NeSmith v. County of San Diego et al
Plaintiff: Chassidy NeSmith
Defendant: County of San Diego, San Diego County Sheriff's Department, William D. Gore, San Diego County Sheriff, Vista Detention Facility and DOES 1-100
Case Number: 3:2015cv00629
Filed: March 20, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Jan M. Adler
Presiding Judge: Janis L. Sammartino
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER denying 119 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 3/25/2019. (jpp)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 58 Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 4/23/2018. (mpl)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Denying 30 Motion for Reconsideration. Plaintiffs have pled specific suicides, statistics, and news articles that raise their right to relief above the speculative level, (Underlying Order 713); this unlocks the doors of discovery, see A shcroft v. Iqbal, 556 U.S. 662, 678 (2009) ("A claim has facial plausibility when the pleaded factual content allows the court to draw the reasonable inference that the defendant is liable for the misconduct alleged.":). Accordingly, Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration is denied. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 3/30/2017. (dxj)
September 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER denying 20 Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint and to Strike Parts of the Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 9/12/2016. (kcm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NeSmith v. County of San Diego et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chassidy NeSmith
Represented By: Christopher S Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of San Diego
Represented By: Ricky R Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Diego County Sheriff's Department
Represented By: Ricky R Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William D. Gore
Represented By: Ricky R Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Diego County Sheriff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vista Detention Facility
Represented By: Ricky R Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?