State Bank of Texas v. Parabia et al
Plaintiff: State Bank of Texas
Defendant: Sam Parabia, Perin Parabia and Does 1 through 10
Case Number: 3:2014cv03031
Filed: December 30, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: David H. Bartick
Presiding Judge: M. James Lorenz
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345fc Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 331 ORDER denying 319 Motion to Quash Writ of Possession. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 3/17/2020. (jpp)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER: (1) Denying Defendants Perin and Sam Parabia's Motion to Set Aside Default Judgment [Doc. No. 284 ]; and (2) Denying Defendants Perin and San Parabia's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order [Doc. No. 285 ]. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 10/8/2019. (lrf)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER Overruling 159 MODefendant's Objection to Judicial Foreclosure Sale. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 12/19/2017.(sjt)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 DEFAULT JUDGMENT granted in favor of Plaintiff State Bank of Texas against Defendants Sam Parabia and Perin Parabia, Farzin Morena, and Ayer Capital Advisors, Inc. (sjt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Bank of Texas v. Parabia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Bank of Texas
Represented By: Kathleen A. Donahue
Represented By: William E Halle
Represented By: Lawrence J Hilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Parabia
Represented By: Quintin G Shammam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perin Parabia
Represented By: Quintin G Shammam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?