Macias et al v. Lange
Plaintiff: Cynthia Rich and Erika Macias
Defendant: Myron Lange
Case Number: 3:2014cv02763
Filed: November 19, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Jan M Adler
Referring Judge: Gonzalo P Curiel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 3601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 184 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Assignment of Judgment and Judgment Liens by WV 23 Jumpstart, LLC (Katz, Lior)Attorney Lior Katz added to party WV 23 Jumpstart, LLC(pty:ip) (dlg).
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER of USCA as to #160 Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit, filed by Myron Lange. A review of the docket demonstrates that appellant has failed to file the opening brief in this case. Pursuant to Ninth Circuit Rule 42-1, this appeal is dismissed for failure to prosecute. This order served on the USDC shall, 21 days after the date of the order, act as the mandate of the USCA. (akr)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 182 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (Telephonic Status Hearing) held on 10/14/2016, before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Chari L. Bowery. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 7/17/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/27/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/25/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service. Notice of electronic filing only.) (akr)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 181 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (Motions in limine Hearing) held on 10/7/2016, before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Chari L. Bowery. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 7/17/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/27/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/25/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service. Notice of electronic filing only.) (akr)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 180 Abstract of Judgment as to Brancart & Brancart.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 179 PRAECIPE for Abstract of Judgment as to Brancart & Brancart (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 178 Abstract of Judgment as to Legal Aid Society of San Diego, Inc.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 177 PRAECIPE for Abstract of Judgment as to Legal Aid Society of San Diego, Inc., by Erika Macias, Cynthia Rich (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 176 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Rejecting Document: Letter, from Defendant Myron Lange. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Improper ex parte communication and Civ.L. Rule 5.2 Missing proof of service, Rejected document was returned to the filer. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/16/17.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/16/2017: #1 Rejected Document) (dlg).
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 175 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (Jury Trial, Volume 2) held on 10/18/2016, before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Court Reporter/Transcriber Chari L. Bowery. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 6/29/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/10/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/6/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service. Notice of electronic filing only.) (akr)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 174 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (Jury Trial, Volume 1) held on 10/17/2016, before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Chari L. Bowery. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 6/29/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/10/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/6/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service. Notice of electronic filing only.) (akr)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER denying Plaintiff Erika Macias' #156 Motion for Injunctive Relief; and granting in part Plaintiff Erika Macias' #157 Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/6/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (fth)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 172 Minute ORDER,re #156 MOTION for Permanent Injunction, #157 MOTION for Attorney Fees - Submitted. Motion Hearing set for 6/2/17 - VACATED.(no document attached) (ksr)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 169 REPLY - Other re #156 MOTION for Permanent Injunction , #159 Order Setting Briefing Schedule, #157 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiff's Reply and Statement re: Defendant's Failure to Oppose Attorney Fees Motion & Motion for Permanent Injunction filed by Erika Macias, Cynthia Rich. (Spencer, Rosalina) (dlg).
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 171 Abstract of Judgment by Erika Macias, entered against Myron Lange. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(acc)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 170 PRAECIPE for Abstract of Judgment as to Myron Lange, by Erika Macias re #166 Costs Taxed. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(acc)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 166 Costs Taxed in amount of $7,432.18 against Myron Lange (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tel)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 168 Abstract of Judgment by Erika Macias, Cynthia Rich, entered against Myron Lange re #154 (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 167 PRAECIPE for Abstract of Judgment as to Myron Lange, by Erika Macias, Cynthia Rich re #154 (dlg)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 165 Abstract of Judgment by Erika Macias, Cynthia Rich, entered against Myron Lange. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (fth)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 164 PRAECIPE for Abstract of Judgment as to Myron Lange, by Erika Macias, Cynthia Rich. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (fth)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 163 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Rejecting Document: Motion to Set Aside Judgment, from Defendant Myron Lange. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ. L. Rule 5.1: Missing time and date on motion and/or supporting documentation, Civ. L. Rule 7.1: Lacking memorandum of points and authorities in support as a separate document, OTHER: Civ.L. Rule 5.2 - Missing proof of service, Rejected document was returned to the filer. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 4/26/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(fth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/26/2017: #1 Rejected Document) (fth).
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 162 USCA Time Schedule Order as to #160 Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit, filed by Myron Lange. (NOTICE TO PARTIES of deadlines regarding appellate transcripts: Appellant shall file transcript designation and ordering form with the US District Court, provide a copy of the form to the court reporter, and make payment arrangements with the court reporter on or by 5/25/2017 (see Ninth Circuit Rule 10-3.1); Due date for filing of transcripts in US District Court is 6/26/2017.) (cc: Court Reporter). (akr)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 161 USCA Case Number 17-55581 for #160 Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit, filed by Myron Lange. (akr)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 160 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit as to #154 Judgment, by Myron Lange. (Filing fee $ 505 receipt number 0974-10022871.) (Notice of Appeal electronically transmitted to US Court of Appeals.) (Schnitzer, Gregory). (Modified on 4/26/2017: Added link to Judgment.) (akr).
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re #157 MOTION for Attorney Fees , #156 MOTION for Permanent Injunction : Any opposition shall be filed on or before May 5, 2017. Any reply shall be filed on or before May 19, 2017. A hearing is set on June 2, 2017 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 2D. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 4/17/17.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 158 NOTICE of Hearing - Bill of Costs, re #155 Bill of Costs, filed by Erika Macias : Hearing set for 5/3/2017 at 10:00AM. Any opposition or responsive pleading due 5/1/2017. All parties requesting to appear telephonically for this Bill of Costs hearing are directed to join on a conference call, then contact T. Lewis 619-557-5344 at the time of the hearing. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (tel)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 157 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Erika Macias. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Butler, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Declaration Spencer, #5 Exhibit A, #6 Declaration Tailleart, #7 Exhibit A, #8 Exhibit B, #9 Declaration Brancart, #10 Exhibit 1-5)(Butler, Branden) (dlg).
