IPS Group, Inc. v. Duncan Solutions, Inc.
Plaintiff: IPS Group, Inc.
Defendant: Duncan Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv01526
Filed: July 10, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Presiding Judge: Mitchell D. Dembin
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 337 DISMISSAL With Prejudice 336 . Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 7/2/2020. (mme)(jrd)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 318 ORDER On Unopposed Motion to Approve Supersedeas Bond and Stay Execution of Fee Award [Doc. No. 317 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 8/29/2018. (anh)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 314 Order on 301 Request for Award of Fees and Expenses. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 8/17/2018. (rmc)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ORDER Re Defendants' Motion for Attorney's Fees [Doc. No. 266 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 5/14/2018. (jjg)
December 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 261 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED: The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment of non-infringement and no liability as to all Defendants by separate document pursuant to Rule 58. (jjg)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER Granting Motion for Summary Judgment [Doc. Nos. 136 , 173 , 176 , 178 188 , 189 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 12/01/2017. (ajs)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER on Motion to Disqualify Counsel [Doc. No. 171 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 10/17/2017. (jjg)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER Denying as Moot 177 and 190 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 10/2/2017. (mxn)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER on Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment [Doc. No. 103 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 8/16/2017. (jjg)
August 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 150 Defendant Duncan Parking Technologies, Inc.'s Motion for Sanctions Against IPS Group, Inc. and Plaintiff IPS Group, Inc.'s Cross Motion for a Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 8/11/17. (Dembin, Mitchell)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER on Defendants' 113 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. It is ordered that the motion to file under seal Exhibit 3 is granted; The motion to file under seal is granted temporarily as to Exhibits 6, 7 and 8; On or before 6/8/2017, th e party who designated Exhibits 6, 7 and 8 confidential shall file either (a) a memorandum not to exceed ten pages explaining why the documents should be filed under seal, with citation to legal authority, if any; or (b) a notice that the confiden tial designation is withdrawn and the document(s) can be filed publicly. Upon receipt of the response to this Order, the Court will determine whether to order that the documents be sealed permanently, or publicly filed. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 6/1/2017. (dxj) (sjt).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IPS Group, Inc. v. Duncan Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IPS Group, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas H Carsten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duncan Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Sara N. Kerrane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?