Reddy, M.D. et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Reddy, M.D, Aparna Reddy and Joseph Reddy, M.D.
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2015cv00296
Filed: February 12, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: William Q Hayes
Referring Judge: Nita L Stormes
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7422 rt
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting Joint Motion To Dismiss (Re Dkt #16 ). Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 11/17/2015. (mdc)
November 13, 2015 Filing 16 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by United States of America. (Senra, Nithya)
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: The Motion to Stay Proceedings (Dkt #13 ) is granted. The Court will stay proceedings until 12/15/2015. The parties shall file a status report on or before 12/18/2015, regarding any petition for redetermination of the deficiency. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 8/31/2015. (mdc)
August 14, 2015 Filing 14 NON Opposition re #13 MOTION to Stay Proceedings pursuant to 26 U.S.C. 7422(e) filed by Aparna Reddy, Joseph Reddy, M.D.. (Van Clief, Elizabeth) (mdc)
August 5, 2015 Filing 13 MOTION to Stay Proceedings pursuant to 26 U.S.C. 7422(e) by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Notice, #2 Memo of Points and Authorities, #3 Exhibit)(Senra, Nithya) (mdc)
July 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER Regulating Discovery And Other Pre-Trial Proceedings: A Case Management Conference was held on 7/6/2015. Any motion to join other parties, to amend the pleadings, or to file additional pleadings shall be filed by 10/16/2015. All other pretrial motions must be filed by 3/14/2016. A Mandatory Settlement Conference is set for 5/11/2016 at 09:30 AM in the chambers of Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes. Counsel shall file their Memoranda of Contentions of Fact and Law by 6/17/2016. The Proposed Final Pretrial Conference Order is due by 7/8/2016. The Final Pretrial Conference is set for 7/15/2016 at 11:00 AM before Judge William Q. Hayes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 7/6/2015. (mdc)
July 6, 2015 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes: Case Management Conference held on 7/6/2015. Scheduling order to issue. (Plaintiff Attorney Elizabeth Van Clief). (Defendant Attorney Nithya Senra). (no document attached) (lkw)
June 22, 2015 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Senra, Nithya) (srm).
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER (1) Following Early Neutral Evaluation Conference; (2) Setting Rule 26 Compliance; And (3) NOTICE of Telephonic Case Management Conference: On 6/1/2015, the court held an Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. The case did not settle. Counsel must appear telephonically on 7/6/2015 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes for a Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 6/2/2015. (mdc)
June 1, 2015 Filing 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes: Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 6/1/2015. Case did not settle. Order to issue.(Plaintiff Attorney Elizabeth Van Clief). (Defendant Attorney Nithya Senra). (no document attached) (lkw)
April 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE AND ORDER Setting Telephonic Early Neutral Evaluation Conference With Counsel Only: A telephonic Early Neutral Evaluation is set for 6/1/2015 at 02:30 PM in the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 4/27/2015. (mdc)
April 24, 2015 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by United States of America.(Senra, Nithya)Attorney Nithya Senra added to party United States of America(pty:dft) (mdc)
February 27, 2015 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Reddy, M.D. United States of America (USAO Southern District of Calif, San Diego) served. (Van Clief, Elizabeth) (mdc) Modified on 4/27/2015 - Added USAO info to docket text. (mdc)
February 27, 2015 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Reddy, M.D. United States of America (Atty Gen Office, San Diego, CA) served. (Van Clief, Elizabeth) (mdc) Modified on 4/27/2015 - Added Atty Gen Office info to docket text. (mdc)
February 27, 2015 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Reddy, M.D. United States of America (Atty Gen, Washington, DC) served. (Van Clief, Elizabeth) (mdc) Modified on 4/27/2015 - Added Atty Gen info to docket text. (mdc)
February 12, 2015 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (fth)(jrd)
February 12, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Against United States of America (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-7803483.), filed by Joseph Reddy, M.D., Aparna Reddy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:15-cv-00296-WQH-NLS. Judge William Q. Hayes and Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes are assigned to the case. (Van Clief, Elizabeth)(fth)(jrd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reddy, M.D. et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reddy, M.D
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aparna Reddy
Represented By: Elizabeth Van Clief
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Reddy, M.D.
Represented By: Elizabeth Van Clief
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Nithya Senra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?