIVE ORDER re 360 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 4/14/17.(dlg)
|
October 4, 2016 |
Filing
346
ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendant SourceAmerica's 337 Ex Parte Application for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge David H. Bartick on 10/3/16. (dlg)
|
August 16, 2016 |
Filing
336
ORDER Adopting in Part and Declining in Part Magistrate Judge's 288 Report and Recommendation. The Court hereby: GRANTS SourceAmerica's motion to disqualify 251 Daniel J. Cragg and Eckland and Blando LLP; GRANTS SourceAmerica' s motion to revoke Daniel J. Cragg's pro hac vice admission; DENIES AS MOOT SourceAmercia;s motion for expedited discovery 327 ; OVERRULES the Parties; objections in all other respects; and DENIES WITHOUT PREJUDICE SourceAmerica's motio n for a protective order. SourceAmerica may refile a motion for a protective order with the Magistrate Judge in light of this Courts order. The Court DENIES Bona Fide's Ex Parte Motion for Leave to File Surreply. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 8/16/16. (dlg)
|
August 11, 2016 |
Filing
332
ORDER Granting Motions to Seal (re Doc. Nos. 298 , 302 , 304 ). Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 8/11/2016. (dls)
|
June 29, 2016 |
Filing
319
ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 309 Counterdefendants' Motion to Dismiss SourceAmerica's Amended Counterclaims. The Court denies Counterdefendants' motion to dismiss SourceAmerica's CIPA and UCL claims to the extent described herein and grants Counterdefendant's motion to dismiss SourceAmerica's requests for damages under the UCL, attorney's fees, and punitive damages under the CIPA. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/29/16. (dlg)
|
January 5, 2016 |
Filing
266
ORDER Granting 246 Plaintiff's Motion to Supplement Complaint; Granting 247 Defendant's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Answer and Counterclaims. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 1/5/16. (dlg)
|
June 3, 2015 |
Filing
234
ORDER Granting 212 Request for Entry of Rule 54(b) Judgment and Denying 218 Joint Motion to Stay. The Court Dismisses Without Leave to Amend claims one through nine of Plaintiff's FAC, Grants Plaintiff's request for entry of judgment pursuant to Rule 54(b), and Denies Defendants' joint motion to stay. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/3/15. (dlg)
|
June 1, 2015 |
Filing
232
ORDER Denying 223 Ex Parte Application of Source America For Leave to File Notice of New Facts in Support of Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/1/2015. (jao)
|
February 5, 2015 |
Filing
200
ORDER: (1) Granting In Part and Denying In Part 194 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application; (2) Modifying Hearing Date and Briefing Schedule on 195 Plaintiff's Motion For Certification Under 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b): Responses due by 2/20/2015, Replies due by 2/27/2015. Motion Hearing Reset for 3/6/2015 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 2D before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 2/4/2015. (srm)
|
August 20, 2014 |
Filing
123
ORDER: (1) Granting Motions to Dismiss (Docs. 23 , 47 , 48 , 51 , 53 , 55 , 66 , 85 , 86 , 87 ); (2) Denying as Moot 112 Motion to File Documents Under Seal; The Court Dismisses Plaintiff's causes of action against Defendants for violations of section 1 of the Sherman Act in their entirety for failure to state a claim. Plaintiff's breach of contract claim against SourceAmerica remains. The Court Grants Plaintiff thirty (30) days to file an amended complaint to correct the deficiencies identified herein. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 8/20/2014. (srm)
|