Baker v. Seaworld Entertainment, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lou Baker
Defendant: Seaworld Entertainment, Inc., Jim Atchison, James Heaney, Dan Brown, Marc Swanson, David F. D'Alessandro and The Blackstone Group L.P.
Case Number: 3:2014cv02129
Filed: September 9, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jan M. Adler
Presiding Judge: Michael M. Anello
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 530 JUDGMENT and Order of Dismissal. In accordance with this Court's Order granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement (Doc. No. 521 ) and Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Litigation Expenses (Doc. No. 522 ), the Court hereby APPROVES the parties' Settlement Agreement and ORDERS the parties to implement the Settlement Agreement according to its terms and conditions and this Court's Final Order. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 7/24/2020. (tcf) (jms).
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 525 ORDER and Notice of Procedure for July 22, 2020, 10 A.M. PST Settlement Fairness Hearing. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 7/13/2020. (tcf) (Main Document 525 replaced and NEF regenerated on 7/13/2020) (tcf).
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 520 ORDER Granting 519 Class Representatives' Unopposed Ex Parte Motion to Extend Notice Deadlines. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 3/16/2020. (tcf)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 518 ORDER Granting 516 Class Representatives' Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement and Authorizing Dissemination of Notice of the Settlement to the Class. A Settlement Fairness Hearing is set for 7/22/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3D before Judge Michael M. Anello. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 2/18/2020. (tcf)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 506 Notice and ORDER Providing Tentative Ruling Re: Motions in Limine [Doc. Nos. 474 , 476 ]. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 1/16/2020. (tcf) Modified text and regenerated NEF on 1/16/2020 (tcf).
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 470 Redacted Order Affirming Tentative Rulings Re: Daubert Motions and Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. (Doc. Nos. 344 , 347 , 351 , 355 , 358 , 359 ) The Court affirms its tentative rulings. Accordingly, the Court denies Defendants� 39; motion to exclude the testimony and opinions of Dr. Steven Feinstein [Doc. No. 344 ]; denies Defendants' motion to exclude the testimony and opinions of Chad Coffman, CFA [Doc. No. 347 ]; grants Defendants' motion to exclude the testi mony and opinions of Dr. James Gibson [Doc. No. 351 ]; grants in part and denies in part Plaintiffs' motion to exclude the testimony and opinions of Dr. Craig Lewis [Doc. No. 355 ]; grants Plaintiffs' motion to exclude the testimony and opinions of Dr. Randolph Bucklin [Doc. No. 358 ]; and denies Defendants' motion for summary judgment [Doc. No. 359 ]. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 11/16/2019. (tcf)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 463 Notice and Order Providing Tentative Rulings re: 344 , 347 , 351 , 355 , 358 , 359 Daubert Motions and Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. As these rulings are tentative, the Court looks forward to the oral arguments of counsel. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 10/9/2019.(rmc)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 426 Order Requiring Plaintiffs to Submit Supplemental Briefing re: Motions to File Under Seal; and Setting Deadline for the Parties to File Objections to Documents Designated as Confidential. Plaintiffs must file a brief, not to exceed 10 pages, explaini ng why the documents and exhibits they wish to file under seal meet the applicable legal standard, on or before 7/12/2019. Additionally, to the extent the parties seek to file any objections to materials designated as confidential, each side may file a single brief outlining their respective objections, not to exceed 10 pages, on or before 7/12/2019. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 7/1/2019.(rmc)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 301 ORDER Granting 294 United States' Unopposed Motion to Intervene and to Extend Partial Stay of Discovery. The Court grants the government's motion to intervene and to extend the partial stay of discovery. As such, the depositions of James Atchison, Daniel B. Brown, James Heaney, Frederick Douglas Jacobs, William Joshua Powers, Kelly Repass, and Marc G. Swanson may not be noticed nor taken, nor any subpoenas for such purpose be served, through 6/1/2018. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 4/10/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rmc)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER Granting 261 United States' Unopposed Motion to Intervene and to Extend Partial Stay of Discovery. The Court grants the government's motion to intervene and to extend the partial stay of discovery. As such, no depositions may be noticed nor taken, nor any subpoenas for such purpose be served, through 4/2/2018. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 12/7/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rmc)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER granting 213 Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by Pensionskassen for Borne-Og UngdomspAedagoger, Arkansas Public Employees Retirement System. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 11/29/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(acc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. Seaworld Entertainment, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lou Baker
Represented By: Laurence M. Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seaworld Entertainment, Inc.
Represented By: Chet A Kronenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Atchison
Represented By: Chet A Kronenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Heaney
Represented By: Chet A Kronenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Brown
Represented By: Chet A Kronenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc Swanson
Represented By: Chet A Kronenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David F. D'Alessandro
Represented By: Chet A Kronenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Blackstone Group L.P.
Represented By: Chet A Kronenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?