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 156 MOTION for Permanent Injunction by Erika Macias. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Butler, Branden) (dlg). Modified on 5/22/2017 to send QC email to submit a proposed order to Chambers (dlg).
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 155 BILL OF COSTS submitted by Plaintiff Erika Macias in the amount of $ 7,432.18. Hearing set for 5/3/2017 at 10:00AM. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Spencer, Rosalina) (dlg).
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 154 JUDGMENT re Plaintiff Erika Macias and Defendant Myron Lange. Any motion for attorneys' fees and costs, including any bill of costs, shall be filed no later then 14 days after the entry of this judgment. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/29/17.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg) (jao).
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER Granting Plaintiff Rich's #149 Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice under Rule 41(a)(2). The hearing set for April 7, 2016 shall be vacated. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/28/17. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg) (jao).
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re #149 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(2) : Any opposition shall be filed on or before March 24, 2017. Any reply shall be filed on or before March 30, 2016. The hearing set for April 21, 2017 shall be rescheduled to April 7, 2017 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 2D. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/9/17.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER Granting #150 Motion to Continue Trial. The trial is rescheduled to May 8, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/9/17. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg) (jao).
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 150 Ex Parte MOTION to Continue Trial by Cynthia Rich. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Butler, Branden) (dlg).
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 149 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(2) by Cynthia Rich. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration)(Butler, Branden) (dlg).
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 148 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel: Status Conference held on 3/3/2017; No Settlement Agreement has been reached. Court confirms Jury Trial set for 3/13/17 at 9:00 am. (Court Reporter/ECR Chari Possell). (Plaintiff Attorney Branden Butler). (Defendant Attorney Myron Lange (PRO SE)). (no document attached) (ksr)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 147 STATUS REPORT by Cynthia Rich. (Butler, Branden) (dlg).
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 146 NOTICE of Change of Hearing: Motion in Limine Hearing set for 3/3/17 vacated and Status Conference set for 3/3/2017 02:30 PM before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (ksr)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER Rescheduling Trial Date and Jury Preparation and Scheduling Order. The trial date set for 2/27/2017 is rescheduled for 3/13/2017 at 9:00 AM before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. The Court sets a hearing on motions in limine for 3/3/2017 at 2:30 PM. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 2/8/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (fth).
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 144 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler: Mandatory Settlement Conference held on 1/12/2017. (Plaintiff Attorney Danielle Tailleart). (Defendant Myron Lange-pro se). (no document attached) (cdc)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER Declining to Issue Judgment At This Time. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 12/5/16.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
December 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 142 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Cynthia Rich. (Butler, Branden) (dlg).
December 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 141 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Rejecting #138 , from Defendant Myron Lange. Non-compliance with local rule(s), improper ex parte communication; no proof of service; and request for attorney's fees is premature and unaccompanied by motion and points and authorities in support of attorney's fees. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is rejected. It is ordered that the Clerk STRIKE the document from the record, and serve a copy of this order on all parties. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 12/1/16.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER Scheduling Mandatory Settlement Conference. A Mandatory Settlement Conference will be held on January 12, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. in the chambers of Magistrate Judge Adler. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 11/18/16.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 139 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Rejecting re #137 MOTION for Attorney Fees (Re-filing and Re-serving Motion for Attorney's Fee, Originally Filed and Served as ECF 133), from Plaintiffs Erika Macias, Cynthia Rich. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Rule 54(d) requires that a motion for attorney's fees must be filed no later than 14 days after the entry of judgment. No judgment has yet been entered. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is rejected. It is ordered that the Clerk STRIKE the document from the record, and serve a copy of this order on all parties. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 11/17/16.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 138 *** DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ECF 141 *** RESPONSE to Court's Order #130 filed by Myron Lange. (dlg) Modified on 12/1/2016 (dlg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/1/2016: #1 Stricken) (dlg).
November 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 137 *** STRICKEN PER ECF 139 *** MOTION for Attorney Fees (Re-filing and Re-serving Motion for Attorney's Fee, Originally Filed and Served as ECF 133) by Erika Macias. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration Brancart Declaration, #3 Exhibit Exh 1 - Brancart Time Records, #4 Exhibit Exh 2 - Brancart Costs, #5 Exhibit Exh 3 - Supporting declaration, #6 Exhibit Exh 4 - Supporting declaration, #7 Exhibit Exh 5 - Supporting declaration, #8 Declaration Butler Declaration, #9 Exhibit Exh A - LASSD Time Records, #10 Exhibit Exh B - LASSD Costs, #11 Declaration Spencer Declaration, #12 Exhibit Exh A - LASSD Time Records, #13 Declaration Tailleart Declaration, #14 Exhibit Exh A - LASSD Time Records, #15 Exhibit Exh B - Supporting authoirty, #16 Proof of Service)(Brancart, Christopher) (dlg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/17/2016: #17 Strikcken Document) (dlg).
November 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 136 NOTICE of Withdrawal and Refiling of Motion for Attorney's' Fee Setting New Hearing Date by Erika Macias re #133 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs (Erika Macias) (Brancart, Christopher) (dlg).
November 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 135 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Erika Macias, Cynthia Rich re #132 MOTION for Judgment filed by Erika Macias . (Butler, Branden) (dlg).
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 134 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Erika Macias, Cynthia Rich re #133 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs (Erika Macias) (Brancart, Christopher) (dlg).
