Dallas Buyers Club, LLC v. DOE-72.197.35.160
Plaintiff: Dallas Buyers Club, LLC
Defendant: DOE-72.197.35.160
Case Number: 3:2015cv01614
Filed: July 21, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: David H. Bartick
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Bashant
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting Defendant Michael Ahmari's 29 Motion to Set Aside Default. Defendant is ordered to file an Answer by 6/17/2016. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 6/9/2016. (jah)
December 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting in Part 12 Plaintiff's Second Ex Parte Motion for Leave to Issue Two FRCP 45 Subpoenas and Motion for Additional Time to Serve Complaint. The Court denies Plaintiff's request to serve a Rule 45 deposition subpoena on Mike R. Ahmari. Plaintiff may serve a Rule 45 subpoena on the Sterling Alvarado Apartments for rental records for 6625 Alvarado Road, Unit 4406, San Diego, California 92120. The subpoena shall only request records related to the time period associated with the alleged infringing activity. Plaintiff is granted and additional sixty (60) days to serve the summons and complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge David H. Bartick on 12/9/15. (dlg)
August 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 5 Ex Parte Motion to Expedite Discovery. Plaintiff may serve a subpoena on Dft ISP, Cox Communications seeking the name and address of the subscriber assigned to Dft's IP address. No deposition or other discovery is authorized at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge David H. Bartick on 8/19/2015. (jah)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dallas Buyers Club, LLC v. DOE-72.197.35.160
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dallas Buyers Club, LLC
Represented By: James Stephen Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOE-72.197.35.160
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?