Doe v. Roe et al
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Defendant: John Roe, University of San Diego and Does 1 through 20
Case Number: 3:2015cv02018
Filed: September 10, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: David H. Bartick
Presiding Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 129 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED: Plaintiff's motion for a judgment amount against Laielli is Granted. It is hereby Ordered that Judgmentis entered in favor of Plaintiff Nicole Ramser and against Defendant Ricky Laielli in the amount of $1,659,950.75. The Clerk of Court is instructed to Close this case. (jjg)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER Denying 113 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 8/15/2017. (jjg)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER Granting University of San Diego's Motion for Summary Judgment [Doc. No. 87 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 8/4/2017. (jjg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Roe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Daniel Mark Gilleon
Represented By: James C Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of San Diego
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?