Hood v. Director of the California Department of Corrections
Petitioner: Daniel Roger Hood
Respondent: Director of the California Department of Corrections, .
Case Number: 3:2015cv01564
Filed: July 14, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: David H. Bartick
Presiding Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER Denying Motion Pursuant to Rule 60(b) [Doc. No. 71 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 10/4/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER Granting Motion to Reopen the Time to Appeal. For the reasons stated above, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. Petitioner's motion to reopen the time to appeal is GRANTED. As directed by the Ninth Circuit, Petitioner does not need to file a new notice of appeal.; 2. The Clerk shall send a copy of this order to the Ninth Circuit. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 4/14/2017. (USCA Case Number 17-55395. Order electronically transmitted to the US Court of Appeals. All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (akr)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER denying without prejudice 36 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge David H. Bartick on 8/5/2016. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(acc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hood v. Director of the California Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Daniel Roger Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Director of the California Department of Corrections, .
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?