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 133 *** WITHDRAWN PER ECF 136 *** MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs (Erika Macias) by Erika Macias, Cynthia Rich. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher Brancart, #2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Christopher Brancart (Time Records), #3 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Christopher Brancart (Costs), #4 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Christopher Brancart (Blair-Loy Declaration), #5 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of Christopher Brancart (Lawler Declaration), #6 Exhibit 5 - Declaration of Christopher Brancart (Gomez Declaration), #7 Declaration of Branden Butler, #8 Exhibit A - Declaration of Branden Butler (Time Records), #9 Exhibit B - Declaration of Branden Butler (Costs), #10 Declaration of Rosalina Spencer, #11 Exhibit A - Declaration of Rosalina Spencer (Time Records), #12 Declaration of Danielle Tailleart, #13 Exhibit A - Declaration of Danielle Tailleart (Time Records), #14 Exhibit B - Declaration of Danielle Tailleart (case))(Brancart, Christopher) (dlg). Modified on 11/17/2016 (dlg).
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 132 *** WITHDRAWN PER ECF 135 *** MOTION for Judgment by Erika Macias. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Branden Butler)(Butler, Branden) QC email, missing motion documents, and proposed order should not be filed on the docket. Attorney should withdraw (dlg). Modified on 11/17/2016 (dlg).
November 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 131 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (Partial Transcript of Jury Trial) held on 10/18/2016, before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Chari L. Possell. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 11/23/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/5/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/31/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service. Notice of electronic filing only.) (akr)
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER Setting Trial Date as to Plaintiff Cynthia Rich's Complaint. Trial as to Plaintiff Cynthia Rich shall begin on February 27, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 2D. On or before December 2, 2016, the parties shall inform the Court, by filing a notice, whether they seek a jury trial or a bench trial. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 10/21/16.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 129 JURY VERDICT in favor of the Defendant on #1,2,4 and 6 and in favor of Plaintiff as to #3 ($35,320) and #5 ($20,000). (ksr) (Main Document 129 replaced on 11/3/2016) (ksr).
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 128 Jury Instructions. (ksr)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 127 COURT EXHIBIT LIST. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(ksr)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 126 Defendant Exhibit List by Myron Lange.. (ksr)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 125 Plaintiff Exhibit List by Erika Macias.. (ksr)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 124 Witness List Plaintiff and Defendant. (ksr)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 123 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel: Jury Trial completed on 10/18/2016. Day of Trial 2. 7 Trial Jurors Present. Swore witnesses. Jury retired to deliberate at 1:45 pm. Jury returned at 4:18 pm. Verdict: for the Defendant on #1,2,4 and 6 and as for Plaintiff as to #3 ($35,320) and #5 ($20,000). (Court Reporter/ECR Chari Possell). (Plaintiff Attorney Branden Butlter and Rosalina Spencer). (Defendant Attorney Myron Lange (PRO SE)). (Erika Macias (Plaintiff)).(no document attached) (ksr)
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 122 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel: Jury Trial held on 10/17/2016. Day of Trial 1. Jury impaneled. Swore witnesses. Exhibits marked/received. Jury Trial (Day 2) continued to 10/18/16 at 9:00 am before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. (Court Reporter/ECR Chari Possell). (Plaintiff Attorney Branden Butler and Rosalina Spencer). (Defendant Attorney Myron Lange (PRO SE)). (Erika Macias (plaintiff)).(no document attached) (ksr)
October 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 121 TRIAL BRIEF (Supplement) by Erika Macias, Cynthia Rich. (Butler, Branden) qc email, missing certificate of service (dlg).
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 120 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel: (Telephonic) Status Hearing re trial held on 10/14/2016; Plaintiff Cynthia Rich severed from jury trial set for 10/17/16 (second trial to be set at later date). Jury Trial set for 10/17/16 at 9:00 am - confirmed. (Court Reporter/ECR Chari Possell). (Plaintiff Attorney Branden Butler and Rosalina Spencer). (Defendant Attorney Myron Lange (PRO SE)). (no document attached) (ksr)
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 119 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel Danielle M. Tailleart by Danielle Marie Tailleart on behalf of Erika Macias, Cynthia Rich (Tailleart, Danielle)Attorney Danielle Marie Tailleart added to party Erika Macias(pty:pla), Attorney Danielle Marie Tailleart added to party Cynthia Rich(pty:pla) (dlg).
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 118 Proposed Verdict Forms Joint Proposed Verdict Forms by Erika Macias, Cynthia Rich (Butler, Branden) Edited docket text to reflect filing (dlg).
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 117 PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS by Erika Macias, Cynthia Rich. (Butler, Branden) (dlg).
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 116 NOTICE Joint Statement of the Case by Erika Macias, Cynthia Rich (Butler, Branden) (dlg).
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 115 Witness List by Erika Macias, Cynthia Rich. (Butler, Branden) (dlg).
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 114 Exhibit List by Erika Macias, Cynthia Rich.. (Butler, Branden) (dlg).
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 113 STIPULATED FACTS. (Butler, Branden) (dlg).
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 112 Proposed Voir Dire by Erika Macias, Cynthia Rich. (Butler, Branden) (dlg).
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 111 TRIAL BRIEF Plaintiffs' Trial Brief by Erika Macias, Cynthia Rich. (Butler, Branden) (dlg).
