Radevska et al v. Noble Americas Energy Solutions, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Tamara Radevska and Ali Rock
Defendant: Noble Americas Energy Solutions, LLC, Noble Americas Corp., Noble Americas' Cigna Healthcare Open Access Plus Plan, Cigna Corporation and Cigna Healthcare of California, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv00271
Filed: February 9, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Gonzalo P. Curiel
Presiding Judge: Bernard G. Skomal
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER Requesting Supplemental Briefing in re Plan Documents and Administrative Record. The Parties are to comply with this Order on or by Tuesday, April 18, 2017. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 4/10/17.(dlg)
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Granting 54 Joint Motion and Stipulation Regarding Proposed Amended Pleadings. The hearing scheduled for April 1, 2016 is vacated. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 2/17/16. (dlg)
January 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 PROTECTIVE ORDER 35 Entered Pursuant to Joint Motion - As Modified by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 1/5/16. (dlg)
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Denying 11 Defendants Cigna Corporation and Cigna Healthcare of California's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 11/9/15. (dlg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Radevska et al v. Noble Americas Energy Solutions, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamara Radevska
Represented By: Matthew B Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ali Rock
Represented By: Matthew B Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noble Americas Energy Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noble Americas Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noble Americas' Cigna Healthcare Open Access Plus Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cigna Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cigna Healthcare of California, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?