July 21, 2022 |
Filing
290
Order: On Joint Motion For Determination Of Discovery Dispute No. 3 And On Joint Motion For Determination Of Discovery Dispute No. 4 - granting in part and denying in part 263 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 266 Motion to Compel.Within 21 days of this Order, Defendants Villasenor and Sanchez must produce documents and respond to interrogatories sufficient to establish their current financial condition. The motion to compel tax returns is DENIED. The motion to compel regarding Interrogatory Nos. 8 and 9 and Request for Production 80 is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 7/21/2022. (ave)
|
July 1, 2022 |
Filing
289
ORDER (1) Denying Motion to Compel Plaintiffs to Sit For Mental Examination 261 ; (2) Granting Motion for Leave to Substitute Psychological Expert 277 ; and (3) Granting In Part and Denying In Part Motion for Protective Order 282 , 283 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 7/1/2022. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(axc)
|
April 5, 2022 |
Filing
270
ORDER - Plaintiffs Motion for Relief from Magistrate Judge Order (ECF No. 226 ); Motion for Reconsideration of ECF No. 233 (ECF No. 237 ); Motion for Reconsideration of ECF No. 235 (ECF No. 240 ); and Motion to Strike Defendants Answer, Motion for Default Judgment, and Motion for Reconsideration of ECF No. 234 (ECF No. 255 ) are denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Ex Parte Motions for Leave to Exceed Page Limit (ECF Nos. 247 , 257 ) are granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Countys Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer (ECF No. 245 ) is granted. Signed by District Judge William Q. Hayes on 4/5/2022. (ave)
|
October 29, 2021 |
Filing
235
ORDER: Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (ECF No. 198 ) and Supplemental Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (ECF No. 201 ) are denied. Signed by District Judge William Q. Hayes on 10/28/2021. (ag)
|
April 26, 2021 |
Filing
189
ORDER: The Motion to Strike Fourth Amended Complaint (ECF No. 182 ) is denied. The Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time to File Fourth Amended Complaint (ECF No. 183 ) is granted. Defendants shall file a responsive pleading to the Fourth Amended Complaint (ECF No. 180 ) within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(3). Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 4/26/2021. (ag)
|
December 22, 2020 |
Filing
179
ORDER Granting 172 Motion for Leave to Amend Class Action Complaint. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion for Leave to Amend Class Action Complaint (ECF No. 172 ) is granted. Plaintiffs shall file the proposed fourth amended complaint attached as Exhibit A to the Motion (ECF No. 172 -1) within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 12/22/2020. (tcf)
|
September 23, 2020 |
Filing
167
ORDER on 166 Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute No. 1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 9/23/2020.(ag)
|
January 3, 2018 |
Filing
142
ORDER - Plaintiffs Motion for Reconsideration of the Berryhill Order is denied. Plaintiffs Motion for Reconsideration of the Villasenor and Sanchez Order is denied. Plaintiffs only remaining claims, their claims for damages against Defendants Hagar, Tran, Pilcher, and Patel are dismissed with prejudice. Judgment is entered for Defendants and against Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 1/03/2018.
|
August 7, 2017 |
Filing
126
ORDER granting 114 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion to dismiss the third amended complaint (ECF No. 114) filed by Defendants William Villasenor and Dulce Sanchez is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs are ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE why this case should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Plaintiffs shall respond to this Order to Show Cause on or before 8/25/2017. Defendants shall file and response to Plaintiffs' pleading by 9/8/2017. Plaintiffs may file any reply by 9/15/2017. If Plaintiffs fail to respond or fails to establish that this Court has jurisdiction over this action, this case may be dismissed. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 8/7/2017. (acc)
|
July 19, 2017 |
Filing
125
ORDER: Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Motion for One-Day Extension (Dkt # 113 ) is granted. Defendant Berryhill's Motion to Dismiss as Moot All Claims (Dkt # 104 ) is granted. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 7/19/2017. (mdc)
|
December 21, 2016 |
Filing
100
ORDER: Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend the Complaint (Dkt # 92 ) is granted in part. The Third Amended Complaint, limited to the Court's ruling, shall be filed by 1/10/2017. Plaintiffs' request for leave to amend to add claims a sserted by Plaintiffs Tho Van Ha, Tommy Nguyen, and Don Doan who have been previously dismissed with prejudice is denied. Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Expedited Discovery (Dkt # 87 ) is denied as moot. Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration (Dkt # 98 ) and Defendants' Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time to File Response (Dkt # 99 ) are denied as moot. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 12/21/2016. (mdc)
|
April 19, 2016 |
Filing
77
ORDER: The Report and Recommendation (Dkt # 76 ) is adopted in its entirety. The Court denies without prejudice Plaintiffs' ex parte motion for expedited discovery. The Court does not dismiss any of the Defendants for failure to be served within the applicable service period. The Court extends the time to serve the operative complaint to sixty (60) days from the date an order on the motion to dismiss (Dkt # 69 ) issues. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 4/18/2016. (mdc)
|
August 31, 2015 |
Filing
46
ORDER: The Motion to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint (Dkt # 19 ) is granted in part and denied in part. The motion to dismiss is denied with respect to Plaintiffs Thai, Nassiri, Diep Nguyen, Ha, Huynh, Doan, and Tommy Nguyen's Firs t Amendment claim and Plaintiff Thai's Fourth Amendment unreasonable search claim. All other claims asserted in the FAC against Defendant Colvin are dismissed without prejudice. The Motion to Amend Complaint (Dkt # 35 ) is denied without prejudice. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 8/31/2015. (mdc)
|
August 20, 2015 |
Filing
44
ORDER: This Order constitutes notice that all claims asserted by Tho Van Ha, Duc Huynh, Don Doan, Tommy Nguyen, Trai Chau, and Hoi Cuu Quan Nhan will be dismissed unless, within ten (10) days of this Order: (1) Plaintiffs pay the $400.00 filing fee; or (2) these individuals file motions to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 8/20/2015. (mdc)
|