October 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 110 Minute Order. for proceedings held before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel:Motion In Limine Hearing held on 10/7/2016 re #107 MOTION to Exclude filed by Myron Lange - Granted; Parties to submit Proposed opening statements by 10/13/16 at 9:00 am; ( (Telephonic) Status Hearing set for 10/14/2016 02:30 PM before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel.). (Court Reporter/ECR Chari Possell). (Plaintiff Attorney Branden Butler and Rosalina Spencer).(Defendant Attorney Myron Lange (PRO SE)). (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (ksr)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 109 RESPONSE in Opposition re #107 MOTION to Exclude Defendant's Prior Conviction filed by Erika Macias, Cynthia Rich. (Butler, Branden)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 108 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler: Mandatory Settlement Conference held on 9/26/2016. (Plaintiff Attorney Branden Butler). (Defendant Myron Lange-pro se). (no document attached) (cdc)
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 107 Defendant's MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence; Evidence of Defendant's Prior Conviction and to Exclude by Myron Lange. (dlg)
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER Scheduling Mandatory Settlement Conference. A Mandatory Settlement Conference is set for 9/26/2016 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 9/26/2016.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ag)
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 105 PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 8/8/2016.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 104 JURY TRIAL PREPARATION AND SCHEDULING ORDER. In accordance with the Court's order granting Defendant's motion to withdraw his waiver of jury trial filed on 8/8/2016, the Court orders the following: A Jury Trial is set for 10/17/2016 at 09:00 AM before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. The Motion In Limine Hearing is set for 10/7/2016 at 02:30 PM before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. The parties shall file and email the joint proposed jury instructions and special verdict forms, including any objections on or before 10/11/2016. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 8/8/2016.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER granting [ 94 ] Defendant's Motion to Withdraw His Waiver of Jury Trial. The Court GRANTS Defendant's motion to withdraw his waiver of jury trial. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 8/8/2016. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 102 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler: Mandatory Settlement Conference held on 7/27/2016. (Plaintiff Attorneys Branden Butler, Rosalina Spencer, Danielle Tailleart). (Pro Se Defendant Lange failed to appear). (no document attached) (cdc) Modified on 8/1/2016 to correct filed date (rla).
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 101 REPLY - Other re #100 Letter P's Reply re: Jury Demand Waiver filed by Erika Macias, Cynthia Rich. (Spencer, Rosalina) (dlg).
July 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 100 Letter from Myron Lange. Nunc pro tunc 7/7/16 (dlg)
June 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 99 RESPONSE re #96 Order,, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings, Brief - waiver of jury demand filed by Erika Macias, Cynthia Rich. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - transcript, #2 Exhibit B - pretrial order page 1, #3 Declaration Spencer dec)(Spencer, Rosalina) (dlg).
June 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER Scheduling Mandatory Settlement Conference. A Mandatory Settlement Conference shall be conducted on July 27, 2016 at 2:00 p.m. in the chambers of Magistrate Judge Adler. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 6/17/16.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
June 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 97 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (Final Pretrial Conference) held on 6/10/2016, before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Chari L. Possell. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 7/5/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/15/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/12/2016. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service. Notice of electronic filing only.) (akr)
June 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER Following Pretrial Conference. Plaintiffs shall file briefing on whether Defendant can withdraw his waiver of a jury trial (Re 94 ) on or before June 24, 2016. Defendant shall file a response on or before July 8, 2016. Plaintiffs shall file a reply on or before July 15, 2016. The Court sets this matter for a trial beginning on October 17, 2016, at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 2D. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/13/16.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg) (jao).
June 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 95 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel: Pretrial Conference held on 6/10/2016, Bench Trial set for 10/17/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2D before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Findings of Fact due 10/7/2016. Plaintiff file brief due 6/24/2016 re 94 defense oral motion withdraw waiver of jury trial, Defense response due 7/8/2016, Plaintiff Reply due 7/15/2016.(Court Reporter Chari Possell). (Plaintiff Attorney Branden Butler, Rosalina Spencer). (Defendant Attorney Myron Lange, Pro-Se). (no document attached) (lsf)
June 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 94 MOTION (Oral) to Withdraw waiver of Jury Trial by Myron Lange. (no document attached) (lsf)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER Granting Defense Counsel's #89 Motion to Withdraw. The Clerk of Clerk shall indicate on the docket that Defendant is proceeding pro se with the following address: Myron Lange, 5418 Wellesley Street W, La Mesa, CA 91942. The pretrial conference is set on June 10, 2016 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 2D. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/6/16. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg) (jao).
June 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER Re Defense Counsel's Ex Parte Motion to Withdraw as Counsel (ECF #89 ). The Court intends to grant defense counsel's motion to withdraw as counsel on the condition that defense counsel participates in the lodging of the pretrial order on June 3, 2016. Once a pretrial order is lodged, the Court will grant defense counsel's motion to withdraw. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/1/16.(dlg) (jao).
May 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Pretrial Disclosures by Erika Macias, Cynthia Rich Objections to Defendant's Pretrial Disclosure (ECF 90) (Brancart, Christopher) (dlg).
May 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 90 Pretrial Disclosures by Myron Lange (Bobroff, Seth)
May 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 89 Ex Parte MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Myron Lange. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Bobroff, Seth) (dlg).
May 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 88 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Myron Lange re #87 Ex Parte MOTION to Substitute Attorney Seth Bobroff filed by Myron Lange . (Bobroff, Seth) (dlg).
May 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 87 *** DOCUMENT WITHDRAWN PER ECF 88 *** Ex Parte MOTION to Substitute Attorney Seth Bobroff by Myron Lange. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Supplement, #3 Supplement)(Bobroff, Seth) Modified on 5/16/2016, spoke to attorney, he will be withdrawing and refiling as corrected motion (dlg). Modified on 5/16/2016 to term motion (dlg).
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 86 Pretrial Disclosures by Erika Macias, Cynthia Rich (Spencer, Rosalina) (dlg).
May 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 85 DECLARATION re #83 Order Regarding Compliance by Defendant Myron Lange. (Bobroff, Seth) (dlg).
May 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER Directing the Payment of Expenses. The Court orders Defendant and his counsel to issue payment to Plaintiffs' counsel in the amount of $3,450.00 in attorney's fees and $25.00 in costs, for a total of $3,475.00, by no later than May 20, 2016. The Court reserves the right to issue or recommend further sanctions if Defendant and/or his counsel fail to comply with this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 5/11/16.(dlg) (jao).
