ZiiLabs Inc., Ltd. v. Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: ZiiLabs Inc., Ltd.
Defendant: Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Apple Inc., Samsung Austin Semiconductor, LLC, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC and Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
Petitioner: Qualcomm Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2015cv01133
Filed: May 20, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Gonzalo P Curiel
Referring Judge: Mitchell D Dembin
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:0145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2015 Filing 10 REPORT of Patent and Trademark Closing, regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) 5,831,637, 6,650,333, 6,683,615, 7,050,061, 7,187,383, 7,710,425, 8,144,156, re #9 Order on Motion to Withdraw. cc:USPTO (ag)
June 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: 1) Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Withdraw its Motion to Enforce Out of District Subpoena and Motion to Compel; 2) Vacating the Court ordered briefing schedule; and 3) Ordering the Clerk of Court to close the case (Docs. 1 , #2 , #7 , and #8 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 6/17/2015. (srm)
June 15, 2015 Filing 8 MOTION to Withdraw #2 MOTION to Compel, 1 Motion to Enforce Out of District Subpoena,,, 1 MOTION to Enforce Out of District Subpoena by ZiiLabs Inc., Ltd. (Srinivasan, Kalpana) (srm).
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #5 Joint Motion to Continue June 22, 2015, Motion Hearing. See attached order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 5/29/15. (atk)
May 28, 2015 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ZiiLabs Inc., Ltd. re #5 Joint MOTION to Continue Hearing on ZiiLabs Motion to Enforce an Out-of-State Subpoena and to Compel Qualcomm (Srinivasan, Kalpana) (cxl).
May 28, 2015 Filing 5 Joint MOTION to Continue Hearing on ZiiLabs Motion to Enforce an Out-of-State Subpoena and to Compel Qualcomm by ZiiLabs Inc., Ltd.. (Srinivasan, Kalpana) (cxl).
May 22, 2015 Filing 4 NOTICE by ZiiLabs Inc., Ltd. re #2 MOTION to Compel, 1 Motion to Enforce Out of District Subpoena,,, on Qualcomm Incorporated (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service of Notice of Hearing)(Srinivasan, Kalpana) (dlg).
May 20, 2015 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) *5,831,637*, *6,650,333*, *6,683,615*, *7,050,061*, *7,187,383*, *7,710,425*, *8,144,156* (cc: USPTO)(acc)(jrd)
May 20, 2015 Filing 2 MOTION to Compel by ZiiLabs Inc., LTD. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(acc)(jrd)
May 20, 2015 Filing 1 MOTION to Enforce Out of District Subpoena by ZiiLabs Inc., LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 See Doc. No. 2 Motion to Compel, # 21 Declaration Kalpana Srinivasan, # 22 Proof of Service)(acc)(jrd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ZiiLabs Inc., Ltd. v. Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Austin Semiconductor, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZiiLabs Inc., Ltd.
Represented By: Kalpana Srinivasan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Qualcomm Incorporated
Represented By: David A Kays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?