Blast Motion, Inc. v. Zepp Labs, Inc.
Plaintiff: Blast Motion, Inc.
Defendant: Zepp Labs, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv00700
Filed: March 31, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Janis L. Sammartino
Presiding Judge: Nita L. Stormes
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER Granting 95 Joint Motion to Dismiss Certain Claims. Presently before the Court is the parties' Joint Motion for Stipulation of Dismissal of U.S. Patent Nos. 8,944,928 and 8,781,610 Without Prejudice. It is ordered that the Court dismisses these claims without prejudice. Additionally, each party shall bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 6/13/2017. (dxj)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER On Claim Construction. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 2/6/2017.(dxj)
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER denying 68 Plaintiff Blast Motion, Inc.'s Motion to Preclude Expert Testimony. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 12/16/2016. (kcm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blast Motion, Inc. v. Zepp Labs, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blast Motion, Inc.
Represented By: Robert R. Cleary
Represented By: Sara Lai-Ming Rose
Represented By: James C Yoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zepp Labs, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?