May 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER Following Discovery Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 5/9/16.(dlg) (jao).
May 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 82 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler: Discovery Conference held on 5/9/2016. (Plaintiff Attorneys Branden Butler, Danielle Tailleart, Christopher Brancart). (Defendant Attorney Seth Bobroff). Court to issue order. (no document attached) (cdc)
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 81 STATUS REPORT Regarding Discovery by Erika Macias, Cynthia Rich. (Butler, Branden) (dlg).
May 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER #79 Construing Plaintiff's "Motion for Sanctions" as a Status Report Regarding Discovery; Directing Full Compliance with April 7, 2016 Order; and Scheduling Discovery Conference. The Court declines to consider Plaintiffs' request for sanctions as Plaintiffs did not meet the motion filing requirements of this Court. The Court shall convene a telephonic Discovery Conference on May 9, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. to confirm that all issues have been resolved. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 5/3/16. (dlg) (jao).
April 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MOTION for Sanctions motion for sanctions by Erika Macias, Cynthia Rich. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Tailleart dec re unavailability of clerk/date, #2 Declaration Butler dec in support of motion for sanctions)(Butler, Branden) QC email re missing hearing time and date on motion (dlg).
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 78 RESPONSE re #72 Declaration, #71 Declaration, #73 Declaration Regarding Attorneys fees filed by Myron Lange. (Bobroff, Seth) QC email, response was to be filed by April 15, 2016 (dlg).
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 77 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler: Mandatory Settlement Conference held on 4/18/2016. (Plaintiff Attorneys Branden Butler, Rosalina Spencer, Danielle Tailleart). (Defendant Attorney Seth Bobroff). Case did not settle. (no document attached) (cdc)
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 76 SANCTIONS PAYMENT RECEIVED. A payment against a Court issued sanction has been made. A copy of the receipt is attached. (sxr)
April 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 75 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Erika Macias, Cynthia Rich re #67 Order on Motion to Compel,, #70 Declaration, filed by Erika Macias, Cynthia Rich Doc 70 - BGB decl atty fees. Doc 72 is amended BGB decl. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 - Clerks' instruction to withdraw doc 70)(Butler, Branden) (dlg).
April 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 74 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 4/14/16.(dlg) (jao).
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 73 DECLARATION re #67 Order on Motion to Compel,, Submitted by Christopher Brancart re Claim for Attorneys' Fee by Plaintiffs Erika Macias, Cynthia Rich. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Brancart, Christopher) (dlg).
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 72 DECLARATION re #67 Order on Motion to Compel,, Amended Declaration of Attorney, Branden G. Butler in support of attorney fees and costs by Plaintiffs Erika Macias, Cynthia Rich. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" - time record summary statement, #2 Exhibit "B" - past attorney fees award)(Butler, Branden) QC email for attorney to withdraw ecf 70 (dlg).
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 71 DECLARATION re #67 Order on Motion to Compel,, Attorney, Rosalina L. Spencer, in support of Attorney fees and costs by Plaintiffs Erika Macias, Cynthia Rich. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" - time record summary statement, #2 Exhibit "B" - past attorney fees award)(Spencer, Rosalina) (dlg).
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 *** DOCUMENT WITHDRAWN PER ECF 75 *** DECLARATION re #67 Order on Motion to Compel,, Attorney, Branden G. Butler, in support of attorney fees and costs by Plaintiffs Erika Macias, Cynthia Rich. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" - time record summary statement, #2 Exhibit "B" - past attorney fees award)(Butler, Branden) (dlg). Modified on 4/15/2016 to withdraw (dlg).
April 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER Granting in Part Plaintiffs' #68 Ex Parte Application to Extend Time to Serve Pretrial Disclosures; Amended Scheduling Order. A Mandatory Settlement Conference shall be conducted on April 18, 2016 at 2:00 p.m. in the chambers of Magistrate Judge Adler. The Pretrial Order shall be lodged with the district judge's chambers on or before June 3, 2016. The final Pretrial Conference is scheduled on the calendar of Judge Curiel on June 10, 2016 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 4/12/16. (dlg) (jao).
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File - P's ex parte application to extend time to serve pretrial disclosures & preparing proposed pretrial order by Erika Macias, Cynthia Rich. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Butler, in support of P's ex parte application to extend time to serve pretrial disclosures)(Butler, Branden) (dlg).
April 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER Granting #54 (1) Motion for Relief from Joint Motion Requirement and (2) to Compel Responses to Discovery. The Court sanctions Defendant's counsel, Seth Bobroff, Esq., in the amount of $500 payable to the Clerk of Court. Mr. Bobroff shall file a receipt reflecting his payment into the court's registry by no later than April 15, 2016. The Court reserves the right to issue or recommend further sanctions if Defendant and/or Mr. Bobroff fail to comply with this Order or any other orders of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 4/7/16. (dlg)
April 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Minute Entry by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler: At the request of counsel, Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 4/14/2016 rescheduled for 4/18/2016 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler. (no document attached) (cdc)
April 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (Motion Hearing) held on 3/25/2016, before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Chari L. Possell. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 4/25/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/5/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/5/2016. (akr)
April 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER Rescheduling Mandatory Settlement Conference. The Mandatory Settlement Conference set for April 11, 2016 is rescheduled for April 14, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 4/4/16.(dlg) (jao).
April 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Denying Defendant's #47 Motion for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff Macias and Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendant's #46 Motion for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff Rich. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 4/1/16. (dlg) (jao).
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER Rescheduling Mandatory Settlement Conference. On the Court's own motion, it is hereby ordered that the Mandatory Settlement Conference set for March 30, 2016 is rescheduled for April 11, 2016 at 2:30 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 3/28/2016.(nbp)(jao).
