Franz v. Beiersdorf, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ashley Franz
Defendant: Beiersdorf, Inc. and Beiersdorf North America, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2014cv02241
Filed: September 22, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Ruben B. Brooks
Presiding Judge: Larry Alan Burns
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER Granting Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. 103 ). The parties' requests for judicial notice are denied as moot. Dkts. 103-6, 109 . The clerk is directed to enter judgment in favor of Beiersdorf and close the case. Signed by Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns on 4/15/2020. (jdt)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER Granting Motion for Leave to Amend (Dkt. 86 ). Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal is likewise granted. Dkt. 84 . The Clerk is directed to keep those documents under seal pending further order of the Court. Signed by Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns on 10/8/2019. (jdt)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER Denying Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 62 ). Signed by Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns on 5/20/2019. (jdt)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Court denies the plaintiff's request to amend and dismisses the action with prejudice. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 4/4/17.(kas)
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting 41 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. She shall file her second amended complaint no later than October 7, 2016. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 9/30/16. (kas)
August 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting 22 Motion to Dismiss, denying as moot 23 Motion to strike. Franz's UCL claim is stayed. If Franz thinks she can successfully amend her CLRA-related claims, she must seek leave by ex parte motion no later than August 24, 2015. If she files such a motion, Beiersdorf shall have until September 7, 2015 to oppose it. No reply should be filed unless leave is obtained in advance. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 8/3/15. (kas)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Franz v. Beiersdorf, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Franz
Represented By: Lindsey Gomez-Gray
Represented By: Manfred Patrick Muecke, Jr.
Represented By: Elaine A. Ryan
Represented By: Patricia N Syverson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beiersdorf, Inc.
Represented By: Alycia A Degen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beiersdorf North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?