Arellano, Jr. v. San Diego, County of et al
Plaintiff: Raul Arellano, Jr.
Defendant: San Diego, County of, Guerrero and Violent Crime Task Force
Case Number: 3:2014cv02404
Filed: October 8, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Karen S. Crawford
Presiding Judge: Janis L. Sammartino
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER: Dissolving Order to Show Cause; Directing Plaintiff to Serve the United States; and Dismissing Plaintiff's Bivens Claim Against the United States 188 .. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 11/9/20.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (NEF sent to USM) (dlg)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER Granting County of San Diego's 148 Motion for Summary Judgment; Granting City of San Diego's 149 Motion for Summary Judgment; Denying 180 Motion for Reconsideration; and Issuing Order to Show Cause and Dismissing Certain Def endants from the Action. Guerrero Bail Bonds, Officer Guerrero, the San Diego Violent Crimes Task Force, and the U.S. Marshalls Office are dismissed. Plaintiff is ordered to show cause as to why Jesus Guerrero, P. Beal, and the United States should not be dismissed from this case. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 8/21/20. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER Denying Motion for Default Judgment and Related Motions (ECF 145 , 154 , 156 ). The Clerk of Court shall provide Plaintiff with copies of the Court's orders docketed at ECF Nos. 145, 154, and 156, as well as a copy of the docket as of the date of this order. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 2/27/20. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service including copies of Motions requested)(dlg)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER denying 161 Plaintiff's ninth Motion for Appointment Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 1/27/2020. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER denying 129 Plaintiff's Motion for the appointment of investigator and disclosure of names of persons and procedures involved in the execution of arrest warrant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 4/11/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER Denying 119 Motion to Appoint Counsel and Granting 122 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 6/13/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER:(1) Denying 93 Motion for Reconsideration; Denying 104 Motion to Join Causes of Action; (3) Denying as Moot 114 Motion to Apply Reply to City of El Cajon; and (4) Granting 112 Motion to Amend Complaint. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 4/17/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER (1) Granting in part and Denying in part Motions to Dismiss; and (2) Denying Motion for Reconsideration: Granting in part and Denying in part 64 Motion to Dismiss; and Granting in part and denying in part 65 Motion to Dismiss for Failur e to State a Claim; Granting in part and Denying in part 65 ; Denies as moot 70 Motion to Dismiss; denying 73 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/18/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER: Granting Plaintiff's 60 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint; Denying Plaintiff's 60 Motion for Reconsideration ; And Denying Plaintiff's Motion For Interlocutory Appeal. It is ordered that plaintiff shall file his amended complaint on or before 3/27/2017. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 1/24/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dxj)
December 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 30 42 43 Municipal Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. The Court grants in part and denies in part Municipal Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant City of El C ajon are dismissed with prejudice. However, Plaintiff's claims against Defendant County of San Diego and Defendant City of San Diego are dismissed without prejudice and with leave to amend. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint, if any, on or before January 24, 2017. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 12/27/2016. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kcm)
November 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: (1) Granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and (2) Directing US Marshal shall effect service of complaint. Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed IFP pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a) (ECF Doc. No. 2) is granted. The Secr etary CDCR, or his designee, is ordered to collect from prison trust account the $350 balance of the filing fee owed in this case by collecting monthly payments from the trust account in an amount equal to 20% of the preceding month inco me credited to the account and forward payments to the Clerk of the Court each time the amount in the account exceeds $10 in accordance with 28 USC 1915(b)(2). The Clerk is diredcted to issue a summons as to Plaintiff's Complaint (ECF Do c. No. 1) upon Defendants and forward it to Plaintiff along with a blank U.S. Marshal Form 285 for each Defendant. Plaintiff is directed to complete the Form 285s as completely and accurately as possible, and to return them to the United States Mar shal according to the instructions provided by the Clerk in the letter accompanying his IFP package. Upon receipt, the U.S. Marshal is ordered to serve a copy of the Complaint and summons upon each Defendant as directed by Plaintiff on the USM F orm 285s. Defendants are thereafter ordered to reply to Plaintiffs Complaint within the time provided by the applicable provisions of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(a). Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 11/3/2014. (Order electronically transmitted to Secretary of CDCR) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (Certified Copy to USM) (jao)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arellano, Jr. v. San Diego, County of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raul Arellano, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Diego, County of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guerrero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Violent Crime Task Force
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?