March 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel: Motion Hearing held on 3/25/2016 re #47 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff Erika Macias filed by Myron Lange, #46 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff Cynthia Rich filed by Myron Lange. Motions taken under submission. Court to prepare written order. (Court Reporter Chari Possell). (Plaintiff Attorneys Christopher Brancart, Branden Butler, and Rosalina Spencer). (Defendant Attorney Seth Bobroff). (no document attached) (bjb)
March 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 RESPONSE re #58 Order to Show Cause, filed by Erika Macias, Cynthia Rich. (Brancart, Christopher) (dlg).
March 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 RESPONSE re #58 Order to Show Cause, by Plaintiffs; Request to Strike Defendant's Answer filed by Erika Macias, Cynthia Rich. (Brancart, Christopher) (nbp)
March 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Defendant Lange is ordered to show cause, by filing a declaration on or before March 17, 2016, regarding why sanctions should not be imposed against him and/or his counsel for failing to comply with the local rules of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 3/10/16.(dlg) (jao).
March 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 REPLY to Response to Motion re #47 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff Erika Macias filed by Myron Lange. (Bobroff, Seth) (dlg).
March 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 REPLY to Response to Motion re #46 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff Cynthia Rich filed by Myron Lange. (Bobroff, Seth) (dlg).
February 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Requiring Defendant to File Response to #54 Plaintiffs' Motion for Relief from Joint Motion Requirement and to Compel Responses to Discovery. Defendant shall file a response to Plaintiff's motion on or before March 3, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 2/24/2016. (srm)
February 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Joint MOTION to Compel and for Relief from Obligation to Present Motion to Compel in Form of a Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute by Erika Macias, Cynthia Rich. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute, #2 Declaration Declaration in Support for Motion to Compel, #3 Declaration Declaration in Support of Motion to Compel, #4 Declaration Declaration in Support of Relief from Obligation to Present Motion to Compel in Form of a Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute, #5 Exhibit Defendant's Verified Discovery Responses, #6 Exhibit Defendant's Discovery Responses in Dispute, #7 Exhibit Myron Lange Deposition Excerpts, #8 Exhibit Proposed Protective Order)(Butler, Branden) (nbp).
February 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Erika Macias, Cynthia Rich re #48 Notice (Other),,, filed by Erika Macias, Cynthia Rich Notice of Withdraw of Document 48. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice from Clerk's Office Quality Control)(Butler, Branden) (nbp)
February 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #47 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff Erika Macias, #46 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff Cynthia Rich filed by Erika Macias, Cynthia Rich. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Deposition of Erika Macias (excerpts), #2 Exhibit 2 - Deposition of Cynthia Rich (excerpts), #3 Exhibit 3 - Deposition of Rito Chavez (excerpts), #4 Exhibit 4 - Chavez Deposition Exhibit 22, #5 Exhibit 5 - Deposition of Myron Lange (excerpts), #6 Exhibit 6 - Lange Answers to Interrogatories, #7 Exhibit 7 - Lange Unlawful Detainer Deposition (excerpts))(Brancart, Christopher) (nbp)
February 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 RESPONSE re #47 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff Erika Macias setting forth Statement of Genuine Issues of Material Fact filed by Erika Macias, Cynthia Rich. (Brancart, Christopher) (nbp)
February 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 RESPONSE re #46 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff Cynthia Rich setting forth Statement of Genuine Issues of Material Fact filed by Erika Macias, Cynthia Rich. (Brancart, Christopher) (nbp)
February 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 RESPONSE in Opposition re #47 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff Erika Macias, #46 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff Cynthia Rich filed by Erika Macias, Cynthia Rich. (Brancart, Christopher) (nbp)
February 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 **DOCUMENT WITHDRAWN Per Ecf No. 53** NOTICE by Erika Macias, Cynthia Rich re #29 Order on Motion to Compel Defendant Myron Lange to Produce Discovery Responses (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Opportunity Offered to Opposing Counsel to Participate in Joint Motion, #2 Memo of Points and Authorities Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute, #3 Declaration Spencer Declaration in Support of Joint Motion, #4 Declaration Butler Declaration in Support of Joint Motion, #5 Exhibit Defendant's Verified Discovery Responses, #6 Exhibit Defendant's Discovery Responses in Dispute, #7 Exhibit Myron Lange Deposition Excerpts, #8 Exhibit Proposed Protective Order)(Butler, Branden) Sent QC email re wrong event selected, should be a motion(nbp).
February 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff Erika Macias by Myron Lange. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Statement of Facts, #3 Declaration Declaration of Seth B. Bobroff, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Complaint, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 2 Deposition of Macias, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 3 DSM5)(Bobroff, Seth) (dlg).
February 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff Cynthia Rich by Myron Lange. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities Points & Authorities, #2 Statement of Facts, #3 Declaration Declaration of Seth B. Bobroff, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Complaint, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 2 Lease, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 3 Deposition Testimony)(Bobroff, Seth) (dlg).
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Re Joinder: Order Granting #36 Defendant's Ex Parte Application to File Motions for Summary Judgment in Excess of Page Limit and Setting Briefing Schedule. Defendant shall file his motions for summary judgment on or before February 5, 2016. An opposition shall be filed on or before February 19, 2016. Any reply shall be filed by March 4, 2016. A hearing is scheduled on March 25, 2016 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 2D. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 2/4/16.(dlg)
February 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 DECLARATION re #41 Response - Other AMENDED DECLARATION OF SETH B. BOBROFF, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS BRIEF REGARDING MISJOINDER by Defendant Myron Lange. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1: Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2: Rich Lease, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3: Cynthia Rich Depo, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4: Erika Macias Depo)(Bobroff, Seth) qc email to submit courtesy copies (dlg). (srm).
