Clay v. Social Security Administration Office
Plaintiff: Glenn Edwin Clay
Defendant: Social Security Administration Office
Case Number: 3:2014cv02893
Filed: December 8, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Bashant
Presiding Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:0405id Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER approving and adopting 36 Report and Recommendation in its entirety; denying Plaintiff's 32 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting Defendant's 33 Cross Motion for Summary Judgment. Clerk is directed to substitute Nancy A. Berryhill in place of Defendant Carolyn W. Colvin. The Clerk shall enter judgment and close this case. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 5/31/2017. (jah)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 33 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Carolyn W. Colvin, 32 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Glenn Edwin Clay. Court recommends that Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment be denied, Defendant& #039;s Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment be granted and the decision of the Administrative Law Judge (ALJ) be affirmed. Objections to R&R due by 5/12/2017. Replies due by 5/26/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 4/25/2017. (jah)
May 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying 20 Joint Motion for the Court to Set the Time for Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Defendant may respond to this pleading in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 5/27/16. (kas)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clay v. Social Security Administration Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn Edwin Clay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?