February 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Rejecting re #42 Declaration,, from Defendant Myron Lange. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Supplemental Documents Require a Court Order. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is rejected. It is ordered that the Clerk STRIKE the document from the record, and serve a copy of this order on all parties. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 2/2/16.(dlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/2/2016: #1 Rejected Document) (dlg).
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 *** DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ECF 43 *** DECLARATION re #41 Response - Other Supplemental Declaration of Seth B. Bobroff, ESQ. in Support of Defendants Brief Regarding Misjoinder by Defendant Myron Lange. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Rich Lease, #3 Exhibit Portions of Cynthia Rich Deposition, #4 Exhibit Portions of Erkia Macias Deposition)(Bobroff, Seth) Modified on 2/1/2016, ECF Discrepancy prepared (srm). Modified on 2/2/2016 (dlg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/2/2016: #5 Strike) (dlg).
January 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 RESPONSE re #38 Order Directing Parties to Brief Whether the Plaintiffs are Misjoined filed by Myron Lange. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Bobroff, Seth) (dlg).
January 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Erika Macias, Cynthia Rich re #38 Order. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration Spencer, #2 Declaration Declaration Macias, #3 Declaration Declaration Rich)(Butler, Branden) (dlg). Modified on 2/2/2016 qc email sent to submit courtesy copies (dlg).
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 RESPONSE re #37 Notice (Other), #36 Notice (Other) OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT MYRON LANGES EX-PARTE REQUEST REGARDING LOCAL RULE 7.1 filed by Erika Macias, Cynthia Rich. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Spencer Declaration, #2 Declaration Butler Declaration)(Butler, Branden) Modified on 1/26/2016, QC Mailer sent re all caps (srm).
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Directing Parties to Brief Whether the Plaintiffs are Misjoined. Both parties shall file a brief on whether the plaintiffs are misjoined and should be severed on or before January 29, 2016. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 1/25/16.(dlg)
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTICE by Erika Macias, Cynthia Rich re #36 Notice (Other) INTENT TO FILE AN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT MYRON LANGE'S EX PARTE REQUEST REGARDING LOCAL RULE 7.1 (Butler, Branden) (srm).
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 NOTICE by Myron Lange Regarding Local Rule 7.1 (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Notice)(Bobroff, Seth) (srm).
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Rejecting re #33 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Erika Macias, #34 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Cynthia Rich, from Defendant Myron Lange. Non-compliance with local rule(s), L.R. 7.1(h): Failure to obtain leave of court to file brief exceeding 25 pages. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The documents are rejected. It is ordered that the Clerk STRIKE the documents from the record, and serve a copy of this order on all parties. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 1/21/2016. (srm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/21/2016: #1 Rejected Document 33, #2 Rejected Document 34) (dlg).
January 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ***DOCUMENT STRICKEN BY ORDER OF COURT (DOC. #35 )*** MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Cynthia Rich by Myron Lange. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Statement of Facts, #3 Declaration Declaration of Seth B. Bobroff, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Declaratation, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Declaratation, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Declaratation)(Bobroff, Seth) (nbp). Modified text on 1/21/2016 (srm). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/21/2016: #8 Strike) (dlg).
January 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ***DOCUMENT STRICKEN BY ORDER OF COURT (DOC. #35 )*** MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Erika Macias by Myron Lange. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Statement of Facts, #3 Declaration Declaration of Seth B. Bobroff, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Declaration, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Declaration, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Declaration)(Bobroff, Seth) (dlg). Modified text on 1/21/2016 (srm). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/21/2016: #7 Strike) (dlg).
January 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Myron Lange of Motion for Summary Judgment ECF 30 & 31. (Bobroff, Seth) (nbp).
January 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 *** DOCUMENT WITHDRAWN PER ECF 32 *** MOTION for Summary Judgment to Plaintiff Erika Macias by Myron Lange. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Statement of Facts, #3 Declaration, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Declarataion, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Declarataion, #6 Declaration Exhibit 3 to Declarataion)(Bobroff, Seth) Modified on 1/12/2016, QC Mailer sent instructing to withdraw for improper s/ and inclusion of proposed judgment (srm). Modified on 1/14/2016 to withdRaw (dlg).
January 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 *** DOCUMENT WITHDRAWN PER ECF 32 *** MOTION for Summary Judgment to Plaintiff Cynthia Rich by Myron Lange. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Statement of Facts, #3 Declaration, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Declaration, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Declaration, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Declaration)(Bobroff, Seth) Modified on 1/12/2016, QC Mailer sent instructing to withdraw for improper s/ and inclusion of proposed judgment (srm). Modified on 1/14/2016 to withdraw (dlg).
January 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER (1) Denying #27 Motion for Relief from Joint Motion Requirement and to Compel Responses to Discovery as moot and (2) Regarding Compliance with Chambers Rules. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 1/7/16. (dlg)
January 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE by Erika Macias, Cynthia Rich STATEMENT RE MOTION TO COMPEL (Brancart, Christopher) (srm).
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION to Compel and for Relief from Obligation to Present Motion to Compel in Form of a Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute by Erika Macias, Cynthia Rich. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit (Nos. 1 - 4))(Brancart, Christopher) (dlg).
December 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler: Case Management Conference held on 12/14/2015. (Plaintiff Attorney Branden Butler). (Defendant Attorney Seth Bobroff). Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 3/25/2016 rescheduled for 3/30/2016 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler. Briefs shall be submitted by 3/23/2016. (no document attached) (cdc)
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Discovery. The deadline for the parties to file a joint motion for determination of discovery dispute regarding Defendant's responses to written discovery, if necessary, is 1/4/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 12/4/2015. (no document attached) (cdc)
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Joint MOTION for Discovery re discovery dispute and related schedule by Erika Macias, Cynthia Rich. (Butler, Branden) (dlg).
November 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Following Discovery Conference. The Clerk of Court shall terminate the Ex Parte Application [ECF No. 18] on the Court docket. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 11/24/15. Order mailed to Mr. Waiche. (dlg)
November 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler: Discovery Conference held on 11/24/2015. (Plaintiff Attorneys Branden Butler, Rosalina Spencer, Christopher Brancart). (Defendant Attorney Seth Bobroff). (Non-Party Abraham Waiche). Court to issue order. (no document attached) (cdc)
November 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Scheduling Discovery Conference: A telephonic Discovery Conference shall be held regarding Plaintiffs Ex Parte Application on November 24, 2015 at 10:30 a.m. Counsel for each party shall appear telephonically at this conference. Mr. Waiche is also ordered to appear telephonically at this conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 11/19/15.Order mailed to Mr. Waiche. (dlg)
November 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 DECLARATION (corrected) re #18 Ex Parte MOTION Granting an ex-parte application for a motion to compel production of documents from Abraham Waiche by Plaintiffs Erika Macias, Cynthia Rich. (Spencer, Rosalina) Modified text on 11/17/2015 (srm).
November 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 DECLARATION (corrected) re #18 Ex Parte MOTION Granting an ex-parte application for a motion to compel production of documents from Abraham Waiche by Plaintiffs Erika Macias, Cynthia Rich. (Brancart, Christopher) Modified text on 11/17/2015 (srm).
November 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Ex Parte MOTION Granting an ex-parte application for a motion to compel production of documents from Abraham Waiche by Erika Macias, Cynthia Rich. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Spencer declaration in support or ex-parte application for motion to compel document production, #2 Exhibit Exhibits to Spencer declaration, #3 Declaration Brancart declaration in support or ex-parte application for motion to compel document production)(Spencer, Rosalina) (dlg). Modified on 11/24/2015 to terminate per ecf 23 (dlg).
October 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order Scheduling Case Management Conference. A telephonic Case Management Conference shall be held before Magistrate Judge Adler on December 14, 2015 at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 10/15/15.(dlg)
October 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler: Case Management Conference held on 10/15/2015. (Plaintiff Attorneys Branden Butler, Rosalina Spencer). (Defendant Attorney Seth Bobroff). Court to issue order. (no document attached) (cdc)
August 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Scheduling Telephonic Case Management Conference. Case Management Conference held on 8/5/2015. Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 10/15/2015 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 8/5/2015. (srm)
August 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler: Case Management Conference held on 8/5/2015. (Plaintiff Attorneys Branden Butler, Rosalina Spencer). (Defendant Attorney Seth Bobroff). Court to issue order. (no document attached) (cdc)
July 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Minute Entry by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler: Due to a conflict on the Court's calendar, the Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 3/29/2016 is rescheduled for 3/25/2016 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler. Briefs shall be submitted by no later than 3/18/2016. (no document attached) (cdc)
April 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic Case Management Conference shall be held before Magistrate Judge Adler on August 5, 2015 at 9:30 a.m. A Mandatory Settlement Conference shall be conducted on March 29, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. in the chambers of Magistrate Judge Adler. The Pretrial Order shall be lodged with the district judge's chambers on or before May 6, 2016. The final Pretrial Conference is scheduled on the calendar of Judge Curiel on May 13, 2016 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 4/29/15.(dlg)
April 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler: Case Management Conference held on 4/29/2015. (Plaintiff Attorneys Branden Butler, Rosalina Spencer, Christopher Brancart). (Defendant Attorney Seth Bobroff). Court to issue scheduling order. (no document attached) (cdc)
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order Following ENE. An Early Neutral Evaluation Conference was held on 3/23/2015. A telephonic Case Management Conference is set for 4/29/2015 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 3/23/2015.(vam)
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler: Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 3/23/2015. (Plaintiff Attorneys Branden Butler, Rosalina Spencer). (Defendant Attorney Seth Bobroff). (no document attached) (cdc)
February 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. An Early Neutral Evaluation Conference will be held on March 23, 2015 at 10:00 a.m. in the chambersof the Honorable Jan M. Adler. Signed by Judge Jan M. Adler on 2/10/15.(dlg)
February 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Myron Lange.(Bobroff, Seth)Attorney Seth Bobroff added to party Myron Lange(pty:dft) (dlg).
December 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Rosalina Spencer on behalf of Erika Macias, Cynthia Rich (Spencer, Rosalina)Attorney Rosalina Spencer added to party Erika Macias(pty:pla), Attorney Rosalina Spencer added to party Cynthia Rich(pty:pla) (srm).
December 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Branden George Butler on behalf of Erika Macias, Cynthia Rich (Butler, Branden) Modified on 12/18/2014, QC Mailer sent re s/ (srm).
December 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Branden George Butler on behalf of Erika Macias, Cynthia Rich (Butler, Branden)Attorney Branden George Butler added to party Erika Macias(pty:pla), Attorney Branden George Butler added to party Cynthia Rich(pty:pla) (srm).
December 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Erika Macias, Cynthia Rich. Myron Lange served. (Brancart, Christopher) (srm).
November 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jao)
November 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Myron Lange ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-7573279.), filed by Erika Macias, Cynthia Rich. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:14-cv-2763-GPC-JMA. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel and Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler are assigned to the case. (Christopher Brancart)(jao) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Macias et al v. Lange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Myron Lange
Represented By: Seth Bobroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Rich
Represented By: Branden George Butler
Represented By: Danielle Marie Tailleart
Represented By: Rosalina Spencer
Represented By: Christopher A Brancart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erika Macias
Represented By: Branden George Butler
Represented By: Danielle Marie Tailleart
Represented By: Rosalina Spencer
Represented By: Christopher A Brancart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?